Maryland Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:David E Rice
Case #: 1:20-bk-13857
Case Filed:Mar 26, 2020
Terminated:Nov 17, 2021
Plan Confirmed:Feb 11, 2021

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Israel Baptist Church of Baltimore City
1220 N Chester St
Baltimore, MD 21213-3338
Represented By
Joseph Michael Selba
Tydings & Rosenberg LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee - Baltimore
Garmatz Federal Courthouse 101 West Lombard Street Suite 2625
Baltimore, MD 21201


Docket last updated: 84 minutes ago
Thursday, June 15, 2023
122 122 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - BK (Auto-Docket) Fri 06/16 12:26 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/15/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 121 Notice
Tuesday, June 13, 2023
121 121 court Notice (court use) Tue 06/13 8:13 AM
Notice of Filing in a Closed Case Related [+]120 Notice of Termination of Automatic Stay by Virtue of Default Under Chapter 11 Plan and Consent Order filed by creditor Evangelical Christian Credit Union. (Rybczynski, Mark)
Related: [-] ument