Member Case
Lead case is: 1:20-bk-10916

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Michael E Wiles
Case #: 1:20-bk-10922
Case Filed:Mar 31, 2020
Terminated:Feb 10, 2021

TypeCorporation
# of Creditors1,000-5,000
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Dean & DeLuca Markets, LLC
251 Little Falls Dr
Wilmington, DE 19808-1674
Represented By
William R. Baldiga
Brown Rudnick LLP
contact info
Debtor
Dean & DeLuca New York, Inc.
251 Little Falls Drive
Wilmington, DE 19808
Represented By
William R. Baldiga
Brown Rudnick LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014


Docket last updated: 10 minutes ago
Wednesday, February 10, 2021
misc Close Bankruptcy Case Wed 02/10 12:08 PM
Case Closed. (Ho, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 09, 2021
6 6 order Order, Final Decree Tue 02/09 11:29 AM
Final Decree Closing Certain Chapter 11 Cases and Granting Related Relief Signed on 2/9/2021. (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 07, 2020
5 5 misc Statement of Financial Affairs Thu 05/07 9:35 PM
Statement of Financial Affairs - Non-Individual /Statement of Financial Affairs for Dean & DeLuca Markets, LLC Filed by William R. Baldiga on behalf of Dean & DeLuca Markets, LLC. (Baldiga, William)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Schedules Thu 05/07 9:34 PM
Schedules filed: Schedule A/B - Non-Individual, Schedule D - Non-Individual, Schedule E/F - Non-Individual, Schedule G - Non-Individual, Schedule H - Non-Individual /Schedules of Assets and Liabilities for Dean & DeLuca Markets, LLC Filed by William R. Baldiga on behalf of Dean & DeLuca Markets, LLC. (Baldiga, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 08, 2020
misc Add Claims and Noticing Agent Wed 04/08 2:23 PM
Claims and Noticing Agent, Stretto, added to the case. (Ho, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 01, 2020
3 3 order Motion, Joint Administration Wed 04/01 3:13 PM
Order signed on 4/1/2020 directing joint administration of cases 20-10916 20-10917 20-10918 20-10919 20-10920 20-10921 and 20-10922 under case 20-10916 (Dean &Deluca New York, Inc., et al.) as the lead case Related [+]. (DePierola, Jacqueline)
Related: [-] 2
misc Add Judge Wed 04/01 8:03 AM
Judge Michael E. Wiles added to the case. (Porter, Minnie)
Related: [-]
misc Case Association - Joint Administration Wed 04/01 3:54 PM
Case Joint Administration with Lead Case No. 20-10916 (MEW) Dean & De Luca New York, Inc., et al. (Ho, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 31, 2020
2 2 motion Motion, Joint Administration Tue 03/31 7:39 PM
Motion for Joint Administration /Debtors' Motion for Order (I) Under Fed. R. Bankr. P. 1015(b) Directing Joint Administration of the Chapter 11 Cases and (II) Waiving Requirements of 11 U.S.C. § 342(c)(1) and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2002(n) (Attachment: Ex A: Proposed Order) Related [+] filed by William R. Baldiga on behalf of Dean & DeLuca Markets, LLC. (Baldiga, William)
Related: [-] 1
1 1 19 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Tue 03/31 7:23 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. /Voluntary Petition for Dean & DeLuca Markets, LLC Filed by William R. Baldiga of Brown Rudnick LLP on behalf of Dean & DeLuca Markets, LLC, Dean & DeLuca New York, Inc.. (Baldiga, William)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Tue 03/31 7:26 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 20-10922 ) [misc,824] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A13879470. Fee amount 1717.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1