Weaver v. Walther Productions, Inc. et al
West Virginia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Irene M Keeley |
Referred: | John S Kaull |
Case #: | 1:12-cv-00079 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | May 11, 2012 |
Terminated: | Mar 14, 2014 |
Last checked: Saturday Mar 14, 2015 12:53 AM EDT |
Counter Defendant
Event Staffing, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
Marvin's Mountaintop, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
Walther Productions, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
Event Staffing, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walther Productions, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Marvin's Mountaintop, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Event Staffing, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Weaver
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Cross Claimant
Jim Tobin
Terminated: 11/14/2013
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
National Event Services, Inc.
Terminated: 04/08/2013
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
Axis Security, Inc.
Terminated: 12/05/2013
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
All Good Festival, Inc.
Terminated: 07/09/2012
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Axis Security, Inc.
Terminated: 12/05/2013
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Event Staffing, Inc.
Terminated: 11/14/2013
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Jim Tobin
Terminated: 11/14/2013
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Marvin's Mountaintop, LLC
Terminated: 11/14/2013
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Walther Productions, Inc.
Terminated: 11/14/2013
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
All Good Festival, Inc.
Terminated: 07/09/2012
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
National Event Services, Inc.
Terminated: 04/08/2013
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Axis Security, Inc.
Terminated: 12/05/2013
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jim Tobin
Terminated: 11/14/2013
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
National Event Services, Inc.
Terminated: 04/08/2013
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
All Good Festival, Inc.
Terminated: 07/09/2012
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Jim Tobin
Terminated: 06/27/2012
|
|
ThirdParty Defendant
National Event Services, Inc.
Terminated: 06/27/2012
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Walther Productions, Inc.
Terminated: 06/27/2012
|
Represented By
|