Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Douglas R Cole
Case #: 1:20-cv-00313
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Apr 20, 2020
Terminated:Mar 24, 2025
Case in other court:Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas, A2001283
Last checked: Saturday Oct 17, 2020 5:51 AM EDT
Defendant
Health Carousel, LLC
Represented By
Brian A Morris
Taft Stettinius & Hollister
contact info
Russell S Sayre
contact info
Plaintiff
Novie Dale Carmen
Represented By
Charles A. Delbridge
Nichols Kaster, Pllp
contact info
Robert E DeRose, II
Barkan Meizlish Handelman Goodin Derose Wentz, LLP
contact info
Bryce W. Ashby
Donati Law, PLLC
contact info
Anna P. Prakash
Nichols Kaster, Pllp
contact info
Nicole J. Schladt
contact info

GPO Jun 17 2021
OPINION AND ORDER denying 12 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss and Motion to Strike and denying as moot 5 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Strike. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 6/17/21. (sct)
GPO Aug 09 2023
OPINION AND ORDER denying 44 Health Carousel's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint and denying 45 Health Carousel's MOTION to Strike Class Allegations. Finally, the Court denies 47 Health Carousel's MOTION to Stay Discovery as moot. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 8/9/23. (sct)
GPO Jun 18 2024
OPINION AND ORDER granting 85 Joint Amended Motion for Preliminary Settlement Approval and denying as moot 73 Joint Motion for Preliminary Settlement Approval. Final Approval Hearing set for 10/23/24 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 805. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 6/18/24. (sct)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, March 24, 2025
103 103 order Judgment - Clerk Mon 03/24 1:38 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered pursuant to102 Opinion and Order signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 3/24/25. (mas)
Related: [-]
102 102 40 pgs order Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 03/24 1:33 PM
OPINION AND ORDER granting87 Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, Service Payments, and Settlement Administration Expenses and91 Parties' Joint Motion for Final Settlement Approval. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 3/24/25. (mas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
101 101 misc Stipulation Tue 03/18 3:53 PM
STIPULATION Regarding Notice for Additionally Omitted Class Members by Plaintiffs Jerlin C. Amistoso, Novie Dale Carmen, Kersteen B. Flores. (O'Neill, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Ralph Quimiguing Consent Form