Consolidated
Lead case: 1:19-cv-05000

Alabama Southern District Court
Case #: 1:20-cv-00220
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Apr 15, 2020
Terminated:Nov 13, 2020
Case in other court:Alabama Northern, 2:20-cv-00225
Last checked: Monday Oct 12, 2020 4:53 AM CDT
Defendant
BP America Production Company
Represented By
Robert Jackson Sewell
Lightfoot, Franklin, & White LLC
contact info
William H. Morrow
Lightfoot, Franklin & White
contact info
Enrique Jose Gimenez
Lightfoot, Franklin & White
contact info
Defendant
BP Exploration & Production Inc
Represented By
Robert Jackson Sewell
Lightfoot, Franklin, & White LLC
contact info
Enrique Jose Gimenez
Lightfoot, Franklin & White
contact info
Plaintiff
Tommy Bickerstaff
Represented By
Eric D. Hoaglund
Mccallum, Hoaglund & Irby, LLP
contact info
Nathan Lee Nelson
The Downs Law Group
contact info
Jason Larey
Downs Law Group
contact info
Gabriel Hawa
contact info
K. Edward Sexton, II
Gentle Turner Sexton & Harbison, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, November 13, 2020
43 43 notice Clerks Notice of Closing Fri 11/13 9:41 AM
Clerk's Notice of Closing pursuant to 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), per doc.42 , dismissing case with prejudice. No order will be entered. See Anago Franchising, Inc. v. Shaz, LLC, 677 F. 3d 1272 (11th Cir. 2012). (srd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 12, 2020
42 42 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 11/12 4:30 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Tommy Bickerstaff. (Larey, Jason)
Related: [-]
utility Document Referred Fri 11/13 9:37 AM
REFERRAL OF42 Stipulation of Dismissal to Judge DuBose. (srd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 13, 2020
41 41 order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Tue 10/13 5:18 PM
ORDER granting40 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Gabriel Hawa and Nathan Lee Nelson terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 10-13-20. (lly)
Related: [-]
40 40 motion Withdraw as Attorney Tue 10/13 11:30 AM
MOTION for Gabriel Hawa and Nathan L. Nelson to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Tommy Bickerstaff. (Larey, Jason)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Tue 10/13 4:51 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED:40 MOTION for Gabriel Hawa and Nathan L. Nelson to Withdraw as Attorney Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (srd)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 31, 2020
39 39 order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Mon 08/31 3:12 PM
ORDER granting38 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney William H. Morrow terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 8-31-20. (lly)
Related: [-]
38 38 motion Withdraw as Attorney Mon 08/31 11:44 AM
MOTION for William Morrow and Jackson Knouse to Withdraw as Attorney filed by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Morrow, William)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Mon 08/31 3:02 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED:38 MOTION for William Morrow and Jackson Knouse to Withdraw as Attorney Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (srd)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 28, 2020
37 37 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 08/28 10:51 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Enrique Jose Gimenez on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc (Gimenez, Enrique)
Related: [-]
36 36 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 08/28 10:42 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Jackson Sewell on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc (Sewell, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 11, 2020
notice Notice of Appearance Pro Hac Vice - BELO Cases Only Tue 08/11 12:48 PM
Notice of Appearance Pro Hac Vice by Jason M. Larey. Pursuant to the Case Management Order entered in 19-cv-5000-KD-MU-C only the pro hac vice fee is being paid. I certify that documentation has been previously filed in 20-cv-00055. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2658976, Online Credit Card Payment.) (Larey, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 01, 2020
35 35 discov Notice of Filing Discovery Wed 07/01 12:47 PM
Notice of Filing Notice of Service of Discovery filed by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Morrow, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 08, 2020
34 34 discov Notice of Filing Discovery Mon 06/08 10:28 AM
Notice of Filing Plaintiff's Responses to Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories filed by Tommy Bickerstaff. (Hawa, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 18, 2020
33 33 discov Notice of Filing Discovery Mon 05/18 2:38 PM
Notice of Filing Plaintiff's First Request for Production and First Set of Interrogatories to Defendants filed by Tommy Bickerstaff. (Hawa, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
32 32 discov Notice of Filing Discovery Mon 05/18 1:03 PM
Notice of Filing Plaintiff's Responses to Defendants' Request for Production filed by Tommy Bickerstaff. (Hawa, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 17, 2020
31 31 discov Notice of Filing Discovery Fri 04/17 4:56 PM
Notice of Filing Notice of Service of Discovery filed by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Morrow, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 15, 2020
30 30 3 pgs order Order Wed 04/15 2:48 PM
Omnibus Order Modifying BELO Case Management Order re: (1 in 1:19-cv-05000-KD-MU-C). Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 09/04/2019. (srd)
Related: [-]
29 29 15 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Wed 04/15 2:44 PM
BELO Case Management Order. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 05/29/2019. (srd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Protective Order,
Att: 2 HIPAA Protective Order,
Att: 3 Authorization
28 28 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Wed 04/15 2:16 PM
Case transferred in from District of Alabama Northern; Case Number 2:20-cv-00225. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
27 27 2 pgs order Order Wed 04/15 12:19 PM
ORDER26 Joint Motion to Transfer Venue is GRANTED ; ORDER transferring case to the District of Southern Alabama. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 4/15/2020. (KAM) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/15/2020.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 09, 2020
26 26 Joint MOTION to Change Venue by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc.(Morrow, William) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/15/2020.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Monday, April 06, 2020
25 25 INITIAL ORDER - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 4/6/2020. (KAM) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/15/2020.]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 03, 2020
24 24 NOTICE by Tommy Bickerstaff re 23 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear,,,,,,, Notice of Compliance (Hawa, Gabriel) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/15/2020.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 26, 2020
23 23 TEXT ORDER This matter is before the court on Attorney Nathan Nelson and Attorney Gabriel Hawas Motions for to Appear Pro Hac Vice20 21 . The Motions20 21 are CONDITIONALLY GRANTED . On or before April 10, 2020 , Attorney Nelson and Attorney Hawa SHALL certify to the court that they have read and understand: (a) any local rules applicable in this District; (b) the Alabama State Bar Code of Professional Courtesy and the Lawyers Creed, which can be accessed at: https://www.alabar.org/membership/code-of-professional-courtesy/, https://www.alabar.org/membership/lawyers-creed/; and (c) this courts CM/ECF requirements. Failure to submit the above items will result in vacatur of the conditional grant of the motion.. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 3/26/2020. (KAM) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/15/2020.]
Related: [-]
22 22 NOTICE of Appearance by K Edward Sexton, II on behalf of Tommy Bickerstaff (Sexton, K) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/15/2020.]
Related: [-]
21 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Gabriel Hawa) by Tommy Bickerstaff. (Hoaglund, Eric) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/15/2020.]
Related: [-]
20 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Nathan Nelson) by Tommy Bickerstaff. (Hoaglund, Eric) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/15/2020.]
Related: [-]
19 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric D Hoaglund on behalf of Tommy Bickerstaff (Hoaglund, Eric) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/15/2020.]
Related: [-]
PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3563615. (Hoaglund, Eric) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/15/2020.]
Related: [-]
PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3563618. (Hoaglund, Eric) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/15/2020.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 25, 2020
18 18 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT -The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable R. David Proctor. Please use case number 2:20-cv-225-RDP on all subsequent pleadings. (AKD) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/15/2020.]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 20, 2020
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John H England, III: Telephone Conference held on 3/20/2020; Attorney Gabriel Hawa (pro hac required) present by phone for pltf; Attorney William Morrow present by phone for dfts; consent process discussed; conf adj. (AVC) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/15/2020.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 11, 2020
17 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BP America Production Company. filed by BP America Production Company (Knouse, Jackson) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/15/2020.]
Related: [-]
16 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BP Exploration & Production Inc. filed by BP Exploration & Production Inc (Knouse, Jackson) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/15/2020.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2020
15 15 TEXT ORDER granting14 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorneys Catherine Pyune McEldowney; Don Keller Haycraft and Kevin Michael Hodges terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 2/26/2020. (CDG) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/15/2020.]
Related: [-]
14 14 MOTION to Substitute Attorney (and withdraw) Motion is RIPE 2/26/2020 . Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion. Filed by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Prater, Harlan) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/15/2020.]
Related: [-]
13 13 ORDER REGARDINGCOMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26(f) . Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 02/26/2020. (AKD) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/15/2020.]
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(c) no later than April 6, 2020 . In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after April 6, 2020 . A telephone status conference is hereby SET for March 20, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. . The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-873-8017 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 4577302 . The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 02/26/2020. (AKD) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/15/2020.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2020
11 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Harlan Irby Prater, IV on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc (Prater, Harlan) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/15/2020.]
Related: [-]
10 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jackson Eric Knouse on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc (Knouse, Jackson) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/15/2020.]
Related: [-]
9 9 NOTICE of Appearance by William H Morrow on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc (Morrow, William) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/15/2020.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2020
8 8 NOTICE OF CONSENT to a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AKD) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/15/2020.]
Related: [-]
7 7 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-13188. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/15/2020.]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 2/19/2020. (NEF: Sect J)(caa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/19/2020.] [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/15/2020.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2020
5 5 Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue Related [+] [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/19/2020.] [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/15/2020.]
Related: [-] id, Devin
Monday, November 18, 2019
4 4 ANSWER to1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Devin C. Reid added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Devin C. Reid added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft) Related [+] [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/19/2020.] [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/15/2020.]
Related: [-] id, Devin
Friday, October 18, 2019
3 3 INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDERS NO.1 AND AMENDED ORDER NO.2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/30/2015.(cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/19/2020.] [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/15/2020.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 BELO Settlement Agreement
2 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (go) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/19/2020.] [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/15/2020.]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7910892) filed by Tommy Bickerstaff.Attorney Nathan Lee Nelson added to party Tommy Bickerstaff(pty:pla).(Nelson, Nathan) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/19/2020.] [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/15/2020.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Election Not to Mediate,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet