Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Sam A Lindsay
Case #: 3:20-cv-00983
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Apr 21, 2020
Terminated:Mar 11, 2021
Last checked: Sunday Oct 18, 2020 3:39 AM CDT
Defendant
Anchor Fabrication LLC
Represented By
Angella H Myers
The Myers Law Group LLP
contact info
Janice S Parker
The Myers Law Group LLP
contact info
Tammy Clary
The Myers Law Group LLP
contact info
Defendant
Beacon Fabrication LLC
Represented By
Angella H Myers
The Myers Law Group LLP
contact info
Janice S Parker
The Myers Law Group LLP
contact info
Tammy Clary
The Myers Law Group LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Leon Gassaway
Represented By
James A Vagnini
Valli Kane & Vagnini LLP
contact info
David Warren Henderson
Ellwanger Law Lllp
contact info
Jay D Ellwanger
Ellwanger Law Lllp
contact info
Monica Hincken
Valli Kane & Vagnini LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Stanrod Johnson
Represented By
James A Vagnini
Valli Kane & Vagnini LLP
contact info
David Warren Henderson
Ellwanger Law Lllp
contact info
Jay D Ellwanger
Ellwanger Law Lllp
contact info
Monica Hincken
Valli Kane & Vagnini LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Tavares Ridge
Represented By
James A Vagnini
Valli Kane & Vagnini LLP
contact info
David Warren Henderson
Ellwanger Law Lllp
contact info
Jay D Ellwanger
Ellwanger Law Lllp
contact info
Monica Hincken
Valli Kane & Vagnini LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Brandon Robinson
Represented By
James A Vagnini
Valli Kane & Vagnini LLP
contact info
David Warren Henderson
Ellwanger Law Lllp
contact info
Jay D Ellwanger
Ellwanger Law Lllp
contact info
Monica Hincken
Valli Kane & Vagnini LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Nicholas Spraglin
Represented By
James A Vagnini
Valli Kane & Vagnini LLP
contact info
David Warren Henderson
Ellwanger Law Lllp
contact info
Jay D Ellwanger
Ellwanger Law Lllp
contact info
Monica Hincken
Valli Kane & Vagnini LLP
contact info

GPO Feb 24 2021
Findings, Conclusions, and Recommendation re: 11 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration and Brief in Support. Based on the relevant filings and applicable law, the motion should be GRANTED, and the case should be dismissed without prejudice. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 2/24/2021) (mcrd)
GPO Mar 11 2021
ORDER: The court determines that the 19 findings and conclusions of the magistrate judge Order are correct in her analysis, and accepts them as those of the court as herein modified and supplemented. The court, therefore, grants Defendants 11 Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration and dismisses with prejudice this action. The court orders the parties to arbitrate Plaintiffs claims in accordance with the arbitration provisions of the Employee Handbook. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 3/11/2021) (svc)

Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Thursday, March 11, 2021
22 22 order Judgment Thu 03/11 4:29 PM
JUDGMENT: It is, ordered, adjudged, and decreed that this action is dismissed with prejudice; that all claims asserted by Plaintiffs Leon Gassaway, Stanrod Johnson, Tavares Ridge, Brandon Robinson, and Nicholas Spraglin in this action against Defendants Beacon Fabrication, LLC and Anchor Fabrication, LLC shall be arbitrated in accordance with the arbitration provisions in the Employee Handbook; and all allowable and reasonable costs are taxed against Plaintiffs. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 3/11/2021) (svc)
Related: [-]
21 21 4 pgs order Order Accepting/Adopting Findings and Recommendations Thu 03/11 4:24 PM
ORDER: The court determines that the19 findings and conclusions of the magistrate judge Order are correct in her analysis, and accepts them as those of the court as herein modified and supplemented. The court, therefore, grants Defendants11 Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration and dismisses with prejudice this action. The court orders the parties to arbitrate Plaintiffs claims in accordance with the arbitration provisions of the Employee Handbook. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 3/11/2021) (svc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 10, 2021
20 20 respm Response/Objection Wed 03/10 5:11 PM
RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Anchor Fabrication LLC, Beacon Fabrication LLC re:19 Findings and Recommendations on Motion re:11 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Beacon Fabrication LLC, Anchor Fabrication LLC. (Myers, Angella)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 24, 2021
19 19 motion Findings and Recommendations Wed 02/24 4:46 PM
Findings, Conclusions, and Recommendation re:11 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration and Brief in Support. Based on the relevant filings and applicable law, the motion should be GRANTED, and the case should be dismissed without prejudice. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 2/24/2021) (mcrd)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 21, 2020
18 18 2 pgs order Order Referring Motion Mon 08/24 8:14 AM
ORDER OF REFERENCE:11 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration Is referred to Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 8/21/2020) (svc)
Related: [-]
17 17 respm Reply Fri 08/21 5:47 PM
REPLY filed by Anchor Fabrication LLC, Beacon Fabrication LLC re:12 Appendix in Support,11 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration (Myers, Angella)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) 1
Friday, August 07, 2020
16 16 respm Appendix in Support Fri 08/07 6:42 PM
Appendix in Support filed by Leon Gassaway, Stanrod Johnson, Tavares Ridge, Brandon Robinson, Nicholas Spraglin re15 Response/Objection (Ellwanger, Jay)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B
15 15 respm Response/Objection Fri 08/07 6:39 PM
RESPONSE filed by Leon Gassaway, Stanrod Johnson, Tavares Ridge, Brandon Robinson, Nicholas Spraglin re:11 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration (Ellwanger, Jay)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, July 17, 2020
14 14 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Fri 07/17 4:10 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Anchor Fabrication LLC, Beacon Fabrication LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Anchor Fabrication of Nevada Corp., a Nevada Corporation for Anchor Fabrication LLC, Beacon Fabrication LLC. (Myers, Angella)
Related: [-]
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 07/17 3:57 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,, filed by Anchor Fabrication LLC, Beacon Fabrication LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Myers, Angella)
Related: [-]
12 12 respm Appendix in Support Fri 07/17 2:21 PM
Appendix in Support filed by Anchor Fabrication LLC, Beacon Fabrication LLC re11 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration and Brief in Support (Myers, Angella) (ykp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (7/17/2020) Declaration(s)
11 11 motion Dismiss Fri 07/17 2:16 PM
MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration filed by Anchor Fabrication LLC, Beacon Fabrication LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support.Attorney Angella H Myers added to party Anchor Fabrication LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Angella H Myers added to party Beacon Fabrication LLC(pty:dft) (Myers, Angella)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration and Exhibits,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Friday, June 05, 2020
10 10 order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Fri 06/05 8:22 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Monica Hincken. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 6/5/2020) (chmb)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Fri 06/05 8:19 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of James A. Vagnini. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 6/5/2020) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 04, 2020
8 8 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 06/04 9:58 PM
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-10889800) filed by Leon Gassaway, Stanrod Johnson, Tavares Ridge, Brandon Robinson, Nicholas Spraglin with Brief/Memorandum in Support.Attorney Monica Hincken added to party Leon Gassaway(pty:pla), Attorney Monica Hincken added to party Stanrod Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Monica Hincken added to party Tavares Ridge(pty:pla), Attorney Monica Hincken added to party Brandon Robinson(pty:pla), Attorney Monica Hincken added to party Nicholas Spraglin(pty:pla) (Hincken, Monica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment A,
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 06/04 9:20 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to All Defendants. (Vagnini, James)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 06/04 9:19 PM
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-10889769) filed by Leon Gassaway, Stanrod Johnson, Tavares Ridge, Brandon Robinson, Nicholas Spraglin with Brief/Memorandum in Support.Attorney James A Vagnini added to party Leon Gassaway(pty:pla), Attorney James A Vagnini added to party Stanrod Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney James A Vagnini added to party Tavares Ridge(pty:pla), Attorney James A Vagnini added to party Brandon Robinson(pty:pla), Attorney James A Vagnini added to party Nicholas Spraglin(pty:pla) (Vagnini, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment A,
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing
Thursday, May 14, 2020
5 5 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 05/14 9:19 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Warren Henderson on behalf of Leon Gassaway, Stanrod Johnson, Tavares Ridge, Brandon Robinson, Nicholas Spraglin. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Henderson, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 22, 2020
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 04/22 10:21 AM
Summons Issued as to Anchor Fabrication LLC, Beacon Fabrication LLC. (hml)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 21, 2020
3 3 qcref Lindsay Wed 04/22 10:18 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Tue 04/21 5:44 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Leon Gassaway, Stanrod Johnson, Tavares Ridge, Brandon Robinson, Nicholas Spraglin. (Ellwanger, Jay)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 04/21 5:43 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Brandon Robinson, Leon Gassaway, Tavares Ridge, Stanrod Johnson, Nicholas Spraglin. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10783892) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Ellwanger, Jay)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet