George T. Kelly, III v. The Aliera Companies, Inc. et al
Missouri Western District Court | |
Judge: | M Douglas Harpool |
Case #: | 3:20-cv-05038 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2020 |
Terminated: | Apr 16, 2024 |
Case in other court: | 8th Cir USCA, 20-03702 |
Last checked: Monday Oct 12, 2020 3:45 AM CDT |
Defendant
The Aliera Companies, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Trinity Healthshare, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Boogher
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George T Kelly, III
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
115 | 115
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss Case
Tue 04/16 10:33 AM
ORDER granting114 motion to dismiss case. Signed on 4/16/24 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
114 | 114
motion
Dismiss Case
Mon 04/15 4:25 PM
MOTION to dismiss case filed by Eleanor Hamburger on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/29/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Hamburger, Eleanor) |
|
113 | 113
appeal
USCA Mandate
Mon 04/15 3:32 PM
MANDATE of US COURT OF APPEALS as to77 Notice of Appeal filed by The Aliera Companies, Inc. with mandate issued on 4/9/2024. (Furtak, Rebecca) |
|
112 | 112
appeal
USCA Judgment and/or Opinion
Mon 04/15 3:26 PM
USCA Judgment as to77 Notice of Appeal filed by The Aliera Companies, Inc. This is a preliminary judgment of U.S. Court of Appeals; jurisdiction is not recovered until the Mandate is issued by the U.S Court of Appeals. (Furtak, Rebecca) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
111 | 111
order
Order
Tue 04/09 10:28 AM
ORDER. On January 13, 2022, the Eighth Circuit dismissed the appeal in this case for failure to prosecute. The Eighth Circuit subsequently issued its mandate. The Court hereby Orders Plaintiffs to show cause why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Plaintiffs' response shall be filed no later than April 19, 2024. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (KBR) |