Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:20-cv-05362
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Apr 07, 2020
Last checked: Sunday Oct 04, 2020 4:29 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
MATTHEW LILLEY
829 16TH ST NE
MASSILLON, OH 44646


Docket last updated: 33 minutes ago
Friday, April 10, 2020
2 2 misc Filing Fee Received Tue 04/14 4:08 PM
Filing fee Received: $ 400.00, receipt number FLN3-13762. Fee status updated to paid. (djb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 07, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 04/07 3:38 PM
COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (Filing fee $400.), filed by MATTHEW LILLEY. (cannot receipt check until 4/10/2020) (no service copies or summons) (djb)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 04/07 3:33 PM
JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS and MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES added. (djb)
Related: [-]