City of Chickasaw, Alabama v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:20-op-45115 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 26, 2020 |
Case in other court: | Alabama Southern, 1:20-cv-00117 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 15, 2020 4:43 PM EDT |
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
City of Chickasaw, Alabama
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/15/2020 4:42 PM EDT |
Friday, February 28, 2020 | ||
1 | 1 154 pgs COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2578734, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sutton, William) [Transferred from alsd on 3/26/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by City of Chickasaw, Alabama (Sutton, William) [Transferred from alsd on 3/26/2020.] | |
3 | 3 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Corporate Disclosure Statement (Sutton, William) [Transferred from alsd on 3/26/2020.] | |
Monday, March 02, 2020 | ||
4 | 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (skb) [Transferred from alsd on 3/26/2020.] | |
Thursday, March 05, 2020 | ||
5 | 5 NOTICE of Appearance by H. Lanier Brown, II on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Brown, H.) [Transferred from alsd on 3/26/2020.] | |
Friday, March 06, 2020 | ||
6 | 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John Patrick Strubel on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Strubel, John) [Transferred from alsd on 3/26/2020.] | |
Wednesday, March 25, 2020 | ||
7 | 7 Conditional Transfer Order (MDL) from Ohio Northern requesting transfer of action. Case electronically transferred this date. Case Closed. (cmj) [Transferred from alsd on 3/26/2020.] | |
Thursday, March 26, 2020 | ||
8 | 8 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Alabama Southern. Case number 1:20-cv-00117. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |