Member Case
Lead case is: 1:20-bk-10746

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Laurie Selber Silverstein
Case #: 1:20-bk-10749
Case Filed:Apr 02, 2020
Dismissed:May 26, 2020
Terminated:Jun 10, 2020

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$500,001 to $1 million
Est. Liabilities $100,001 to $500,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Rudy's Hollywood, LLC
1605 Boylston Ave Ste 202
Seattle, WA 98122-6733
Represented By
Mark D. Olivere
Chipman Brown Cicero & Cole, LLP
contact info
William E. Chipman, Jr.
Chipman Brown Cicero & Cole, LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801


Docket last updated: 13 minutes ago
Wednesday, June 10, 2020
court Close Bankruptcy Case Wed 06/10 11:03 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (NAB)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 29, 2020
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 05/30 12:46 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 05/29/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9
Wednesday, May 27, 2020
10 10 claims Claims Register Wed 05/27 1:51 PM
Final Claims Register . Filed by Stretto. (Betance, Sheryl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 26, 2020
9 9 order Dismissing Case Tue 05/26 7:23 PM
Order Granting Debtors' Motion for Order Dismissing Chapter 11 Cases Tickle due by: 6/9/2020. (CMB)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 01, 2020
8 8 misc Schedules/Statements Fri 05/01 2:59 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by Rudy's Hollywood, LLC. (Chipman, William)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Schedules/Statements Fri 05/01 2:58 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by Rudy's Hollywood, LLC. (Chipman, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 07, 2020
6 6 utility Corrective Entry Tue 04/07 3:48 PM
Corrective Entry Duplicate Entry Related [+] (GM)
Related: [-] 5
Monday, April 06, 2020
5 5 order Order-Joint Admin Tue 04/07 11:23 AM
Order Directing the Joint Administration of the Debtors Chapter 11 Cases of Rudy's Barber Shop, LLC 20-10747 LSS), Rudy's New York, LLC 20-10748 LSS), Rudy's Hollywood, LLC 20-10749 LSS), Rudy's Portland, LLC 20-10750 LSS), Rudy's Southeast, LLC 20-10751 LSS). The Docket in the Chapter 11 Case of Rudy's Barbershop Holdings, LLC, 20-10746 LSS) Should be Consulted for all Matters Affecting This Case Signed on 4/6/2020 (GM)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Order-Joint Admin Mon 04/06 4:30 PM
Order Directing the Joint Administration of the Debtors Chapter 11 Cases [An order has been entered in this case consolidating this case with the case of Rudys Barbershop Holdings, LLC, Case No. 20-10746 (LSS), for procedural purposes only and providing for its joint administration in accordance with the terms thereof. The docket in Case No. 20-10746 (LSS) should be consulted for all matters affecting this case.] Signed on 4/6/2020 (CMB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 02, 2020
3 3 crditcrd none Thu 04/02 5:53 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 20-10749 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 9708306, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Joint Administration - Motion Thu 04/02 5:48 PM
Motion for Joint Administration of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases Filed By Rudy's Hollywood, LLC (Olivere, Mark)
Related: [-]
1 1 16 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Thu 04/02 5:13 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by Rudy's Hollywood, LLC. (Chipman, William)
Related: [-]
court Case Assigned Thu 04/02 7:10 PM
Judge Laurie Selber Silverstein added to case (BA)
Related: [-]