Iowa Northern District Court
Judge:Linda R Reade
Case #: 3:20-cv-03011
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Apr 13, 2020
Terminated:Jun 01, 2020
Case in other court:Iowa Southern, 4:20-cv-00125
Last checked: Saturday Oct 10, 2020 5:50 AM CDT
Defendant
Clark Heckman
Defendant
Heckman Management Corp
1407 SE Sparta Road
Faucett, MO 64448
Plaintiff
Nutriquest, LLC
3782 9th Street, SW, Suite 1
Mason City, IA 50401
Represented By
Thomas Story
Brown Winick Graves Gross Bakerville Schoenebaum, PLC
contact info
Jennifer Erin Lindberg
Brownwinick Law Firm
contact info
Michael R Blaser
Brown Winick Graves Gross Baskerville Schoenebaum
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, June 01, 2020
13 13 4 pgs order Order on Unresisted Motion Mon 06/01 10:55 AM
ORDER granting12 Unresisted Motion to Transfer to Southern District of Iowa. The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Iowa. After transfer has been effectuated, the Clerk of Court shall close this case. Signed by Judge Linda R Reade on 6/1/20. (ksy)
Related: [-]
utility Case Transferred Out - District Mon 06/01 10:58 AM
Case electronically transferred to District of Southern Iowa. (ksy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 28, 2020
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 05/28 12:16 PM
Judge Linda R Reade added (no conflicts identified). Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts no longer assigned to case as presider. (pac)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 27, 2020
12 12 motion UNRESISTED Motion Wed 05/27 4:47 PM
UNRESISTED Motion for Transfer to Southern District of Iowa by Plaintiff Nutriquest, LLC (Story, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 30, 2020
11 11 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 04/30 3:22 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Nutriquest, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Lewis & Clark F II NQ Blocker, Inc., Other Affiliate Lewis & Clark RBIC Fund II, L.P., Other Affiliate NutriQuest Exports, Inc., Other Affiliate Research Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Hagen Swine Consulting, LLC for Nutriquest, LLC. (Story, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 16, 2020
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 04/16 8:35 AM
Set Deadlines: Defendant Heckman Managment Corp's LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 5/14/2020. Scheduling Report due by 7/8/2020. (jjh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 15, 2020
10 10 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 04/15 1:28 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Nutriquest, LLC. Clark Heckman waiver sent on 4/14/2020, answer due 6/15/2020. (Story, Thomas)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 04/15 1:25 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Nutriquest, LLC. Heckman Management Corp. waiver sent on 4/14/2020, answer due 6/15/2020. (Story, Thomas)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/15 12:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Erin Lindberg on behalf of Nutriquest, LLC. (Lindberg, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 04/15 10:55 AM
Set Deadline: Plaintiff's LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 4/30/2020. (pac)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 14, 2020
7 7 service Summons Issued Tue 04/14 10:33 AM
Summons Issued as to Clark Heckman, Heckman Management Corp.. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (copy w/NEF to atty Blaser) (jag)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Actions New Case Packet
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Tue 04/14 10:29 AM
NOTICE to attorney Michael R. Blaser not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Iowa as to Plaintiff Nutriquest, LLC (copy w/NEF to atty Blaser) (jag)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 13, 2020
5 5 notice Notice - MJ Case Assignment Mon 04/13 4:21 PM
NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 5/13/2020. (jag)
Related: [-]
4 4 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Mon 04/13 4:09 PM
Case transferred in from District of Iowa Southern; Case Number 4:20-cv-00125. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. NORTHERN DISTRICT OF IOWA DOCKET BEGINS HERE (copy of docket sheet to non-ecf filer) Modified on 4/13/2020 (jag).
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 04/13 4:15 PM
Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. No conflicts identified. (jag)
Related: [-]
***Civil Case Terminated. Case electronically transferred to IAND. (slg) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 4/13/2020.]
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 11, 2020
3 3 ORDER granting2 Motion to Transfer Case. Signed by Chief Judge John A. Jarvey on 4/11/2020. (mem) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 4/13/2020.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 09, 2020
2 2 MOTION to Transfer Case out of Southern District of Iowa by Nutriquest, LLC. Responses due by 4/23/2020. (Story, Thomas) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 4/13/2020.]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-4108949., filed by Nutriquest, LLC. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 7/8/2020. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 7/8/2020.(Story, Thomas) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 4/13/2020.]
Related: [-]