Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Amy Totenberg
Case #: 1:14-cv-01197
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2014
Terminated:Aug 13, 2014
Last checked: Sunday Dec 14, 2014 11:08 PM EST
Defendant
MRS BPO, LLC
Represented By
Wendi Erin Fassbender
Sessions, Fishman, Nathan & Isreal, LLC
contact info
Defendant
NCO Financial Systems, Inc.
Represented By
Wendi Erin Fassbender
Sessions, Fishman, Nathan & Isreal, LLC
contact info
Defendant
National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2004-1
Defendant
National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2005-1
Defendant
National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2005-3
Defendant
Weltman, Weinberg & Reis, Co., L.P.A.
Plaintiff
Rhea Davis
Represented By
Christopher Neil Armor
Armor Law, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, August 13, 2014
16 16 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Rhea Davis. (Armor, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING16 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii). (hfm)
Related: [-]
Civil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge E. Clayton Scofield, III terminated from case. (hfm)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 14, 2014
15 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Approving13 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan and NOTICE to Parties Regarding Summary Judgment Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clayton Scofield, III on 7/14/2014. (bdb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 24, 2014
14 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Rhea Davis. MRS BPO, LLC waiver mailed on 5/14/2014, answer due 7/14/2014. (Armor, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 20, 2014
13 13 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Rhea Davis. (Armor, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 13, 2014
12 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Rhea Davis. National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2005-3 waiver mailed on 6/10/2014, answer due 8/11/2014. (Armor, Christopher)
Related: [-]
11 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Rhea Davis. National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2005-1 waiver mailed on 6/10/2014, answer due 8/11/2014. (Armor, Christopher)
Related: [-]
10 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Rhea Davis. National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2004-1 waiver mailed on 6/10/2014, answer due 8/11/2014. (Armor, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 09, 2014
9 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MRS BPO, LLC by MRS BPO, LLC.(Fassbender, Wendi)
Related: [-]
8 8 ANSWER to1 COMPLAINT by MRS BPO, LLC.(Fassbender, Wendi) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 21, 2014
7 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Rhea Davis. Weltman, Weinberg & Reis, Co., L.P.A. waiver mailed on 5/14/2014, answer due 7/14/2014. (Armor, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 20, 2014
6 6 Notice to Parties and Guidelines for Discovery and Motion Practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clayton Scofield, III on 5/20/14. (hfm)
Related: [-]
5 5 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by NCO Financial Systems, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent One Equity Partners, Corporate Parent Expert Global Solutions, Inc., Corporate Parent EGS Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Compass International Services Corporation for NCO Financial Systems, Inc.. (Fassbender, Wendi)
Related: [-]
4 4 ANSWER to1 COMPLAINT by NCO Financial Systems, Inc.. Discovery ends on 10/17/2014.(Fassbender, Wendi) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2014
3 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Summons, Civil Cover Sheet , as to NCO Financial Systems, Inc.. (Armor, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2014
2 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to MRS BPO, LLC, NCO Financial Systems, Inc., National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2004-1, National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2005-1, National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2005-3, Weltman, Weinberg & Reis, Co., L.P.A.(cem)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons for NCO Financial Systems, Inc.,
Att: 2 Summons for MRS BPO, LLC,
Att: 3 Summons for National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2004-1,
Att: 4 Summons for National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2005-1,
Att: 5 Summons for National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2005-3
1 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Rhea Davis. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113E-5147247.)(cem) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet