DEGISO v. 3M COMPANY et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | M Casey Rodgers |
Referred: | Gary R Jones |
Case #: | 3:20-cv-05360 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Apr 06, 2020 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 03, 2020 5:28 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M COMPANY
2345 Rice Street Suite 230
Roseville, MN 55113 |
|
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
|
|
Defendant
AERO HOLDING LLC
|
|
Defendant
AERO LLC
|
|
Defendant
AERO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
STEVEN DEGISO
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/30/2023 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 09, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 04/09 4:13 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (MORSE, NATHANIEL) |
|
Tuesday, April 07, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Docket Annotation
Tue 04/07 7:52 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Notice to Filer. Pursuant to N.D. Fla. Loc. R. 5.2, a complete and executed Civil Cover Sheet is required in each civil case filed. Please file the civil cover sheet, which can be obtained from the forms and publication at www.flnd.uscourts.gov (JS 44 (Rev. 06/17), using the event selection "Civil Cover Sheet" which is found under "Other Filings," "Other Documents." Also be advised that all party names should be entered using ALL CAPS and no punctuation. Clerk will correct party name. Re1 Complaint filed by Steven Degiso. Please also note at case opening regarding the MDL 2885 to enter the Lead Case number 3:19-md-2885-MCR/GRJ, then choose Multidistrict Litigation, then JPML number 2885. For any questions call 850-470-8188. (djb) |
|
3 | 3
transfer
Case Transferred In - Divisional Transfer (COURT USE ONLY)
Tue 04/07 7:41 AM
Case transferred in from Gainesville Division on 04/07/2020 Case Number 1:20-cv-80. (djb) |
|
utility
Create Case Association
Tue 04/07 7:42 AM
Cases associated: Create association to 3:19-md-02885-MCR-GRJ. (djb) |
||
Monday, April 06, 2020 | ||
2 | 2 ORDER - The Clerk is hereby directed to assign all actions filed in, removed to, or transferred to this district which relate to, or seek damages from use of, the 3M Combat Arms Earplugs to the undersigned in the Pensacola Division. re 1 Complaint filed by Steven Degiso. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 4/23/2019. (djb) | |
1 | 1 6 pgs COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-5038609.), filed by Steven Degiso. (MORSE, NATHANIEL) |