Rudy's Portland, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:20-bk-10746
Lead case is: 1:20-bk-10746
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Laurie Selber Silverstein |
Case #: | 1:20-bk-10750 |
Case Filed: | Apr 02, 2020 |
Dismissed: | May 26, 2020 |
Terminated: | Jun 10, 2020 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $0 to $50,000 |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Rudy's Portland, LLC
1605 Boylston Ave Ste 202
Seattle, WA 98122-6733 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Docket last updated: 12 minutes ago |
Wednesday, June 10, 2020 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Wed 06/10 11:03 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (NAB) |
||
Wednesday, May 27, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Final Claims Register . Filed by Stretto. (Betance, Sheryl) |
|
Tuesday, May 26, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Order Granting Debtors' Motion for Order Dismissing Chapter 11 Cases Tickle due by: 6/9/2020. (CMB) |
|
Friday, May 01, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by Rudy's Portland, LLC. (Chipman, William) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by Rudy's Portland, LLC. (Chipman, William) |
|
Tuesday, April 07, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
utility
Corrective Entry
Tue 04/07 3:49 PM
Corrective Entry Duplicate Entry (GM) |
|
Monday, April 06, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Order Directing the Joint Administration of the Debtors Chapter 11 Cases of Rudy's Barber Shop, LLC 20-10747 LSS), Rudy's New York, LLC 20-10748 LSS), Rudy's Hollywood, LLC 20-10749 LSS), Rudy's Portland, LLC 20-10750 LSS), Rudy's Southeast, LLC 20-10751 LSS). The Docket in the Chapter 11 Case of Rudy's Barbershop Holdings, LLC, 20-10746 LSS) Should be Consulted for all Matters Affecting This Case Signed on 4/6/2020 (GM) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Order Directing the Joint Administration of the Debtors Chapter 11 Cases [An order has been entered in this case consolidating this case with the case of Rudys Barbershop Holdings, LLC, Case No. 20-10746 (LSS), for procedural purposes only and providing for its joint administration in accordance with the terms thereof. The docket in Case No. 20-10746 (LSS) should be consulted for all matters affecting this case.] Signed on 4/6/2020 (CMB) |
|
Thursday, April 02, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
none
Thu 04/02 5:53 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 20-10750 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 9708306, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Motion for Joint Administration of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases Filed By Rudy's Portland, LLC (Olivere, Mark) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by Rudy's Portland, LLC. (Chipman, William) |
|
court
Case Assigned
Thu 04/02 7:10 PM
Judge Laurie Selber Silverstein added to case (BA) |