The Trustees of the California Ironworkers Field Pension Trust et al v. Derr & Isbell Construction, LLC et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | James C Mahan |
Referred: | Nancy J Koppe |
Case #: | 2:20-cv-00716 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Apr 21, 2020 |
Terminated: | Nov 12, 2020 |
Last checked: Sunday Oct 18, 2020 2:15 AM PDT |
Defendant
M. A. Mortenson Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Hinner, Hinner and Rajek LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Suretec Insurance Company
|
|
Defendant
Nevada State Contractors Board
|
|
Defendant
Mortenson-McCarthy Las Vegas Stadium
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Merrill Iron & Steel, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
McCarthy Building Companies, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Arch Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Hinner, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Federal Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Derr & Isbell Construction, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ironworkers Workers Compensation Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
California and Vicinity Field Ironworkers Annuity Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
California Ironworkers Field Welfare Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
California Field Ironworkers Vacation Trust Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
California Field Ironworkers Labor Management Cooperative Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The Trustees of the California Ironworkers Field Pension Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
California Field Ironworkers Apprenticeship Training and Journeyman Retraining Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
California Field Ironworkers Administrative Trust
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, November 12, 2020 | ||
26 | 26
6
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 11/12 3:44 PM
ORDER Granting25 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/12/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) |
|
Monday, November 02, 2020 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Stipulation Dismissal
Mon 11/02 12:42 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Proposed Order by Plaintiffs California Field Ironworkers Administrative Trust, California Field Ironworkers Apprenticeship Training and Journeyman Retraining Fund, California Field Ironworkers Labor Management Cooperative Trust, California Field Ironworkers Vacation Trust Fund, California Ironworkers Field Welfare Trust, California and Vicinity Field Ironworkers Annuity Fund, Ironworkers Workers Compensation Trust, The Trustees of the California Ironworkers Field Pension Trust. (James, Evan) |
|
Att: 1 2 pgs Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, August 18, 2020 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge
Tue 08/18 4:36 PM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (JQC) |
|
23 | 23
4
pgs
order
Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order
Tue 08/18 4:35 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER Granting22 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 1/30/2021. Motions due by 3/1/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 3/31/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/18/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) |
|
Monday, August 17, 2020 | ||
22 | 22
11
pgs
motion
Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order
Mon 08/17 2:01 PM
Proposed Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs California Field Ironworkers Administrative Trust, California Field Ironworkers Apprenticeship Training and Journeyman Retraining Fund, California Field Ironworkers Labor Management Cooperative Trust, California Field Ironworkers Vacation Trust Fund, California Ironworkers Field Welfare Trust, California and Vicinity Field Ironworkers Annuity Fund, Ironworkers Workers Compensation Trust, The Trustees of the California Ironworkers Field Pension Trust. (James, Evan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, August 14, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Error Notice to Counsel - interested parties not entered properly
Fri 08/14 3:14 PM
ERROR NOTICE to counsel re filing of18 and 20 Certificates of Interested Parties. All interested parties were not properly entered on the docket. Attorney George F. Ogilvie III advised that in the future , Certificates of Interested Parties filed with the District of Nevada shall be filed in accordance with FRCP 7.1 and LR 7.1-1, and shall enter on the docket all persons, associations of person, firms, partnerships or corporations (including parent corporations) which have a direct pecuniary interest in the outcome of the case. Do NOT refile. (no image attached) (MMM) Modified on 8/14/2020 to add additional document link (MMM) |
|
20 | 20
misc
Certificate Interested Parties
Fri 08/14 11:41 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Federal Insurance Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. (Ogilvie, George) Corporate parents Chubb INA Holdings, Inc., Chubb Group Holdings, Inc., Chubb Limited added for Federal Insurance Company Modified on 8/14/2020 (MMM) |
|
19 | 19
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 08/14 11:39 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,,, filed by Federal Insurance Company.(Ogilvie, George) |
|
18 | 18
misc
Certificate Interested Parties
Fri 08/14 11:34 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by M. A. Mortenson Company, McCarthy Building Companies, Inc., Mortenson-McCarthy Las Vegas Stadium that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate parent McCarthy Holdings, Inc. added for McCarthy Building Companies; Corporate parent Mortenson Construction Holdings, Inc. added for M.A. Mortenson Company (Ogilvie, George) Modified on 8/14/2020 to add interested parties (MMM) |
|
17 | 17
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 08/14 11:23 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,,, filed by M. A. Mortenson Company, McCarthy Building Companies, Inc., Mortenson-McCarthy Las Vegas Stadium.(Ogilvie, George) |
|
Thursday, August 13, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 08/13 2:56 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by California Field Ironworkers Administrative Trust, California Ironworkers Field Welfare Trust, The Trustees of the California Ironworkers Field Pension Trust, California and Vicinity Field Ironworkers Annuity Fund, California Field Ironworkers Labor Management Cooperative Trust, California Field Ironworkers Vacation Trust Fund, California Field Ironworkers Apprenticeship Training and Journeyman Retraining Fund re3 Summons Issued,1 Complaint,,,,,. Arch Insurance Company served on 6/8/2020; Derr & Isbell Construction, LLC served on 6/8/2020; Federal Insurance Company served on 6/23/2020; Hinner, Hinner and Rajek LLC served on 6/11/2020; Hinner, LLC served on 6/11/2020; M. A. Mortenson Company served on 6/8/2020; McCarthy Building Companies, Inc. served on 6/8/2020; Merrill Iron & Steel, Inc. served on 6/8/2020; Mortenson-McCarthy Las Vegas Stadium served on 6/8/2020; Nevada State Contractors Board served on 6/15/2020; Suretec Insurance Company served on 6/23/2020. (James, Evan) |
|
Att: 1 2 pgs Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 2 pgs Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 7 2 pgs Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 8 2 pgs Exhibit 8, | ||
Att: 9 5 pgs Exhibit 9, | ||
Att: 10 2 pgs Exhibit 10, | ||
Att: 11 2 pgs Exhibit 11 | ||
15 | 15
1
pgs
misc
Notice 4m Dismissal
Thu 08/13 9:11 AM
NOTICE of intent to dismiss pursuant to FRCP 4(m). The * Complaint * in this action was filed on * 4/21/20. * To date no proper proof of service has been filed as to defendants * Suretec Insurance Company; Nevada State Contractors Board; M. A. Mortenson Company; McCarthy Building Companies, Inc.; Federal Insurance Company; Mortenson-McCarthy Las Vegas Stadium. * FRCP 4(m) dismissal deadline set for 9/12/2020. (MMM) |
|
Friday, July 31, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
2
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Fri 07/31 1:04 PM
ORDER granting13 Stipulation to Amend. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/31/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) |
|
Thursday, July 30, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
4
pgs
motion
Stipulation
Thu 07/30 11:42 AM
STIPULATION to Amend Pleadings to Correct Names of Real Parties in Interest by Plaintiffs California Field Ironworkers Administrative Trust, California Field Ironworkers Apprenticeship Training and Journeyman Retraining Fund, California Field Ironworkers Labor Management Cooperative Trust, California Field Ironworkers Vacation Trust Fund, California Ironworkers Field Welfare Trust, California and Vicinity Field Ironworkers Annuity Fund, Ironworkers Workers Compensation Trust, The Trustees of the California Ironworkers Field Pension Trust. (James, Evan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, July 28, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
3
pgs
service
Acceptance of Service
Tue 07/28 2:28 PM
ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE by Liberty Mutual Company on 7/28/2020 executed by The Trustees of the California Ironworkers Field Pension Trust re1 Complaint,,,,,3 Summons Issued. (James, Evan) |
|
Monday, July 20, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
misc
QC Notice
Mon 07/20 6:34 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1(g). Filer's account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF No.10 . Attorney Bradley G. Taylor is advised to review and update his/her user account information. (no image attached) (MMM) |
|
10 | 10
4
pgs
notice
Notice Appearance
Mon 07/20 3:07 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Bradley Taylor on behalf of Defendants Hinner, Hinner, Rejek, LLC, Hinner, LLC, Liberty Mutual Company, Merrill Iron & Steel, Inc.. (Taylor, Bradley) |
|
9 | 9
4
pgs
notice
Notice Appearance
Mon 07/20 12:58 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Robert E Schumacher on behalf of Defendants Hinner, Hinner, Rejek, LLC, Hinner, LLC, Liberty Mutual Company, Merrill Iron & Steel, Inc.. (Schumacher, Robert) |
|
Wednesday, July 01, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
misc
QC Notice
Wed 07/01 9:14 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE of violation of Local Rules. ECF Nos.6 and7 were not filed pursuant to LR IA 10-2. Incomplete case number on documents. The correct case number is 2:20-cv-00716-JCM-NJK. Attorney Brian Pezzillo is advised in the future to file documents pursuant to the local rules. No further action is required concerning these documents at this time. DO NOT refile. (no image attached) (MMM) |
|
Tuesday, June 30, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
3
pgs
misc
Certificate Interested Parties
Tue 06/30 4:18 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Derr & Isbell Construction, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Pezzillo, Brian) |
|
6 | 6
11
pgs
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 06/30 4:02 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,,, filed by Derr & Isbell Construction, LLC.(Pezzillo, Brian) |
|
Monday, June 29, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Certificate Interested Parties
Mon 06/29 2:07 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Arch Insurance Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Pezzillo, Brian) |
|
4 | 4
11
pgs
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 06/29 2:05 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,,, filed by Arch Insurance Company. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 8/13/2020.(Pezzillo, Brian) |
|
Wednesday, April 22, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/22 10:51 AM
Summons Issued as to Defendants re1 Complaint. (JQC) |
|
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Wed 04/22 10:46 AM
Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (JQC) |
||
Tuesday, April 21, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
3
pgs
misc
Certificate Interested Parties
Tue 04/21 3:47 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by California Field Ironworkers Administrative Trust, California Field Ironworkers Apprenticeship Training and Journeyman Retraining Fund, California Field Ironworkers Labor Management Cooperative Trust, California Field Ironworkers Vacation Trust Fund, California Ironworkers Field Welfare Trust, California and Vicinity Field Ironworkers Annuity Fund, Ironworkers Workers Compensation Trust, The Trustees of the California Ironworkers Field Pension Trust. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (James, Evan) |
|
1 | 1
14
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/21 3:43 PM
COMPLAINT against Arch Insurance Company, Derr & Isbell Construction, LLC, Federal Insurance Company, Hinner, Hinner, Rejek, LLC, Hinner, LLC, Liberty Mutual Company, M. A. Mortenson Company, McCarthy Building Companies, Inc., Merrill Iron & Steel, Inc., Mortenson-McCarthy Las Vegas Stadium, Nevada State Contractors Board, Suretec Insurance Company (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5975176) by California Field Ironworkers Administrative Trust, California Ironworkers Field Welfare Trust, The Trustees of the California Ironworkers Field Pension Trust, Ironworkers Workers Compensation Trust, California and Vicinity Field Ironworkers Annuity Fund, California Field Ironworkers Labor Management Cooperative Trust, California Field Ironworkers Vacation Trust Fund, California Field Ironworkers Apprenticeship Training and Journeyman Retraining Fund. Proof of service due by 7/20/2020. (James, Evan) |
|
Att: 1 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Summons, | ||
Att: 7 Summons, | ||
Att: 8 Summons, | ||
Att: 9 Summons, | ||
Att: 10 Summons, | ||
Att: 11 Summons, | ||
Att: 12 Summons, | ||
Att: 13 Summons |