Kling et al v. The World Health Organization
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Cathy Seibel |
Case #: | 7:20-cv-03124 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1602 Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 20, 2020 |
Terminated: | Apr 05, 2021 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 17, 2020 4:48 AM EDT |
Defendant
The World Health Organization
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MD Richard O Kling
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Simon Allison
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patricia Hull
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shirley Morton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brenda Sutton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenya Tucker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Harold Wimbush
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Plaintiff
Gennaro Purchia
Terminated: 05/05/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steve Rotker
Terminated: 05/05/2020
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 05, 2021 | ||
41 | 41
order
Judgment - Clerk
Mon 04/05 3:16 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT re:40 Memorandum & Opinion in favor of The World Health Organization against Brenda Sutton, Harold Wimbush, Kenya Tucker, Patricia Hull, Richard O Kling, Shirley Morton, Simon Allison. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion & Order dated April 5, 2021, Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED and Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint is dismissed with prejudice; accordingly, this case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 4/5/2021) (km) |
|
Att: 1 Right to Appeal | ||
40 | 40
20
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Mon 04/05 1:19 PM
OPINION & ORDER re:32 MOTION to Dismiss / Notice of the World Health Organization's Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint filed by The World Health Organization. For the foregoing reasons, Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED and Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint is dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the pending motion, (Doc. 32), and close the case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 4/5/2021) (mml) |
|
utility
Terminate Transcript Deadlines
Mon 04/05 3:18 PM
Terminate Transcript Deadlines (km) |
||
Friday, January 22, 2021 | ||
39 | 39
misc
Letter
Fri 01/22 12:17 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Catherine Amirfar dated January 22, 2021 re: Notice of Supplemental Authority. Document filed by The World Health Organization..(Amirfar, Catherine) |
|
Att: 1 Letter from President Biden to UN Secretary-General Guterres, | ||
Att: 2 UN Depository Notification | ||
Friday, January 08, 2021 | ||
38 | 38
respm
Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Fri 01/08 8:03 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:32 MOTION to Dismiss / Notice of the World Health Organization's Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint . / Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of The World Health Organization's Motion to Dismiss . Document filed by The World Health Organization..(Amirfar, Catherine) |
|
Friday, December 18, 2020 | ||
37 | 37
30+
pgs
respm
Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
Fri 12/18 11:17 AM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:32 MOTION to Dismiss / Notice of the World Health Organization's Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint . . Document filed by Simon Allison, Patricia Hull, Richard O Kling, Shirley Morton, Brenda Sutton..(Blau, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Tuesday, November 17, 2020 | ||
36 | 36
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 11/17 6:31 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew D. Forbes on behalf of The World Health Organization..(Forbes, Matthew) |
|
Monday, November 16, 2020 | ||
35 | 35
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
Mon 11/16 1:41 PM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part34 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages: Plaintiffs may have up to 30 pages for their opposition brief. Defendant may have 15 pages for its reply if needed. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy) |
|
34 | 34
motion
File Excess Pages
Mon 11/16 11:52 AM
LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Shelly A. Leonard dated 11/16/2020. Document filed by Simon Allison, Patricia Hull, Richard O Kling, Shirley Morton, Brenda Sutton, Kenya Tucker, Harold Wimbush..(Leonard, Shelly) |
|
Monday, November 02, 2020 | ||
33 | 33
29
pgs
respm
Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Mon 11/02 7:07 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:32 MOTION to Dismiss / Notice of the World Health Organization's Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint . / Memorandum of Law in Support of the World Health Organization's Motion to Dismiss . Document filed by The World Health Organization..(Amirfar, Catherine) |
|
32 | 32
motion
Dismiss
Mon 11/02 6:59 PM
MOTION to Dismiss / Notice of the World Health Organization's Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint . Document filed by The World Health Organization..(Amirfar, Catherine) |
|
Wednesday, October 21, 2020 | ||
notice
Notice of Redesignation to Magistrate Judge
Wed 10/21 8:34 AM
NOTICE OF REDESIGNATION TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The above entitled action has been redesignated to Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause. Please note that this is a reassignment of the designation only. (ad) |
||
Thursday, October 01, 2020 | ||
31 | 31
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 10/01 11:35 AM
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint,7 Amended Complaint, against The World Health Organization with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Shirley Morton, Simon Allison, Kenya Tucker, Richard O Kling, Harold Wimbush, Brenda Sutton, Patricia Hull. Related document:1 Complaint,7 Amended Complaint,..(Blau, Steven) |
|
30 | 30
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend
Thu 10/01 10:59 AM
ORDER granting29 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Amend: Plaintiff shall re-file the Amended Complaint no later than 10/5/20. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy) |
|
29 | 29
1
pgs
motion
Extension of Time to Amend
Thu 10/01 10:44 AM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading, inadvertent filing error on 9/22/20 addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Shelly A. Leonard dated 10/01/2020. Document filed by Simon Allison, Patricia Hull, Richard O Kling, Shirley Morton, Brenda Sutton, Kenya Tucker, Harold Wimbush..(Leonard, Shelly) |
|
Friday, September 25, 2020 | ||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading
Fri 09/25 2:27 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Steven Bennett Blau to RE-FILE Document No. 28 Amended Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The amended complaint was correctly filed after the due date. Permission from Chambers will be needed for the Amended Complaint to be accepted. (pc) |
||
Thursday, September 24, 2020 | ||
28 | 28
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 09/24 9:10 AM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FRCP RULE 15 NON-COMPLIANCE - SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending25 Amended Complaint, against The World Health Organization with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Shirley Morton, Simon Allison, Kenya Tucker, Richard O Kling, Harold Wimbush, Brenda Sutton, Patricia Hull. Related document:25 Amended Complaint,..(Blau, Steven) Modified on 9/25/2020 (pc). |
|
Wednesday, September 23, 2020 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Transcript
Wed 09/23 9:11 AM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Pre-motion conference held on 9/9/2020 before Judge Cathy Seibel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Darby Ginsberg, (914) 390-4102. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/14/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/26/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/22/2020..(Ginsberg, Darby) |
|
26 | 26
misc
Notice of Filing Transcript
Wed 09/23 9:09 AM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Pre-motion conference proceeding held on 09/09/2020 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(Ginsberg, Darby) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading
Wed 09/23 2:19 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Steven Bennett Blau to RE-FILE Document No. 25 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong filer/filers were selected for the pleading; (Steve Rotker and Gennaro Purchia was previously terminated). Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj) |
||
Tuesday, September 22, 2020 | ||
25 | 25
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 09/22 12:10 PM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending7 Amended Complaint against The World Health Organization with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Shirley Morton, Gennaro Purchia, Steve Rotker, Simon Allison, Richard O Kling, Brenda Sutton, Patricia Hull. Related document:7 Amended Complaint.(Blau, Steven) Modified on 9/23/2020 (sj). |
|
Wednesday, September 09, 2020 | ||
minutes
Pre-Motion Conference
Wed 09/09 5:33 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cathy Seibel: Pre-Motion Conference held on 9/9/2020. Plaintiffs' counsel Steven Blau, Esq. appears telephonically. Defendant's counsel(s) Catherine Amirfar, Esq., Donald Donovan, Esq., and Natalie Reid, Esq. appear telephonically. Law Clerk Ryan Partelow appears telephonically. The Court grants Plaintiff leave to amend Complaint. Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint to be submitted by November 2, 2020. Defendant's Motion to be submitted by December 18, 2020; Plaintiffs' opposition due January 8, 2021. See transcript. (Court Reporter Darby Ginsberg) (wc) |
||
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cathy Seibel: Pre-Motion Conference held on 9/9/2020. Plaintiffs' counsel Steven Blau, Esq. appears telephonically. Defendant's counsel(s) Catherine Amirfar, Esq., Donald Donovan, Esq., and Natalie Reid, Esq. appear telephonically. Law Clerk Ryan Partelow appears telephonically. The Court grants Plaintiff leave to amend Complaint. Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint to be submitted by September 23, 2020. Defendant's Motion to be submitted by November 2, 2020; Plaintiffs' opposition due December 18, 2020; Defendant's reply due January 8, 2021. See transcript. (Court Reporter Darby Ginsberg) (wc) | ||
Tuesday, August 25, 2020 | ||
24 | 24
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Tue 08/25 3:36 PM
ORDER granting23 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference: Pre-Motion Conference adjourned to 9/9/20 at 2:45 pm. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy) |
|
23 | 23
motion
Adjourn Conference
Tue 08/25 12:07 PM
LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference / request to adjourn the 9/2/20 Pre-Motion Conference addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Catherine Amirfar & Donald Francis Donovan dated August 25, 2020. Document filed by The World Health Organization..(Amirfar, Catherine) |
|
Friday, August 21, 2020 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Hearing
Fri 08/21 4:01 PM
NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: A Pre-Motion Conference is scheduled for September 2, 2020 at 11:30 a.m. (via telephone) before the Honorable Cathy Seibel at the Charles L. Brieant United States District Courthouse, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, New York 10601 in Courtroom 621. Person(s) appearing via telephone are reminded of the general prohibition against any forms of recording and rebroadcasting of Court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Pursuant to Judge Seibel's Emergency Individual Rules and Practices in light of COVID-19, last revised on March 19, 2020, the parties are directed to attend by phone using the following information: Toll-Free Tele-conference number: (877) 336 1839 to call in and enter access code: 1047966#. The parties should call in from a landline phone (if possible), announce their last name(s) before addressing the Court at any time during the call, and mute their lines (pressing *6 on phone) when not speaking. Telephone Conference set for 9/2/2020 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 621, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Cathy Seibel. (mml) |
|
Friday, August 14, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 08/14 3:57 PM
LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Steven Bennett Blau dated 08/14/2020 re:20 LETTER MOTION for Conference / Letter Request for a Pre-Motion Conference addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Donald Francis Donovan and Catherine Amirfar dated August 14. 2020. . Document filed by Simon Allison, Patricia Hull, Richard O Kling, Shirley Morton, Brenda Sutton, Kenya Tucker, Harold Wimbush..(Blau, Steven) |
|
20 | 20
motion
Conference
Fri 08/14 2:14 PM
LETTER MOTION for Conference / Letter Request for a Pre-Motion Conference addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Donald Francis Donovan and Catherine Amirfar dated August 14. 2020. Document filed by The World Health Organization..(Amirfar, Catherine) |
|
Thursday, July 02, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 07/02 9:46 PM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Defendant's time to answer or seek a pre-motion conference is extended to 8/14/20 (not 9/21/20). Per my Individual Practices, a pre-motion letter and conference are required before any motion is made, unless that procedure would prejudice the moving party. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 07/02 3:58 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alyssa T. Yamamoto on behalf of The World Health Organization..(Yamamoto, Alyssa) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 07/02 3:55 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sebastian P. Dutz on behalf of The World Health Organization..(Dutz, Sebastian) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 07/02 3:52 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elizabeth Nielsen on behalf of The World Health Organization..(Nielsen, Elizabeth) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 07/02 3:49 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Natalie Louise Reid on behalf of The World Health Organization. |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 07/02 3:45 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Donald Francis Donovan on behalf of The World Health Organization..(Donovan, Donald) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 07/02 3:40 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Catherine M. Amirfar on behalf of The World Health Organization..(Amirfar, Catherine) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 07/02 3:18 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:7 Amended Complaint, addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Catherine Amirfar dated 7/2/2020. Document filed by The World Health Organization..(Amirfar, Catherine) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, May 26, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
service
Affidavit of Service Complaints
Tue 05/26 11:35 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,. The World Health Organization served on 5/22/2020, answer due 7/21/2020. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Shirley Morton; Gennaro Purchia; Steve Rotker; Simon Allison; Richard O Kling ; Brenda Sutton; Patricia Hull..(Leonard, Shelly) |
|
Thursday, May 07, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
service
Amended Summons Issued
Thu 05/07 11:14 AM
ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to The World Health Organization..(pne) |
|
Wednesday, May 06, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
service
Request for Issuance of Amended Summons
Wed 05/06 10:23 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to The World Health Organization, re:7 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Simon Allison, Patricia Hull, Richard O Kling, Shirley Morton, Brenda Sutton, Kenya Tucker, Harold Wimbush..(Blau, Steven) |
|
Tuesday, May 05, 2020 | ||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Tue 05/05 2:29 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Steven Bennett Blau. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Brenda Sutton; Harold Wimbush; Simon Allison; Shirley Morton; Kenya Tucker; Patricia Hull. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (jgo) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 05/05 2:31 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Steven Bennett Blau to RE-FILE Document No. 8 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Amended Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo) |
||
Monday, May 04, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 05/04 2:58 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The World Health Organization, re:7 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Simon Allison, Patricia Hull, Richard O Kling, Shirley Morton, Brenda Sutton, Kenya Tucker, Harold Wimbush..(Blau, Steven) |
|
7 | 7
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 05/04 2:57 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint against The World Health Organization with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Richard O Kling, Brenda Sutton, Harold Wimbush, Simon Allison, Shirley Morton, Kenya Tucker, Patricia Hull. Related document:1 Complaint..(Blau, Steven) |
|
Thursday, April 23, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/23 11:21 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The World Health Organization..(pne) |
|
Wednesday, April 22, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 04/22 11:55 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to THE WORLD HEALTH ORGANIZATION, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Richard O Kling, Gennaro Purchia, Steve Rotker..(Blau, Steven) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 04/22 11:10 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Steven Bennett Blau to RE-FILE Document No. 4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): party name on the PDF case caption contains a typographical error (The Worlk Health Organization). Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the corrected summons form PDF. (pne) |
||
Tuesday, April 21, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 04/21 1:11 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The World Health Organization, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Richard O Kling, Gennaro Purchia, Steve Rotker..(Blau, Steven) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 04/21 10:57 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Steven Bennett Blau to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF was not signed by the attorney;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Tue 04/21 10:57 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Steven Bennett Blau. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Westchester;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Suffolk;. (jgo) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Tue 04/21 10:59 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Steven Bennett Blau. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: MD Richard O Kling; Steve Rotker; Gennaro Purchia; The World Health Organization. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted;. (jgo) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Tue 04/21 11:01 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Tue 04/21 11:03 AM
Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Tue 04/21 11:04 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 04/21 11:09 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Steven Bennett Blau to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): party name on the PDF case caption contains a typographical error (The Worlk Health Organization); party name on the PDF 'To' section must be listed exactly as it appears on the pleading caption and must not be abbreviated;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo) |
||
Monday, April 20, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 04/20 11:51 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The World Health Organization, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Richard O Kling, Gennaro Purchia, Steve Rotker..(Blau, Steven) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 04/20 11:49 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Blau, Steven) |
|
1 | 1
23
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/20 11:48 AM
COMPLAINT against The World Health Organization. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19502691)Document filed by Richard O Kling, Gennaro Purchia, Steve Rotker..(Blau, Steven) |