California Central District Court
Judge:George H Wu
Referred: Steve Kim
Case #: 2:20-cv-03377
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2020
Terminated:Mar 29, 2021
Case in other court:Superior Court of California County of Los Angeles, 20STCV09711
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 07, 2020 1:42 AM PDT
Defendant
NBCUniversal Media, LLC
Represented By
Katherine Marie Motsinger
Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info
Mark A Wooster
Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info
Joel R Weiner
Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info
Defendant
Universal Pictures, Inc.
Defendant
Working Title Films Limited
Represented By
Katherine Marie Motsinger
Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info
Mark A Wooster
Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info
Joel R Weiner
Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does
Mediator (ADR Panel)
Linda Krieger
Represented By
Linda Guthmann Krieger
Krieger And Krieger Alc
contact info
Plaintiff
John Malkin
Represented By
Howard E King
King Holmes Paterno And Soriano LLP
contact info
Stephen D Rothschild
King Holmes Paterno And Soriano LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 48 minutes ago
Monday, March 29, 2021
38 38 order Dismissing Case Mon 03/29 11:51 AM
ORDER ON STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT AND ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation to Dismiss Case37 . This action, including all claims asserted by plaintiff John Malkin against defendants in the Complaint, is hereby DISMISSED IN ITS ENTIRETY WITH PREJUDICE, with all parties to bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (mrgo)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 26, 2021
37 37 stip Dismiss Case Fri 03/26 9:37 AM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc.41(a)(1) filed by Plaintiff John Malkin.(Rothschild, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Stipulation for Dismissal
Friday, January 22, 2021
36 36 order Protective Order Fri 01/22 8:54 AM
PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim re Stipulation for Protective Order35 . (see document for details) (hr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 21, 2021
35 35 stip Protective Order Thu 01/21 4:01 PM
STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendant NBCUniversal Media, LLC.(Weiner, Joel)
Related: [-]
34 34 order Striking Filed Documents (CV-80) Thu 01/21 1:38 PM
ORDER STRIKING FILED DOCUMENTS FROM THE RECORD by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. The documents listed below were improperly filed for the following reasons: Parties are supposed to provide the Court with a redline version of the Stipulation for Protective Order; therefore, the following document(s) shall be stricken from the record and shall not be considered by the Court: Stipulation for Protective Order33 . (hr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 20, 2021
33 33 stip Protective Order Wed 01/20 5:47 PM
STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendant NBCUniversal Media, LLC.(Weiner, Joel)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 05, 2020
32 32 order Strike Mon 10/05 10:43 AM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) - RULING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S LATE JURY DEMAND AND MODIFY ORDER RE JURY TRIAL17 by Judge George H. Wu re:17 MOTION and document is stricken. The attached Tentative Ruling is circulated to counsel. Both sides submit to the ruling based on their representation by email. For that reason, the Court adopts its tentative ruling as final. The Court would GRANT Defendants' motion to strike Plaintiff's late jury demand and to modify the Court's scheduling order to reflect that the trial in this matter will be a bench trial. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS) (mrgo)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 21, 2020
31 31 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Mon 09/21 2:00 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Supplement To Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Motion to Strike Jury Demand re Objection/Opposition (Motion related)18 29 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Motions and Related Filings > Responses/Replies/Other Motion Related Documents > Supplement (Motion related). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 18, 2020
30 30 4 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Fri 09/18 5:05 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Late Jury Demand and Modify Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only,,16 17 (Supplemental Memorandum) filed by Defendants NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Working Title Films Limited. (Weiner, Joel)
Related: [-]
29 29 motion Supplement Fri 09/18 5:02 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Supplement To Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Motion to Strike Jury Demand re Objection/Opposition (Motion related)18 filed by Plaintiff John Malkin. Motion set for hearing on 10/5/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Rothschild, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 10, 2020
28 28 minutes Telephone Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Mon 09/14 9:15 AM
MINUTES OF Telephone Conference held before Judge George H. Wu: Amended Pleadings due by 8/24/2020. Discovery cut-off 4/16/2021. Motions due by 5/17/2021. Motion set for hearing on 7/1/2021 at 11:00 AM. Motions in Liminie set for hearing on 7/1/2021 at 11:00. Pretrial Conference set for 7/1/2021 11:00 AM. Status Conference set for 6/3/2021 08:30 AM. (See minutes for further details). Court Reporter: Terri A. Hourigan. (yl)
Related: [-]
27 27 adr Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11) Thu 09/10 7:54 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Linda Krieger has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 09, 2020
26 26 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Wed 09/09 9:39 AM
TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu; Counsel are to appear telephonically for tomorrow's status conference at 8:30 a.m. by contacting the court clerk at javier_gonzalez@cacd.uscourts.gov for dial-in information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 08, 2020
25 25 misc Status Report Tue 09/08 12:00 PM
STATUS REPORT (Joint Status Report Following Judicial Reassignment) filed by Defendants NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Working Title Films Limited. (Weiner, Joel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 25, 2020
24 24 10 pgs order Order Tue 08/25 4:14 PM
STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU. (See order for further details) (yl)
Related: [-]
23 23 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 08/25 1:09 PM
TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: The Court sets a STATUS CONFERENCE for 9/10/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Counsel are to file a joint status report by noon on 09/08/2020. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 20, 2020
22 22 cs_rasgn Reassign Case - Self -Recusal --pursuant GO 19-03 (CV-52) Thu 08/20 1:45 PM
ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Case transferred from Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald to the calendar of Judge George H. Wu for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:20-cv-03377 GW(SKx). (rn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 19, 2020
21 21 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Wed 08/19 8:10 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Pursuant to the Central District of California's Continuity of Operations Plan (COOP), the MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S LATE JURY DEMAND AND MODIFY ORDER RE JURY TRIAL17 set for August 24, 2020 will be held telephonically at 10:00 a.m. Counsel shall use the following conference call information: Number: (877) 411-9748; Access Code: 6448503. Counsel are ordered to remain available from 10:00 a.m. - 11:00 a.m. Any tentative ruling the Court may prepare, will be emailed to counsel prior to the hearing. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rs)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 10, 2020
20 20 respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Mon 08/10 8:16 PM
Objection In Support of re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Late Jury Demand and Modify Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only,,16 17 Defendants' Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Stephen D. Rothschild filed by Defendants NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Working Title Films Limited. (Weiner, Joel)
Related: [-]
19 19 respm Reply (Motion related) Mon 08/10 7:25 PM
REPLY In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Late Jury Demand and Modify Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only,,16 17 filed by Defendants NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Working Title Films Limited.(Weiner, Joel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Monday, August 03, 2020
18 18 respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Mon 08/03 8:09 PM
Opposition Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Late Jury Demand and Modify Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only,,16 17 filed by Plaintiff John Malkin. (Rothschild, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 24, 2020
17 17 motion Strike Fri 07/24 3:35 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Late Jury Demand and Modify Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only,,16 filed by Defendants NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Working Title Films Limited. Motion set for hearing on 8/24/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Weiner, Joel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Joel R. Weiner,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Proposed Order
Tuesday, June 16, 2020
16 16 order Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only Wed 06/17 8:53 AM
ORDER RE JURY TRIAL by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Last Day to Add Parties/Amend Pleadings 8/24/2020. Non-expert Discovery Cut-off 4/16/2021. Last Day to Hear Motions 5/17/2021. File Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law, Exhibit and Witness Lists, Status Report regarding settlement, and all Motions in Limine 7/12/2021. Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions in Limine set for 8/2/2021 at 11:00 AM. Trial Date (Est. 5 to 7 Days) set for 8/24/2021 at 8:30 AM. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12) Tue 06/16 4:16 PM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 5/28/2021. (iv)
Related: [-]
14 14 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 06/16 11:48 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Pursuant to the Central District of California's Continuity of Operations Plan (COOP), the Court VACATES the Scheduling Conference set for 06/22/2020 at 11:00am. No appearances shall be made. The Court will review the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and issue pretrial and trial dates by separate order. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smom)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 08, 2020
13 13 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Mon 06/08 7:44 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3 days, filed by Plaintiff John Malkin..(Rothschild, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A
Monday, April 27, 2020
12 12 cs_rasgn Reassign Case upon Recusal of Magistrate Judge (CV-110) Mon 04/27 5:34 PM
ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT UPON RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment Discovery pursuant to General Order 05-07. Case randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-03377 MWF(SKx). (rn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 16, 2020
11 11 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Thu 04/16 8:55 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Scheduling Conference set for June 22, 2020 at 11:00 AM. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (lom)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 13, 2020
10 10 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 04/13 5:55 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 04/13 5:55 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (ghap)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Mon 04/13 3:01 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Working Title Films Limited, re Declaration3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)4 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties5 , Declaration2 (Supplemental Proof of Service) (Weiner, Joel)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice (Other) Mon 04/13 2:56 PM
NOTICE of Compliance re Removal filed by Defendants NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Working Title Films Limited. (Weiner, Joel)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 10, 2020
6 6 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Fri 04/10 6:53 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Working Title Films Limited, re Declaration3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)4 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties5 , Declaration2 (Weiner, Joel)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 04/10 5:25 PM
Disclosure Statement and CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Working Title Films Limited, identifying NBCUniversal Media, LLC; Working Title Films Limited; and Comcast Corporation. (Weiner, Joel)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 04/10 5:22 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Working Title Films Limited. (Weiner, Joel)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Declaration Fri 04/10 5:21 PM
DECLARATION of Gabriela Kornzweig re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,1 filed by Defendants NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Working Title Films Limited. (Weiner, Joel)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Declaration Fri 04/10 5:18 PM
DECLARATION of Katherine M. Motsinger re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,1 filed by Defendants NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Working Title Films Limited. (Motsinger, Katherine)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 04/10 5:13 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from California Superior Court, County of Los Angeles, case number 20STCV09711 Receipt No: ACACDC-26050982 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Working Title Films Limited, NBCUniversal Media, LLC. (Attorney Joel R Weiner added to party NBCUniversal Media, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Joel R Weiner added to party Working Title Films Limited (pty:dft))(Weiner, Joel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Summons,
Att: 2 8 pgs Exhibit B - Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Civil Case Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - ADR Information Package,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Notice of Case Assignment,
Att: 7 Exhibit G - First Amended General Order,
Att: 8 Exhibit H - Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulations,
Att: 9 Exhibit I - Proof of Service of Summons,
Att: 10 Exhibit J - Answer
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Mon 04/13 5:24 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 10, inclusive, NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Universal Pictures, Inc., Working Title Films Limited., filed by plaintiff John Malkin. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 3/10/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B) (ghap)
Related: [-]
service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 04/13 5:27 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff John Malkin, upon Defendant NBCUniversal Media, LLC served on 3/13/2020, answer due 4/3/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Registered Agent, by Serving Jesse Gastelum- Authorized Agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 3/15/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT I) (ghap)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Mon 04/13 5:29 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendants NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Working Title Films Limited. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/10/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT J)(ghap)
Related: [-]