Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02741

California Northern District Court
Judge:Vince Chhabria
Case #: 3:20-cv-02564
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Apr 14, 2020
Case in other court:Georgia Southern, 2:20-cv-00026
Last checked: Sunday Oct 11, 2020 3:01 AM PDT
Defendant
Monsanto Company
Represented By
Joe G. Hollingsworth
Hollingsworth LLP
contact info
Eric G. Lasker
Hollingsworth LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Brenda Faye Carter
Represented By
Seth M. Diamond
Morgan & Morgan
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Thursday, June 11, 2020
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 06/11 9:57 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byMonsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Thu 06/11 9:56 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Thu 06/11 9:55 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 17, 2020
utility MDL Member Case Fri 04/17 11:38 AM
MEMBER CASE OPENED MDL 2741: Southern District of Georgia (Brunswick), 2:20-cv-00026-LGW-BWC, Carter v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:20-cv-02564-VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 201 cc: JPMDL (elyS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 15, 2020
5 5 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Wed 04/15 12:34 PM
Case transferred in from District of Georgia Southern; Case Number 2:20-cv-00026. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Friday, April 10, 2020
4 4 ORDER transferring this action to MDL, Northern District of California. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on 04/10/2020. (MG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 MDL Text Entry
Tuesday, March 10, 2020
3 3 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (csr)
Related: [-]
2 2 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 3/10/2020. (csr)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company, filed by Brenda Faye Carter. $400.00 Filing Fee Paid - Receipt Number: 113J-2799859. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (csr)
Related: [-]