California Central District Court
Judge:S James Otero
Referred: Alka Sagar
Case #: 2:14-cv-03042
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:501 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Apr 21, 2014
Terminated:Aug 28, 2014
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 21, 2015 12:55 AM PST
Defendant
Does 1 - 10, Inclusive
Defendant
John Roe
Defendant
Ralph Ziman
Plaintiff
Victor Henderson
Represented By
A Eric Bjorgum
Karish And Bjorgum PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, August 29, 2014
13 13 REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) Closing report mailed to Copyright Office. (lc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 dism
Thursday, August 28, 2014
12 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Victor Henderson. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Bjorgum, A)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 03, 2014
11 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Victor Henderson. upon Ralph Ziman waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/29/2014, answer due 8/28/2014. Waiver of Service signed by Aaron Aftergood. (Bjorgum, A)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2014
10 10 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge S. James Otero. (vcr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2014
9 9 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Victor Henderson. (Bjorgum, A)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2014
8 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Ralph Ziman. (ghap)
Related: [-]
7 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (ghap)
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
5 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge S. James Otero and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (ghap)
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Victor Henderson, (Bjorgum, A)
Related: [-]
3 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Victor Henderson. (Bjorgum, A)
Related: [-]
2 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Victor Henderson. (Bjorgum, A)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-13695319 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Victor Henderson.(Attorney A Eric Bjorgum added to party Victor Henderson(pty:pla))(Bjorgum, A)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A