JONES v. EASTERN AIRLINES, LLC et al
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | R Barclay Surrick |
Case #: | 2:20-cv-01927 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2020 |
Terminated: | Nov 30, 2022 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 13, 2020 4:44 AM EDT |
Defendant
EASTERN AIRLINES, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
STEVE HARFST
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JOSEPH MAROTTA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
STEPHANIE JONES
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, November 30, 2022 | ||
25 | 25
![]() ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 11/30/22. 11/30/22 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL) |
|
Friday, November 11, 2022 | ||
24 | 24
![]() STIPULATION OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL by STEPHANIE JONES. (RYAN, M.) |
|
Friday, March 04, 2022 | ||
23 | 23
![]() RESPONSE in Support re21 MOTION to Amend/Correct15 Amended Complaint filed by STEPHANIE JONES.(SWEENEY, EDWARD) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, February 25, 2022 | ||
22 | 22
![]() RESPONSE in Opposition re21 MOTION to Amend/Correct15 Amended Complaint filed by EASTERN AIRLINES, LLC, STEVE HARFST, JOSEPH MAROTTA.(SALOMAN, MARK) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Friday, February 11, 2022 | ||
21 | 21
![]() MOTION to Amend/Correct15 Amended Complaint filed by STEPHANIE JONES.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(SWEENEY, EDWARD) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Wednesday, August 04, 2021 | ||
20 | 20
![]() RESPONSE in Support re17 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6) filed by EASTERN AIRLINES, LLC, STEVE HARFST, JOSEPH MAROTTA.(SALOMAN, MARK) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, July 28, 2021 | ||
19 | 19
![]() RESPONSE in Opposition re17 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6) filed by STEPHANIE JONES.(RYAN, M.) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, July 21, 2021 | ||
18 | 18
![]() RESPONSE in Support re14 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by EASTERN AIRLINES, LLC, STEVE HARFST, JOSEPH MAROTTA. (SALOMAN, MARK) |
|
Wednesday, July 14, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
![]() MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6) filed by EASTERN AIRLINES, LLC, STEVE HARFST, JOSEPH MAROTTA.Memorandum.(SALOMAN, MARK) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Monday, July 12, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
![]() RESPONSE in Opposition re14 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by STEPHANIE JONES.(RYAN, M.) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, June 30, 2021 | ||
15 | 15
![]() AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by STEPHANIE JONES.(SWEENEY, EDWARD) |
|
Monday, June 28, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
![]() MOTION for Reconsideration filed by EASTERN AIRLINES, LLC, STEVE HARFST, JOSEPH MAROTTA.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(SALOMAN, MARK) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Wednesday, June 16, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
![]() ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIEDD IN PART. COUNT VII IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. PLAINTIFF MAY FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHIN 14 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 6/16/21. 6/16/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL ) |
|
12 | 12
![]() MEMORANDUM; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 6/16/21. 6/16/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL ) |
|
Monday, August 10, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
![]() RESPONSE in Opposition re7 MOTION to Dismiss Surreply Brief filed by STEPHANIE JONES.(RYAN, M.) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, August 06, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Memorandum OF LAW IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT by EASTERN AIRLINES, LLC, STEVE HARFST, JOSEPH MAROTTA. (SALOMAN, MARK) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, July 30, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
![]() RESPONSE in Opposition re7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Under Rule 12(b)(6) filed by STEPHANIE JONES.(SWEENEY, EDWARD) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Thursday, July 16, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
![]() ORDER DISMISSING AS MOOT ECF4 , MOTION TO DISMISS, AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 07/16/20.07/16/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(dmd,) |
|
7 | 7
![]() MOTION to Dismiss filed by EASTERN AIRLINES, LLC, STEVE HARFST, JOSEPH MAROTTA.Notice of Motion, Memorandum of Law, Appendix of Unpublished Cases, Proposed Order, Certification of Service.(SALOMAN, MARK) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Thursday, July 02, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
![]() AMENDED COMPLAINT against EASTERN AIRLINES, LLC, STEVE HARFST, JOSEPH MAROTTA, filed by STEPHANIE JONES.(SWEENEY, EDWARD) |
|
Friday, June 19, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Memorandum Appendix of Unpublished Cases in Support of Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6) re4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint with Prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by EASTERN AIRLINES, LLC, STEVE HARFST, JOSEPH MAROTTA. (SALOMAN, MARK) |
|
4 | 4
![]() MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint with Prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by EASTERN AIRLINES, LLC, STEVE HARFST, JOSEPH MAROTTA.Memorandum, Appendix of Unpublished Cases, Certificate of Service.(SALOMAN, MARK) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Thursday, April 23, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by STEPHANIE JONES. EASTERN AIRLINES, LLC waiver sent on 4/20/2020, answer due 6/19/2020; STEVE HARFST waiver sent on 4/20/2020, answer due 6/19/2020; JOSEPH MAROTTA waiver sent on 4/20/2020, answer due 6/19/2020. (SWEENEY, EDWARD) |
|
Wednesday, April 22, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by MARK A. SALOMAN on behalf of EASTERN AIRLINES, LLC, STEVE HARFST, JOSEPH MAROTTA (SALOMAN, MARK) |
|
Friday, April 17, 2020 | ||
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/17 9:00 AM
Summons Issued as to EASTERN AIRLINES, LLC, STEVE HARFST, JOSEPH MAROTTA. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 4/17/20 (jl, ) |
||
Thursday, April 16, 2020 | ||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against EASTERN AIRLINES, LLC, STEVE HARFST, JOSEPH MAROTTA ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14241359.), filed by STEPHANIE JONES.(SWEENEY, EDWARD) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
misc
Jury Demand
Fri 04/17 8:24 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by STEPHANIE JONES. (fb) |