California Southern District Court
Judge:Janis L Sammartino
Referred: Karen S Crawford
Case #: 3:20-cv-00660
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:Apr 06, 2020
Case in other court:Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, 37-02020-00011819-CU-BT-CTL
Last checked: Saturday Oct 03, 2020 1:43 AM PDT
Defendant
Consumer Reports, Inc
Represented By
Rachel Lauren Ross
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Robert Anthony Cocchia
Rimon Law
contact info
Bety Javidzad
Dentons
contact info
Defendant
Does 1-50
Plaintiff
Michelle Brown
Represented By
Zachariah Paul Dostart
Dostart Hannink Coveney LLP
contact info
James T. Hannink
Dostart Hannink & Coveney LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Nino Koller
Represented By
Zachariah Paul Dostart
Dostart Hannink Coveney LLP
contact info
James T. Hannink
Dostart Hannink & Coveney LLP
contact info

GPO Jan 04 2021
ORDER Granting 14 Joint Motion for Stay of Proceedings. This action is STAYED pending the outcome of class action settlement approval proceedings, which the parties will pursue in the state court action, McKinney, et al. v. Consumer Reports, Inc., Case No. 37-2020-00046677-CU-BT-CTL. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 1/4/2021. (tcf)
GPO Jan 15 2021
ORDER Denying without Prejudice 6 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Defendant is granted leave to refile the motion, if needed,after the stay is lifted. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 1/15/2021. (tcf)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, November 12, 2021
21 21 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 11/12 9:09 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Michelle Brown, Nino Koller (Dostart, Zachariah)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Status Report Fri 11/12 9:07 AM
STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Michelle Brown, Nino Koller. (Dostart, Zachariah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 27, 2021
19 19 misc Status Report Tue 07/27 12:27 PM
STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by Michelle Brown, Nino Koller. (Dostart, Zachariah)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 30, 2021
18 18 misc Status Report Fri 04/30 3:20 PM
STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by Michelle Brown, Nino Koller. (Dostart, Zachariah)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 23, 2021
17 17 misc Status Report Fri 04/23 10:29 AM
STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by Michelle Brown, Nino Koller. (Dostart, Zachariah)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 15, 2021
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 01/15 11:51 AM
ORDER Denying without Prejudice6 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Defendant is granted leave to refile the motion, if needed,after the stay is lifted. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 1/15/2021. (tcf)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 04, 2021
15 15 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Mon 01/04 3:54 PM
ORDER Granting14 Joint Motion for Stay of Proceedings. This action is STAYED pending the outcome of class action settlement approval proceedings, which the parties will pursue in the state court action, McKinney, et al. v. Consumer Reports, Inc., Case No. 37-2020 00046677-CU-BT-CTL. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 1/4/2021. (tcf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 31, 2020
14 14 motion Stay Thu 12/31 11:08 AM
Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings and Notice of Settlement by Michelle Brown, Nino Koller. (Dostart, Zachariah) (jpp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 02, 2020
13 13 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Motions Submitted Thu 07/02 2:52 PM
ORDER vacating hearing on6 Motion to Dismiss and taking the matter under submission without oral argument. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 7/02/2020.(jpp)
Related: [-]
12 12 respm Response in Support of Motion Thu 07/02 11:02 AM
RESPONSE in Support re6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Consumer Reports, Inc. (Javidzad, Bety)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 30, 2020
11 11 notice Notice (Other) Tue 06/30 3:42 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel (Former Representation) by Consumer Reports, Inc (Cocchia, Robert)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 06/30 3:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Bety Javidzad on behalf of Consumer Reports, Inc (Javidzad, Bety)Attorney Bety Javidzad added to party Consumer Reports, Inc(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 06/30 10:54 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Lauren Ross on behalf of Consumer Reports, Inc (Ross, Rachel)Attorney Rachel Lauren Ross added to party Consumer Reports, Inc(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 25, 2020
8 8 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 06/25 11:28 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Michelle Brown, Nino Koller. (Dostart, Zachariah)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 13, 2020
7 7 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 05/13 12:01 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Consumer Reports, Inc. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Cocchia, Robert) (jpp)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 05/13 11:58 AM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Consumer Reports, Inc.(Cocchia, Robert) (jpp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities,
Att: 2 Declaration of Robert A. Cocchia,
Att: 3 Request for Judicial Notice,
Att: 4 Certificate of Service
Friday, April 10, 2020
5 5 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 04/10 3:39 PM
ORDER granting4 Joint Motion to extend time for Defendant to respond to complaint to on or before 5/13/2020. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/10/2020. (jpp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 08, 2020
4 4 motion Extension of Time to File Wed 04/08 9:15 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Response to the Complaint by Consumer Reports, Inc. (Cocchia, Robert) (jpp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 07, 2020
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/07 10:59 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by James T. Hannink on behalf of Michelle Brown, Nino Koller (Hannink, James)Attorney James T. Hannink added to party Michelle Brown(pty:pla), Attorney James T. Hannink added to party Nino Koller(pty:pla)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 06, 2020
2 2 notice Notice of Party With Financial Interest Mon 04/06 3:20 PM
NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Consumer Reports, Inc. No Parties With Financial Interest. (jmr)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Mon 04/06 3:19 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, case number 37-2020 00011819-CU-BT-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-13711378.), filed by Consumer Reports, Inc. The new case number is 3:20-cv-660-JLS-KSC. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case.(jmr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 59 pgs Declaration of Robert A. Cocchia - State Court Complaint,
Att: 3 Declaration Chaim E. Cohen,
Att: 4 Certificate of Service