Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Jerry A Funk
Case #: 3:20-bk-01311
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2020
Creditor Meeting:Jul 23, 2020
Claims Deadline:Aug 26, 2020
Converted:Jun 17, 2020
Terminated:Sep 05, 2024

TypeCorporation
# of Creditors100-199
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Diversified Consultants, Inc.
10550 Deerwood Park Blvd Ste 309
Jacksonville, FL 32256-2805
Represented By
Richard R Thames
Thames Markey & Heekin, P.A.
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Aaron R. Cohen
P.O. Box 4218
Jacksonville, FL 32201
Represented By
Raye Curry Elliott
Akerman LLP
contact info
William C Handle
Akerman LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee - JAX 11
Office of the United States Trustee George C Young Federal Building 400 West Washington Street, Suite 1100
Orlando, FL 32801
Represented By
Scott E Bomkamp
United States Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/06/2024 1:46 PM EDT
Friday, April 17, 2020
crditcrd Receipt of Filing Fee Fri 04/17 2:36 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(3:20-bk-01311) [misc,volp11a2] (1717.00). Receipt Number 64060509, Amount Paid $1717.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
court Notice to Debtor(s) Attorney Regarding Local Rule 2081-1 (Paperless Entry) Fri 04/17 9:00 PM
Debtor(s) Attorney and Unrepresented Debtor(s) are directed to comply with all requirements set forth in Local Rule 2081-1. The Court's Local Rule can be found at[LINK:http://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/localrules/rules/2081-1.pdf] . (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
1 1 4 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Fri 04/17 2:35 PM
Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. (Verify Fee). Schedules and Statements Incomplete, Statement of Financial Affairs Not Filed or Incomplete, Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Not Filed or Not Required, Filed by Richard R Thames on behalf of Diversified Consultants, Inc.. (Thames, Richard)
Related: [-]
2 2 4 pgs misc 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Fri 04/17 2:37 PM
List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Filed by Richard R Thames on behalf of Debtor Diversified Consultants, Inc.. (Thames, Richard)
Related: [-]
3 3 7 pgs misc Chapter 11 Case Management Summary Fri 04/17 2:39 PM
Chapter 11 Case Management Summary Filed by Richard R Thames on behalf of Debtor Diversified Consultants, Inc.. (Thames, Richard)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Motion for Authority to Pay Pre-Petition Wages Fri 04/17 2:42 PM
Motion for Authority to Pay Pre-Petition Wages Filed by Richard R Thames on behalf of Debtor Diversified Consultants, Inc. (Thames, Richard)
Related: [-]
5 5 164 pgs motion Motion to Use Cash Collateral Fri 04/17 2:50 PM
Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Richard R Thames on behalf of Debtor Diversified Consultants, Inc. (Thames, Richard)
Related: [-]
6 6 3 pgs misc Certificate Of Necessity Fri 04/17 3:24 PM
Certificate of Necessity to Support Request for Emergency Hearing on First Day Motions Filed by Richard R Thames on behalf of Debtor Diversified Consultants, Inc. Related [+]. (Thames, Richard)
Related: [-] 5 ,4
7 7 misc Certificate Of Service Fri 04/17 3:52 PM
Certificate of Service Re: (i) Debtor's Emergency Motion for Authority to Pay Prepetition Wages, Payroll Taxes and Benefits to its Remaining Employees [Docket No. 4], (ii) Debtors Emergency Motion for Authority to Use Cash Collateral [Docket No. 5], and (iii) Certificate of Attorney in Support of Request for Emergency Hearing on First Day Pleadings [Docket No. 6] Filed by Richard R Thames on behalf of Debtor Diversified Consultants, Inc. Related [+]. (Thames, Richard)
Related: [-] 6 ,5 ,4
8 8 notice Notice Of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 04/17 4:05 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Stephen P Drobny on behalf of Creditor Hancock Whitney Bank. (Drobny, Stephen)
Related: [-]