IN RE BIBOX GROUP HOLDINGS LIMITED SECURITIES LITIGATION
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Denise L Cote |
Case #: | 1:20-cv-02807 |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Cause | 15:77 Securities Fraud |
Case Filed: | Apr 03, 2020 |
Terminated: | Apr 19, 2021 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 30, 2020 6:19 AM EDT |
Defendant
Bibox Group Holdings Limited
1120 6th Avenue Suite 1507
New York, NY 10036 |
|
Defendant
Bibox Technology, Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Jeffrey Lei
1120 6th Avenue Suite 1507
New York, NY 10036 |
|
Defendant
Ji "Kevin" Ma
1120 6th Avenue Suite 1507
New York, NY 10036 |
|
Defendant
Wanlin "Aries" Wang
1120 6th Avenue Suite 1507
New York, NY 10036 |
|
Defendant
Bibox Technology OU
|
|
Plaintiff
Alexander Clifford
individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated Roche Cyrulnik Freedman LLP 99 Park Avenue 19th Floor
New York, NY 10016 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, May 28, 2021 | ||
98 | 98
11
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Fri 05/28 1:56 PM
OPINION AND ORDER re:92 MOTION for Reconsideration re;90 Order on Motion to Dismiss filed by Alexander Clifford. The plaintiff's April 28, 2021 motion for reconsideration is denied. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 5/28/2021) (mro) |