North Carolina Middle District Court
Judge:Thomas D Schroeder
Referred: Joi Elizabeth Peake
Case #: 1:20-cv-00348
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Case Filed:Apr 20, 2020
Case in other court:Virginia Eastern, 1:19-cv-01555
Last checked: Saturday Oct 17, 2020 5:24 AM EDT
Defendant
THE NORTH CAROLINA MUTUAL WHOLESALE DRUG COMPANY
Represented By
DOUGLAS WILLIAM HANNA
Graebe Hanna & Sullivan, PLLC
contact info
JEREMY M. WILSON
Ward And Smith, P.A.
contact info
Harold Edward Johnson
Williams Mullen (richmond)
contact info
HAROLD EDWARD JOHNSON
Williams Mullen
contact info
A. CHARLES ELLIS
Ward And Smith, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
NOETIC SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By
KELLY MARIE LIPPINCOTT
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP
contact info
GROVER GRAY WILSON
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, December 09, 2024
55 55 2 pgs order Order Mon 12/09 10:47 AM
ORDER that this action is STAYED until June 8, 2025. Either party may petition this court to lift or extend the stay should any change in circumstances establish good cause for such a request. The parties shall file a status report before the expiration of the stay and indicate whether the stay should be continued and, if so, for how long. Signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 12/09/2024. (at)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
54 54 misc Joint Status Report Wed 12/04 2:29 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT filed by all parties..(WILSON, GROVER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Joint Status Report
utility Case Referred to Judge Wed 12/04 3:14 PM
CASE REFERRED to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER RE:54 Joint Status Report. (ae)
Related: [-]