Original Case: 4:19-cv-00256

Eighth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:20-cv-01732
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Case Filed:Apr 08, 2020
Terminated:Apr 19, 2021
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 20, 2021 3:29 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
Roger Lacy, doing business as D&B Janitorial Services
Represented By
Abtin Mehdizadegan
CROSS & GUNTER
contact info
Melissa McJunkins Duke
CROSS & GUNTER
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Laidlaw & Lacy Inc.
Represented By
Abtin Mehdizadegan
CROSS & GUNTER
contact info
Melissa McJunkins Duke
CROSS & GUNTER
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
First Advantage Background Services Corporation, (Originally named as "Corporation Services Co.")
Represented By
Jason A. Spak
FISHER & BROYLES, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
D&B Janitorial Services
Represented By
Abtin Mehdizadegan
CROSS & GUNTER
contact info
Melissa McJunkins Duke
CROSS & GUNTER
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Anita Cotton
Represented By
Abtin Mehdizadegan
CROSS & GUNTER
contact info
Melissa McJunkins Duke
CROSS & GUNTER
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Arthur Carson
Represented By
Arthur Carson
contact info

GPO Apr 19 2021
PER CURIAM OPINION FILED - THE COURT: Steven M. Colloton, Jane Kelly and Ralph R. Erickson (UNPUBLISHED),
CONCUR AND DISSENT BY: STEVEN M. COLLOTON [5026662] [20-1732]

Docket last updated: 04/20/2021 3:29 AM CDT
Wednesday, April 08, 2020
4 pgs Civil case docketed. [4900293] 20-1732 (CAH)
Related: [-]
13 pgs Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, order 4/1/20, judgment 4/1/20. [4900297] 20-1732 (CAH)
Related: [-]
1 pgs BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: If the original file of the U.S. District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by 8th Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with 8th Circuit Local Rule 30A (a)(2), the clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files.
BRIEF OF APPELLANT Arthur Carson due 05/18/2020.
Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant.
[4900299] 20-1732 (CAH)
Related: [-]