Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 7:18-bk-23538

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Robert D Drain
Case #: 7:20-ap-06060
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 01, 2020
Terminated:Jan 12, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
CAP Barbell, Inc.
10820 Westpark Drive
Houston, TX 77042
Represented By
CAP Barbell, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Kmart Holding Corporation
3333 Beverly Road
Hoffman Estates, IL 60179
Represented By
Brigette McGrath
Ask LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Sears, Roebuck and Co.
3333 Beverly Road
Hoffman Estates, IL 60179
Represented By
Brigette McGrath
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/21/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Tuesday, January 12, 2021
7 7 order So Ordered Stipulation Tue 01/12 10:14 AM
So Ordered Stipulation and Order Signed on 1/12/2021 Voluntarily Dismissing this Adversary Proceeding. Related [+] (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-] 6
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Tue 01/12 10:15 AM
Adversary Case 7:20-ap-6060 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 11, 2021
6 6 misc Stipulation Mon 01/11 4:03 PM
Stipulation and Proposed Order to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding. Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Kmart Holding Corporation, Sears, Roebuck and Co.. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 26, 2020
5 5 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Fri 06/26 1:32 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement . Filed by Roland Gary Jones on behalf of CAP Barbell, Inc.. (Jones, Roland)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer None Fri 06/26 1:30 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] filed by Roland Gary Jones on behalf of CAP Barbell, Inc.. (Jones, Roland)
Related: [-] 1
Thursday, April 16, 2020
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Thu 04/16 2:37 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Kmart Holding Corporation, Sears, Roebuck and Co.. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-] 2 ,1
Monday, April 13, 2020
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference TO BE DETERMINED (Use with Supervisor Approval ONLY) Mon 04/13 2:14 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office. Pre-Trial date to be determined by Court Order. (Ortiz, Carmen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 01, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Wed 04/01 7:22 AM
Adversary case 20-06060 Complaint against CAP Barbell, Inc. (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Kmart Holding Corporation, Sears, Roebuck and Co.. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 5 pgs Exhibit A
Att: 2 3 pgs Exhibit B
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Wed 04/01 3:33 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 20-06060 rdd] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A13881877. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1