Parks v. Suter et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 6:18-bk-12464
Lead BK case is: 6:18-bk-12464
Kansas Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Robert E Nugent |
Case #: | 6:20-ap-05063 |
Nature of Suit | 41 Bankruptcy - Objection / revocation of discharge - §727(c),(d),(e) 11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property |
Case Filed: | Apr 01, 2020 |
Terminated: | Feb 17, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Gregory Brian Suter
1576 E Willow Ln
Mulvane, KS 67110 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jessica Lorraine Suter
520 Songbird
Derby, KS 67037 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Linda S. Parks
Hite Fanning & Honeyman LLP 100 N Broadway Suite 950
Wichita, KS 67202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/19/2024 1:06 PM CDT |
Monday, November 01, 2021 | ||
misc
Online Payment of Fee
Mon 11/01 11:22 AM
Online payment enabled for fee in the amount of $350.00 for Filing Fee Final Installment. Filed by Linda S Parks on behalf of Linda S. Parks . (Parks, Linda) |
||
crditcrd
Mon 11/01 11:22 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Online Payment Enabled for Fee([LINK 20-05063 ) [misc,onlinepy] ( 350.00). Receipt number A17732243,amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Wednesday, February 17, 2021 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 02/17 2:04 PM
Adversary Case 6:20-ap-5063 Closed . (wms) |
||
Monday, November 09, 2020 | ||
33 | 33
court
Returned Mail
Mon 11/09 4:21 PM
Returned Mail . (wms) |
|
Wednesday, November 04, 2020 | ||
32 | 32
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Wed 11/04 11:56 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 11/04/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, November 02, 2020 | ||
31 | 31
order
Judgment
Mon 11/02 10:53 AM
Judgment Signed on 11/2/2020 (wms) |
|
Sunday, November 01, 2020 | ||
30 | 30
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Sun 11/01 10:58 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 11/01/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, October 30, 2020 | ||
29 | 29
order
Judgment
Fri 10/30 4:08 PM
Agreed Journal Entry of Judgment Signed on 10/30/2020 (wms) |
|
Tuesday, October 13, 2020 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Change of Address
Tue 10/13 10:11 AM
Change of Address Filed by Jessica Lorraine Suter. (wms) |
|
27 | 27
court
Courtroom Minute Sheet
Tue 10/13 9:41 AM
Courtroom Minute Sheet (MLH), Ruling: Gregory Brian Suter and Jessica Lorraine Suter now Kline appear in person. Ms Parks announces the resolution on the record. Debtors are now separated and will each be responsible for 50% of the total balance due of $4,895.74 (this includes all the turnover amounts, fees and costs). Payments of $150.00 per month will begin 11/1/2020. If either party misses a payment, Ms Parks will notify the Court and submit an Order for the balance owed and that revokes the defendants discharge. The Court addresses each defendant to verify they are present and that they agree with the announcement. Ms Parks will prepare the Order., Hearing Held . Order due by 10/27/2020. (wms) |
|
Tuesday, September 29, 2020 | ||
26 | 26
court
Trial Reminder Letter
Tue 09/29 2:32 PM
Trial Reminder Letter (wjs) |
|
Wednesday, August 26, 2020 | ||
25 | 25
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Wed 08/26 11:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 08/26/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, August 24, 2020 | ||
24 | 24
court
Clerk's Notice of Hearing (with form)
Mon 08/24 2:22 PM
Clerk's Notice of Hearing Evidentiary Hearing set for 10/13/2020 at 09:00 AM at Wichita Courtroom 150. (wms) |
|
Friday, August 21, 2020 | ||
23 | 23
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Fri 08/21 11:34 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 08/21/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, August 20, 2020 | ||
22 | 22
court
Courtroom Minute Sheet
Thu 08/20 3:08 PM
Hearing Held, Courtroom Minute Sheet (MLH), Ruling: Counsel submitted the Pretrial Order prior to hearing (wms) |
|
Wednesday, August 19, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
order
Pre-Trial Order
Wed 08/19 3:27 PM
Pre-Trial Order Signed on 8/19/2020 (wms) |
|
Friday, July 31, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Service
Fri 07/31 2:52 PM
Notice of Service of Discovery, with Certificate of Service. Filed by Plaintiff Linda S. Parks . (Parks, Linda) |
|
Monday, June 08, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order Adopting Report of Parties Planning Meeting
Mon 06/08 1:24 PM
Order Adopting Report of Parties Planning Meeting Signed on 6/8/2020 Status hearing to be held on 8/20/2020 at 11:00 AM at Wichita Courtroom 150. (waa) |
|
Saturday, May 09, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 05/09 11:32 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 05/09/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, May 07, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Thu 05/07 3:17 PM
Summons Service Executed on Gregory Brian Suter 5/7/2020 (^Parks1, Linda) |
|
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order Adopting Report of Parties Planning Meeting
Thu 05/07 11:34 AM
Order Adopting Report of Parties Planning Meeting Signed on 5/7/2020 (waa) |
|
Wednesday, May 06, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
court
Alias Summons Issued
Wed 05/06 4:02 PM
Alias Summons Issued on Gregory Brian Suter Date Issued 5/6/2020, Answer Due 6/5/2020 . (wms) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Report of Parties Planning Meeting
Wed 05/06 1:52 PM
Report of Parties Planning Meeting Filed by Linda S. Parks . (^Parks1, Linda) |
|
13 | 13
cmp
Summons Request
Wed 05/06 1:44 PM
Request for Alias of Summons(es) by Linda S. Parks - summons(es) requested on Gregory Brian Suter (^Parks1, Linda) |
|
Monday, April 20, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
epo
Continue Hearing
Mon 04/20 4:17 PM
ORDER CONTINUING HEARING. Reason for continuance: Time for Pre-Trial Scheduling Conference changed to 10:00 am at direction of Court. So ORDERED by s/ Robert E. Nugent . Pre-Trial Scheduling Conference to be held on 5/21/2020 at 10:00 AM at Wichita Room 150.(waa) THE MOVING PARTY IS TO SERVE THIS ORDER ON PARTIES NOT RECEIVING ELECTRONIC NOTICE AND FILE A CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT. (When filing a certificate of service for this order, relate it back to the epo category.) |
|
Friday, April 17, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
court
Returned Mail
Fri 04/17 7:57 AM
Returned Mail (Jessica Lorraine Suter) . (wms) |
|
Thursday, April 09, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Thu 04/09 11:44 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 04/09/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, April 07, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Hearing
Tue 04/07 3:50 PM
Notice of Hearing Filed by Clerk's Office. (wms) |
|
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 04/07 10:11 AM
Answer to Complaint with Certificate of Service Filed by Gregory Brian Suter, Jessica Lorraine Suter . (Wagle, M.) |
|
court
Hearing Set (Other)
Tue 04/07 3:52 PM
Hearing Set . Pre-Trial Scheduling Conference set for 5/21/2020 at 11:00 AM at Wichita Room 150. (wms) |
||
Friday, April 03, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 04/03 2:09 PM
Summons Service Executed on Gregory Brian Suter 4/3/2020 (^Parks1, Linda) |
|
6 | 6
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 04/03 2:08 PM
Summons Service Executed on Jessica Lorraine Suter 4/3/2020 (^Parks1, Linda) |
|
Thursday, April 02, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
court
Summons Issued
Thu 04/02 8:33 AM
Summons Issued on Jessica Lorraine Suter Date Issued 4/2/2020, Answer Due 5/4/2020 . (wms) |
|
4 | 4
court
Summons Issued
Thu 04/02 8:31 AM
Summons Issued on Gregory Brian Suter Date Issued 4/2/2020, Answer Due 5/4/2020 . (wms) |
|
court
Fee Deferred
Thu 04/02 8:20 AM
Fee Deferred . (wms) |
||
Wednesday, April 01, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Summons Request
Wed 04/01 11:18 AM
Request for Issuance of Summons(es) by Linda S. Parks - summons(es) requested on Jessica Lorraine Suter (^Parks1, Linda) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Summons Request
Wed 04/01 11:16 AM
Request for Issuance of Summons(es) by Linda S. Parks - summons(es) requested on Gregory Brian Suter (^Parks1, Linda) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/01 11:14 AM
Adversary case 20-05063 Complaint by Linda S. Parks on behalf of Linda S. Parks against Gregory Brian Suter, Jessica Lorraine Suter. Receipt Number Deferred, Fee Amount $350 Nature(s) of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)),(41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))) (^Parks1, Linda) |