Clemens v. 3M Company, The et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:20-cv-01524 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 21, 2020 |
Last checked: Sunday Oct 18, 2020 7:20 AM EDT |
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
103 Fairview Park Drive
Elmsford, NY 10523 |
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours, Inc.
974 Centre Road
Wilmington, DE 19805 |
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
196122 E County Road 40
Woodward, OK 73801 |
|
Defendant
Corteva, Inc.
974 Centre Road
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Incorporated
2 Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma Management LLC
Archroma Management LLC 4000 Monroe Rd.
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
|
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company LLC, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
3M Company, The
|
|
Plaintiff
Robert Clemens
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Dowdupont Inc
Terminated: 09/09/2020
|
|
Defendant
Angus Fire
Terminated: 09/09/2020
|
Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, July 03, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by PlaintiffsAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Cunningham, Merritt) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, January 27, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice Other
Wed 01/27 8:19 PM
CLERKS NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. In light of the most recent CMO No. 6.D filed 1/26/2021 at 1128 , please be reminded that the new shell case number for direct-filed cases related to the AFFF MDL is now 2:21-av-55555. Please file the Complaint (Civil cover sheet need not be filed), and counsel need only submit one summons document AO 440 form to be issued by the Clerk's office. Please provide the first listed defendant party's name and address on the document and attach pages which include the additional defendants' names (and addresses per CMO NO. 6, 6.A, 6.B, 6.C, 6.D re Alternative For Service of Process on a Defendant ). Counsel should e-file, as an attachment to the complaint (or forward in one complete PDF via email to the Clerk's office: filingdocs_ecf_chas@scd.uscourts.gov). Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) |
|
Friday, December 11, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline Liat Rome on behalf of Chemguard Inc, Tyco Fire Products LP Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Rome, Jacqueline) |
|
Friday, September 25, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice Other
Fri 09/25 10:08 PM
CLERKS NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. The clerk will be issuing the summons(es) in a timely manner for all amended complaints filed. Due to the volume of amended complaints filed most recently, the clerk will be issuing the summons(es) as follows. Upon receipt of the NEF for the Summons Issued event, please print or download the filed one-page document with the PDF header included, showing the date of issue and civil case (member) number. Insert this dated, signed and sealed document in front of the first page of your prepared summons document, including your supplemental pages, to use for service on defendants. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) |
|
Friday, September 11, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Summons Issued as to 3M Company, The, AGC Chemicals Americas Inc, Amerex Corporation, Archroma Management LLC, Archroma US Inc, Arkema Inc, BASF Corporation, Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, Carrier Global Corporation, ChemDesign Products Incorporated, Chemguard Inc, Chemicals, Inc., Chemours Company FC LLC, The, Chemours Company LLC, The, Chubb Fire LTD, Clariant Corporation, Corteva, Inc., Deepwater Chemicals Inc, Dupont De Nemours, Inc., Dynax Corporation, EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Kidde PLC Inc, Kidde-Fenwal Inc, Nation Ford Chemical Company, National Foam Inc, Tyco Fire Products LP, UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc, United Technologies Corporation. (sshe, ) |
|
Wednesday, September 09, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
![]() AMENDED COMPLAINT against 3M Company, The, Arkema Inc, Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, Chemguard Inc, Chemours Company LLC, The, Chubb Fire LTD, EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Kidde PLC Inc, Kidde-Fenwal Inc, National Foam Inc, Tyco Fire Products LP, UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc, United Technologies Corporation, AGC Chemicals Americas Inc, Amerex Corporation, Archroma Management LLC, Archroma US Inc, BASF Corporation, Carrier Global Corporation, ChemDesign Products Incorporated, Chemicals, Inc., Chemours Company FC LLC, The, Clariant Corporation, Corteva, Inc., Deepwater Chemicals Inc, Dupont De Nemours, Inc., Dynax Corporation, nation ford chemical, Nation Ford Chemical Company, filed by Robert Clemens. Service due by 12/8/2020 (Cunningham, Merritt) |
|
Wednesday, September 02, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice Other
Wed 09/02 4:31 PM
CLERKS NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. Please be advised to disregard entry filed at Dkt. No. 797 (in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG) et al Notice of Appearance. This filing was spread incorrectly to ALL cases . Please note filing instructions per CMO No. 1 regarding correctly spreading if the document relates to all actions or relates only to particular action(s) . Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) |
|
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Allen Leland DuPre on behalf of Finley Fire Equipment Co Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(DuPre, Allen) |
|
Wednesday, April 29, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Summons Reissued as to Angus Fire. (sshe, ) |
|
Wednesday, April 22, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Wed 04/22 12:52 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed), Clemens v. 3M, as DSC case 2:20-cv-1524-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Maryland (sshe, ) |
|
Tuesday, April 21, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9063015.), filed by Robert Clemens. Service due by 7/20/2020(sshe, ) |