Zottola v. Eisai Inc. et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Philip M Halpern |
Case #: | 7:20-cv-02600 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity Action |
Case Filed: | Mar 27, 2020 |
Terminated: | Sep 29, 2021 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 23, 2020 4:37 AM EDT |
Defendant
Arena Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CVS Health Co.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Eisai Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Barbara Zottola
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, September 29, 2021 | ||
58 | 58
order
Judgment - Clerk
Wed 09/29 4:14 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT re:57 Memorandum & Opinion in favor of Arena Pharmaceuticals, Inc., CVS Health Co., Eisai Inc. against Barbara Zottola. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Memorandum Opinion and Order dated September 29, 2021, Defendants' motion to dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint is GRANTED with prejudice; accordingly, the case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 9/29/2021) (km) |
|
Att: 1 Right to Appeal | ||
57 | 57
22
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Wed 09/29 4:00 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re:45 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) . filed by CVS Health Co.,41 MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b)(6) . filed by Eisai Inc.,47 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) . filed by Arena Pharmaceuticals, Inc. For the foregoing reasons, the Court GRANTS Defendants' motion to dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion sequences pending at Doc. 41; Doc. 45; and Doc. 47, and to close this case. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 9/29/2021) (jca) |