United States of America v. Dr Ray L Nannis PC et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Jane J Boyle |
Case #: | 3:20-cv-00940 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1345 USA Plaintiff |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2020 |
Terminated: | Apr 27, 2020 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 13, 2020 3:25 AM CDT |
Defendant
Dr Ray L Nannis PC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ray L Nannis
|
|
Plaintiff
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Monday, April 27, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order
Mon 04/27 3:58 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: In light of the Court's entry of15 Agreed Final Judgment of Permanent Injunction, the Court hereby VACATES11 Order Setting Hearing and directs the Clerk of Court to close this case. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 4/27/2020) (chmb) |
|
15 | 15
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Judgment
Mon 04/27 3:43 PM
AGREED JUDGMENT OF PERMANENT INJUNCTION: Granting13 Agreed Motion for Entry of Judgment of Permanent Injunction. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 4/27/2020) (svc) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Additional Attachments to Main Document
Mon 04/27 10:52 AM
ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to13 Motion for Judgment by Plaintiff United States of America. (Robbins-DOJ, Andrew) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Judgment
Mon 04/27 10:44 AM
Agreed MOTION for Judgment of Permanent Injunction filed by United States of America with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Robbins-DOJ, Andrew) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case (Optional)
Tue 05/12 10:12 AM
Civil Case Terminated per15 Agreed Judgment of Permanent Injunction. (ctf) |
||
Wednesday, April 22, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Wed 04/22 2:49 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert C Hinton, Jr on behalf of Dr Ray L Nannis PC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Hinton, Robert) |
|
11 | 11
2
pgs
order
Order Setting Deadline/Hearing
Wed 04/22 10:13 AM
ORDER SETTING HEARING: Telephone Hearing set for 4/30/2020 10:00 AM before Judge Jane J. Boyle for consideration of the United States request for a preliminary injunction. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 4/22/2020) (svc) |
|
Friday, April 17, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
minutes
Motion Hearing
Fri 05/01 10:06 AM
ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jane J. Boyle: Motion Hearing via teleconference held on 4/17/2020 5 Emergency Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue. TRO entered. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Kenneth Coffin and Andrew Robbins; Defense - Ray L Nannis. (Court Reporter: Todd Anderson) (No exhibits) Time in Court - 0:28. (chmb) Modified to correct filed date on 5/1/2020 (chmb) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 04/17 1:01 PM
NOTICE of Service to Defendants filed by United States of America (Robbins-DOJ, Andrew) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/17 8:53 AM
Summons Issued as to Dr Ray L Nannis PC, Ray L Nannis. (oyh) (Main Document 8 replaced on 4/17/2020) (oyh) |
|
7 | 7
qcref
Boyle
Fri 04/17 8:49 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee is not due for this case. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh) |
|
Thursday, April 16, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Thu 04/16 5:50 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United States of America. (Robbins-DOJ, Andrew) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/16 5:45 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by United States of America. (Filer fee note- Filed by the USA) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Robbins-DOJ, Andrew) |