USA v. Gude
California Eastern District Court | |
Case #: | 2:20-mj-00068 |
Case Filed: | Apr 13, 2020 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 16, 2020 12:21 AM PDT |
Defendant
Christopher Gude (1)
|
|
Plaintiff
USA
|
![]() DETENTION ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/16/2020 as to Christopher Gude. (Becknal, R) |
Docket last updated: 04/16/2020 12:41 AM PDT |
Monday, April 13, 2020 | ||
RULE 5(c)(3) ARREST from Eastern District of New York. Case 2:18-cr-00664-JS as to Christopher Gude (1). (Waldrop, A) |