California Northern District Court
Judge:William H Orrick
Case #: 3:20-cv-02553
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Apr 13, 2020
Terminated:Dec 10, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Oct 10, 2020 6:30 AM PDT
Defendant
Mother Murphy's Labs, Inc
Defendant
Philip Morris, USA, Inc.
Defendant
Juul Labs, Inc.
Defendant
Hoyoung Huh
Defendant
Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc.
Defendant
eliquidtech, Inc.
Defendant
Riaz Valani
Defendant
Tobacco Technology, Inc.
600 Liberty Road
Eldersburg, MD 21784
Defendant
Nicholas Pritzker
Defendant
James Monsees
Defendant
McLane Company, Inc.
Defendant
Eby-Brown Company, LLC
1415 W. Diehl Road Suite 300 N
Naperville, IL 60563
Defendant
Adam Bowen
Defendant
Altria Group Inc.
Defendant
Altria Group Distribution Company
6601 W Broad Street
Richmond, VA 23230
Defendant
Altria Enterprises LLC
6601 W Broad Street
Richmona, VA 23230
Defendant
Altria Client Services LLC
601 W Broad Street
Richmond, VA 23230
Defendant
Alternative Ingredients, Inc.
2826 South Elm-Eugene Street
Greensboro, NC 27406
Plaintiff
Shayla Aceti
Represented By
Jason Samual Rathod
Migliaccio And Rathod LLP
contact info
Ashley M Pileika
Migliaccio And Rathod LLP
contact info
Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Migliaccio & Rathod LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, April 14, 2025
8 8 motion Dismiss Mon 04/14 11:52 AM
First MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice Non-Opt Out Plaintiffs' Claims filed by Juul Labs, Inc.. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 5/21/2025 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Responses due by 4/28/2025. Replies due by 5/5/2025.(Danninger, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Declaration of Morgan M. Meador,
Att: 5 Declaration of Timothy S. Danninger
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
utility MDL Member Case Closed Tue 12/10 11:58 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE CLOSED: Pursuant to the Court's order of 12/09/2024 in the MDL 19-md-2913 master file (dkt. #4351), civil case no. 20-cv-2553 is terminated. cc: JPMDL (jmd, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility MDL Member Case Closed Tue 12/10 3:19 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE CLOSED: Pursuant to 3:19-md-02913-WHO dkt# 4351 ORDER REGARDING CLAIMS RIPE FOR DISMISSAL AGAINST ALTRIA civil case no. 20-02553 is terminated. cc: JPMDL (kab-adi, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 22, 2021
7 7 misc Transcript Mon 02/22 6:11 PM
Transcript of Proceedings held on 02/19/2021, before Judge William H. Orrick. Court Reporter Ruth Levine Ekhaus, RDR, FCRR, CSR No. 12219, telephone number (415)336-5223/ruth_ekhaus@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Related [+] Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/24/2021. (rreS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-] (1444 in 3:19-md-02913-WHO) Transcript Order, (1442 in 3:19-md-02913-WHO) Transcript Order, (1443 in 3:19-md-02913-WHO) Transcript Order,
Monday, July 27, 2020
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 07/27 4:37 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shayla Aceti. All Defendants. (Pileika, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 09, 2020
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 07/09 7:19 PM
Summons Issued as to Defendants Alternative Ingredients, Inc., Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Enterprises LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group Inc., Adam Bowen, Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc., Eby-Brown Company, LLC, Hoyoung Huh, Juul Labs, Inc., McLane Company, Inc., James Monsees, Mother Murphy's Labs, Inc, Philip Morris, USA, Inc., Nicholas Pritzker, Tobacco Technology, Inc., Riaz Valani, eliquidtech, Inc.. (tnS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 08, 2020
4 4 misc Proposed Summons Wed 07/08 11:57 AM
Proposed Summons. (Pileika, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 16, 2020
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Thu 04/16 10:06 AM
Case assigned to Judge William H. Orrick. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (bwS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc New Case Filing Fee Thu 04/16 8:27 AM
FEE PAID (Filing fee$400,receipt number 0971-14379802). (Rathod, Jason)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Thu 04/16 9:28 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Case been assigned to Judge. However, incorrect Civil Cover Sheet used at case opening of JS 44 09/19. Please complete and refile in its entirety as a separate docket entry correct Civil Cover Sheet of JS CAND 44 Related [+] Re:1 Complaint filed by Shayla Aceti (bwS, COURT STAFF) Modified on 4/16/2020 (bwS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-] v. 07/19
utility Create Case Association Fri 04/17 5:16 PM
Cases associated: Create association to 3:19-md-02913-WHO. (tnS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility MDL Member Case Fri 04/17 5:20 PM
DIRECT FILED MEMBER CASE OPENED re 19-md-2913-WHO: Shayla Aceti v. Juuls Labs, Inc., et al, Opened in California Northern District as 3:20-cv-02553-WHO cc: JPMDL (tnS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 14, 2020
utility Electronic Filing Error Tue 04/14 9:20 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . NOTICE OF NON-PAYMENT Please be advised that the filing fee has not been received in this case. The fee must be paid within two business days or the ca se will be subject to termination. Please pay the filing fee through Pay.gov by clicking on Civil > Other Documents > New Case Filing Fee in CM/ECF. (ajsS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 13, 2020
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 04/13 11:15 PM
COMPLAINT (Short Form - Personal Injury) against All Defendants. Filed byShayla Aceti.(Rathod, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet