Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:19-bk-18730

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Julia W Brand
Case #: 2:20-ap-01093
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2020
Terminated:Feb 22, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Fishermen Labs, LLC, a California limited liability company
Represented By
Fishermen Labs, LLC, a California limited liability company
contact info
Plaintiff
Mad Dogg Athletics, Inc., a California Subchapter S corporation, Debtor and Debtor in Possession
Represented By
Claire K Wu
Sulmeyerkupetz
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Monday, February 22, 2021
25 25 court Close Adversary Case Mon 02/22 11:02 AM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1093 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Bryant, Sandra R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Mad Dogg Athletics, Inc., a California Subchapter S corporation, Debtor and Debtor in Possession,6 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Mad Dogg Athletics, Inc., a California Subchapter S corporation, Debtor and Debtor in Possession,17 Scheduling Order (BNC-PDF)
Saturday, October 31, 2020
24 24 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 10/31 9:28 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 10/31/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 23 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Thursday, October 29, 2020
23 23 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Thu 10/29 8:01 AM
Order RE: Stipulated Dismissal With Prejudice of Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 10/29/2020 (Kaaumoana, William)
Related: [-] 19
Monday, October 26, 2020
22 22 misc Notice of Lodgment Mon 10/26 2:41 PM
Notice of lodgment of [Corrected] Order Re Stipulated Dismissal with Prejudice of Adversary Proceeding (with Proof of Service) Filed by Plaintiff Mad Dogg Athletics, Inc., a California Subchapter S corporation, Debtor and Debtor in Possession Related [+]. (Gatien, Konrad)
Related: [-] 19 Stipulation By Mad Dogg Athletics, Inc., a California Subchapter S corporation, Debtor and Debtor in Possession and Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice (with Proof of Service) Filed by Plaintiff Mad Dogg Athletics, Inc., a California Subchapter S corporation, Debtor and Debtor in Possession filed by Plaintiff Mad Dogg Athletics, Inc., a California Subchapter S corporation, Debtor and Debtor in Possession
21 21 court Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required Mon 10/26 9:26 AM
Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required: Other - PLEASE INCLUDE HEARING INFORMAION IN CAPTION OF STIPULATION- THIS ENTRY IS PROVIDED FOR FUTURE REFERENCE. Related [+] (Bryant, Sandra R.)
Related: [-] 19 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Mad Dogg Athletics, Inc., a California Subchapter S corporation, Debtor and Debtor in Possession
Friday, October 23, 2020
20 20 misc Notice of Lodgment Fri 10/23 4:26 PM
Notice of lodgment of [Proposed] Order Re Stipulated Dismissal with Prejudice of Adversary Proceeding (with Proof of Service) Filed by Plaintiff Mad Dogg Athletics, Inc., a California Subchapter S corporation, Debtor and Debtor in Possession Related [+]. (Gatien, Konrad)
Related: [-] 19 Stipulation By Mad Dogg Athletics, Inc., a California Subchapter S corporation, Debtor and Debtor in Possession and Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice (with Proof of Service) Filed by Plaintiff Mad Dogg Athletics, Inc., a California Subchapter S corporation, Debtor and Debtor in Possession filed by Plaintiff Mad Dogg Athletics, Inc., a California Subchapter S corporation, Debtor and Debtor in Possession
19 19 motion Stipulation (motion) Fri 10/23 3:41 PM
Stipulation By Mad Dogg Athletics, Inc., a California Subchapter S corporation, Debtor and Debtor in Possession and Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice (with Proof of Service) Filed by Plaintiff Mad Dogg Athletics, Inc., a California Subchapter S corporation, Debtor and Debtor in Possession (Gatien, Konrad)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 11, 2020
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 10/11 9:48 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 10/11/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 Scheduling Order (BNC-PDF)
Friday, October 09, 2020
17 17 order Scheduling Order (BNC-PDF) Fri 10/09 3:44 PM
Scheduling Order and Status Conference (BNC-PDF) Signed on 10/9/2020. Pre-Trial Conference set for 2/2/2021 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 1375, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Julia W. Brand Discovery due by 11/23/2020, Expert Discovery 12/21/20 (see imaged order for further details) (Vandensteen, Nancy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 08, 2020
16 16 court Hearing Set (Other) Thu 10/08 11:38 AM
Hearing Set Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 2/2/2021 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 1375, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Julia W. Brand (Bryant, Sandra R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Mad Dogg Athletics, Inc., a California Subchapter S corporation, Debtor and Debtor in Possession
court Hearing Continued (Other) Thu 10/08 11:34 AM
Hearing (Adv Other) Continued Related [+] Status Hearing to be held on 02/02/2021 at 02:00 PM 255 E. Temple St. Courtroom 1375 Los Angeles, CA 90012 for6 , (Bryant, Sandra R.) ENTERED DUE TO CLERICAL ERROR Modified on 10/8/2020 (Bryant, Sandra R.)
Related: [-] 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Mad Dogg Athletics, Inc., a California Subchapter S corporation, Debtor and Debtor in Possession
Wednesday, October 07, 2020
15 15 misc Notice of Lodgment Wed 10/07 1:14 PM
Notice of lodgment of Status Conference and Scheduling Order re: Status Conference Held on 10/06/2020 (with Proof of Service) Filed by Plaintiff Mad Dogg Athletics, Inc., a California Subchapter S corporation, Debtor and Debtor in Possession Related [+]. (Gatien, Konrad)
Related: [-] 6 Amended Complaint First Amended Complaint by Konrad K Gatien on behalf of Mad Dogg Athletics, Inc., a California Subchapter S corporation, Debtor and Debtor in Possession against Fishermen Labs, LLC, a California limited liability company. (RE: related document(s)1 Adversary case 2:20-ap-01093. Complaint by Mad Dogg Athletics, Inc., a California Subchapter S corporation, Debtor and Debtor in Possession against Fishermen Labs, LLC, a California limited liability company. Fee Amount $350 Complaint For: (1) Breach Of Written Contract; (2) Breach Of Oral Contract; (3) Money Had And Received; (4) Deceit (Cal. Civ. Code § 1709); (5) Fraud (Cal. Civ. Code § 1710); (6) Promissory Estoppel; (7) Breach Of The Covenant Of Good Faith And Fair Dealing; (8) Negligent Misrepresentation; (9) Declaratory Relief; (10) Disallowance Of Claim; And (11) Setoff Nature of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(91 (Declaratory judgment)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) filed by Plaintiff Mad Dogg Athletics, Inc., a California Subchapter S corporation, Debtor and Debtor in Possession). filed by Plaintiff Mad Dogg Athletics, Inc., a California Subchapter S corporation, Debtor and Debtor in Possession
Tuesday, September 22, 2020
14 14 misc Status report Tue 09/22 4:33 PM
Status report Joint Status Report (with Proof of Service) Filed by Plaintiff Mad Dogg Athletics, Inc., a California Subchapter S corporation, Debtor and Debtor in Possession Related [+]. (Gatien, Konrad)
Related: [-] 12 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Wednesday, July 29, 2020
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 07/29 9:32 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 07/29/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Monday, July 27, 2020
12 12 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Mon 07/27 1:36 PM
Status Conference and Scheduling Order Pursuant to LBR 7016-(a)(4) (FURTHER STAT CNF: 10/6 @ 2PM; JOINT STAT RPT DUE: 9/22/2020; COMPLETE DISCV, RECEIVE RPS TO DISCV REQUESTS : FACT DISCV: 11/23/2020; EXPERT DISCV: 12/21/2020) (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 7/27/2020 (Kaaumoana, William)
Related: [-] 6
Friday, July 24, 2020
11 11 misc Notice of Lodgment Fri 07/24 11:35 AM
Notice of lodgment re: Status Conference and Scheduling Order (with Proof of Service) Filed by Plaintiff Mad Dogg Athletics, Inc., a California Subchapter S corporation, Debtor and Debtor in Possession Related [+]. (Gatien, Konrad)
Related: [-] 6 Amended Complaint
court Hearing Continued (Other) Fri 07/24 3:09 PM
Hearing (Adv Other) Continued Related [+] Status Hearing to be held on 10/06/2020 at 02:00 PM 255 E. Temple St. Courtroom 1375 Los Angeles, CA 90012 for6 , (Bryant, Sandra R.)
Related: [-] 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Mad Dogg Athletics, Inc., a California Subchapter S corporation, Debtor and Debtor in Possession
Tuesday, July 07, 2020
10 10 misc Status report Tue 07/07 10:49 AM
Status report Joint Status Report (with Proof of Service) Filed by Plaintiff Mad Dogg Athletics, Inc., a California Subchapter S corporation, Debtor and Debtor in Possession Related [+]. (Gatien, Konrad)
Related: [-] 7 Summons Issued
Tuesday, June 02, 2020
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 06/02 3:39 PM
Answer to Complaint Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Filed by Fishermen Labs, LLC, a California limited liability company. (Krantz, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 11, 2020
8 8 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 05/11 2:48 PM
Summons Service Executed on Fishermen Labs, LLC, a California limited liability company 5/11/2020 (Gatien, Konrad)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 08, 2020
7 7 court Summons Issued Fri 05/08 4:43 PM
Summons Issued on First Amended Complaint Fishermen Labs, LLC, a California limited liability company Date Issued 5/8/2020, Answer Due 6/8/2020 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 7/21/2020 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 1375, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Julia W. Brand (Bryant, Sandra R.)
Related: [-] 6 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Mad Dogg Athletics, Inc., a California Subchapter S corporation, Debtor and Debtor in Possession
6 6 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 05/08 12:29 PM
Amended Complaint First Amended Complaint by Konrad K Gatien on behalf of Mad Dogg Athletics, Inc., a California Subchapter S corporation, Debtor and Debtor in Possession against Fishermen Labs, LLC, a California limited liability company. Related [+]. (Gatien, Konrad)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 2:20-ap-01093. Complaint by Mad Dogg Athletics, Inc., a California Subchapter S corporation, Debtor and Debtor in Possession against Fishermen Labs, LLC, a California limited liability company. Fee Amount $350 Complaint For: (1) Breach Of Written Contract; (2) Breach Of Oral Contract; (3) Money Had And Received; (4) Deceit (Cal. Civ. Code § 1709); (5) Fraud (Cal. Civ. Code § 1710); (6) Promissory Estoppel; (7) Breach Of The Covenant Of Good Faith And Fair Dealing; (8) Negligent Misrepresentation; (9) Declaratory Relief; (10) Disallowance Of Claim; And (11) Setoff Nature of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(91 (Declaratory judgment)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) filed by Plaintiff Mad Dogg Athletics, Inc., a California Subchapter S corporation, Debtor and Debtor in Possession
Monday, April 13, 2020
5 5 notice Notice Mon 04/13 3:49 PM
Notice Notice of Compliance With Local Bankruptcy Rule 7026-1 and Rule 7026 of The Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, with proof of service, Filed by Plaintiff Mad Dogg Athletics, Inc., a California Subchapter S corporation, Debtor and Debtor in Possession Related [+]. (Wu, Claire)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 2:20-ap-01093. Complaint by Mad Dogg Athletics, Inc., a California Subchapter S corporation, Debtor and Debtor in Possession against Fishermen Labs, LLC, a California limited liability company. Fee Amount $350 Complaint For: (1) Breach Of Written Contract; (2) Breach Of Oral Contract; (3) Money Had And Received; (4) Deceit (Cal. Civ. Code § 1709); (5) Fraud (Cal. Civ. Code § 1710); (6) Promissory Estoppel; (7) Breach Of The Covenant Of Good Faith And Fair Dealing; (8) Negligent Misrepresentation; (9) Declaratory Relief; (10) Disallowance Of Claim; And (11) Setoff Nature of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(91 (Declaratory judgment)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) filed by Plaintiff Mad Dogg Athletics, Inc., a California Subchapter S corporation, Debtor and Debtor in Possession,3 Summons Issued on Fishermen Labs, LLC, a California limited liability company Date Issued 4/10/2020, Answer Due 5/11/2020 (RE: related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Mad Dogg Athletics, Inc., a California Subchapter S corporation, Debtor and Debtor in Possession) Status hearing to be held on 6/9/2020 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 1375, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Julia W. Brand
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 04/13 3:46 PM
Summons Service Executed on Fishermen Labs, LLC, a California limited liability company 4/13/2020 (Wu, Claire)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 10, 2020
3 3 court Summons Issued Fri 04/10 12:42 PM
Summons Issued on Fishermen Labs, LLC, a California limited liability company Date Issued 4/10/2020, Answer Due 5/11/2020 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 6/9/2020 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 1375, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Julia W. Brand (Kaaumoana, William)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Mad Dogg Athletics, Inc., a California Subchapter S corporation, Debtor and Debtor in Possession
2 2 court Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required Fri 04/10 12:39 PM
Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required: Incorrect case data/statistical information was entered at the time of filing. THE COURT HAS CORRECTED THIS INFORMATION. THIS ENTRY IS PROVIDED FOR FUTURE REFERENCE. Related [+] (Kaaumoana, William)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Mad Dogg Athletics, Inc., a California Subchapter S corporation, Debtor and Debtor in Possession
1 1 144 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 04/10 10:21 AM
Adversary case 2:20-ap-01093. Complaint by Mad Dogg Athletics, Inc., a California Subchapter S corporation, Debtor and Debtor in Possession against Fishermen Labs, LLC, a California limited liability company. Fee Amount $350 Complaint For: (1) Breach Of Written Contract; (2) Breach Of Oral Contract; (3) Money Had And Received; (4) Deceit (Cal. Civ. Code § 1709); (5) Fraud (Cal. Civ. Code § 1710); (6) Promissory Estoppel; (7) Breach Of The Covenant Of Good Faith And Fair Dealing; (8) Negligent Misrepresentation; (9) Declaratory Relief; (10) Disallowance Of Claim; And (11) Setoff Nature of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(91 (Declaratory judgment)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Wu, Claire)
Related: [-]