Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:20-bk-30820

Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Harlin Dewayne Hale
Case #: 3:20-ap-03064
Nature of Suit68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2020
Terminated:Dec 01, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Maria Claire Faulkner
2000 Holly Parkway, Apt. 2916
Roanoke, TX 76262
Represented By
Maria Claire Faulkner
contact info
Plaintiff
West Houston Aesthetic and Plastic Surgery, PLLC, d/b/a Ver Halen Aesthetics and Plastic Surgery
Represented By
Jeffrey L. Dorrell
Hanszen Laporte LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jon Ver Halen
Represented By
Jeffrey L. Dorrell
Hanszen Laporte LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Elaine Ver Halen
Represented By
Jeffrey L. Dorrell
Hanszen Laporte LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 1:10 PM CDT
Wednesday, December 01, 2021
29 29 3 pgs notice Notice of dismissal or stipulated dismissal in an adversary proceeding Wed 12/01 10:58 AM
Notice of dismissal in an adversary proceeding filed by Plaintiffs Elaine Ver Halen, Jon Ver Halen, M.D., West Houston Aesthetic and Plastic Surgery, PLLC,. (Laporte, Anthony)
Related: [-]
court Close adversary case Wed 12/01 1:15 PM
Adversary case 3:20-ap-3064 closed (Hartogh, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 29, 2021
28 28 court Clerk's correspondence Mon 11/29 7:56 AM
Clerk's correspondence requesting Case Status from attorney for plaintiff. Related [+] Responses due by 12/29/2021. (Hartogh, Kristina)
Related: [-] 10 Amended complaint by Jeffrey L. Dorrell on behalf of Elaine Ver Halen, Jon Ver Halen, West Houston Aesthetic and Plastic Surgery, PLLC, against Maria Claire Faulkner No change to nature of suit. (RE: related document(s)1 Adversary case 20-03064 Complaint by West Houston Aesthetic and Plastic Surgery, PLLC, d/b/a Ver Halen Aesthetics and Plastic Surgery, Jon Ver Halen, Elaine Ver Halen against Maria Claire Faulkner. Fee Amount $350 (Attachments: # 1 Unsworn Declaration). Nature(s) of suit: 68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury). 72 (Injunctive relief - other). filed by Plaintiff West Houston Aesthetic and Plastic Surgery, PLLC,, Plaintiff Jon Ver Halen, Plaintiff Elaine Ver Halen). (Attachments: # 1 Unsworn Declaration # 2 Amd. Adversary Cover Sheet)
Monday, September 27, 2021
court Hearing not held Mon 09/27 2:13 PM
Hearing NOT held on 9/27/2021. Related [+] (SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT REACHED.) (Green, Shanette)
Related: [-] 10 Amended complaint by Jeffrey L. Dorrell on behalf of Elaine Ver Halen, Jon Ver Halen, West Houston Aesthetic and Plastic Surgery, PLLC, against Maria Claire Faulkner No change to nature of suit. (RE: related document(s)1 Adversary case 20-03064 Complaint by West Houston Aesthetic and Plastic Surgery, PLLC, d/b/a Ver Halen Aesthetics and Plastic Surgery, Jon Ver Halen, Elaine Ver Halen against Maria Claire Faulkner. Fee Amount $350 (Attachments: # 1 Unsworn Declaration). Nature(s) of suit: 68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury). 72 (Injunctive relief - other). filed by Plaintiff West Houston Aesthetic and Plastic Surgery, PLLC,, Plaintiff Jon Ver Halen, Plaintiff Elaine Ver Halen). (Attachments: # 1 Unsworn Declaration # 2 Amd. Adversary Cover Sheet)
Friday, May 21, 2021
27 27 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Fri 05/21 11:25 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/21/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 26 Second amended agreed scheduling order (RE: related document(s)10 Amended complaint filed by Plaintiff West Houston Aesthetic and Plastic Surgery, PLLC,, Plaintiff Jon Ver Halen, M.D., Plaintiff Elaine Ver Halen). Trial Docket Call date set for 9/27/2021 at 09:00 AM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale. Entered on 5/19/2021
Wednesday, May 19, 2021
26 26 order Set or continue hearing Wed 05/19 3:00 PM
Second amended agreed scheduling order Related [+]. Trial Docket Call date set for 9/27/2021 at 09:00 AM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale. Entered on 5/19/2021 (Rielly, Bill)
Related: [-] 10 Amended complaint filed by Plaintiff West Houston Aesthetic and Plastic Surgery, PLLC,, Plaintiff Jon Ver Halen, M.D., Plaintiff Elaine Ver Halen
Monday, April 26, 2021
court Hearing not held Tue 04/27 1:50 PM
Hearing NOT held on 4/26/2021. Related [+] (AGREED RESET PER PLAINTIFF.) (Green, Shanette)
Related: [-] 10 Amended complaint by Jeffrey L. Dorrell on behalf of Elaine Ver Halen, Jon Ver Halen, West Houston Aesthetic and Plastic Surgery, PLLC, against Maria Claire Faulkner No change to nature of suit. (RE: related document(s)1 Adversary case 20-03064 Complaint by West Houston Aesthetic and Plastic Surgery, PLLC, d/b/a Ver Halen Aesthetics and Plastic Surgery, Jon Ver Halen, Elaine Ver Halen against Maria Claire Faulkner. Fee Amount $350 (Attachments: # 1 Unsworn Declaration). Nature(s) of suit: 68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury). 72 (Injunctive relief - other). filed by Plaintiff West Houston Aesthetic and Plastic Surgery, PLLC,, Plaintiff Jon Ver Halen, Plaintiff Elaine Ver Halen). (Attachments: # 1 Unsworn Declaration # 2 Amd. Adversary Cover Sheet)
Monday, January 25, 2021
25 25 misc List (witness/exhibit/generic) Mon 01/25 5:31 PM
Witness List of Designated Experts filed by Plaintiffs Elaine Ver Halen, Jon Ver Halen, M.D., West Houston Aesthetic and Plastic Surgery, PLLC, Related [+]. (Dorrell, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 10 Amended complaint
Att: 1 Exhibit
Saturday, December 19, 2020
24 24 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Sat 12/19 11:30 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/19/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 23 Amended agreed scheduling Order hearing (RE: related document(s)10 Amended complaint filed by Plaintiff West Houston Aesthetic and Plastic Surgery, PLLC,, Plaintiff Jon Ver Halen, M.D., Plaintiff Elaine Ver Halen). Trial Docket Call date set for 4/26/2021 at 10:30 AM at Dallas Judge Hale Ctrm. Entered on 12/17/2020
Thursday, December 17, 2020
23 23 order Set or continue hearing Thu 12/17 1:41 PM
Amended agreed scheduling Order hearing Related [+]. Trial Docket Call date set for 4/26/2021 at 10:30 AM at Dallas Judge Hale Ctrm. Entered on 12/17/2020 (Rielly, Bill)
Related: [-] 10 Amended complaint filed by Plaintiff West Houston Aesthetic and Plastic Surgery, PLLC,, Plaintiff Jon Ver Halen, M.D., Plaintiff Elaine Ver Halen
Friday, November 27, 2020
22 22 notice Notice (generic) Fri 11/27 9:53 AM
Notice of Case Status Report filed by Plaintiffs Elaine Ver Halen, Jon Ver Halen, M.D., West Houston Aesthetic and Plastic Surgery, PLLC,. (Dorrell, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 24, 2020
21 21 court Clerk's correspondence Tue 11/24 7:54 AM
Clerk's correspondence requesting Case Status from attorney for plaintiff. Related [+] Responses due by 12/8/2020. (Munoz, Kristina)
Related: [-] Hearing NOT held on 8/24/2020. (RE: related document(s)1 Adversary case 20-03064 Complaint by West Houston Aesthetic and Plastic Surgery, PLLC, d/b/a Ver Halen Aesthetics and Plastic Surgery, Jon Ver Halen, Elaine Ver Halen against Maria Claire Faulkner. Fee Amount $350 (Attachments: # 1 Unsworn Declaration). Nature(s) of suit: 68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury). 72 (Injunctive relief - other).) (PARTIES ARE WORKING ON SETTLEMENT; TDC TO BE RESET IF NEEDED PER D. HERRIN.)
Monday, August 24, 2020
court Hearing not held Thu 08/27 10:45 AM
Hearing NOT held on 8/24/2020. Related [+] (PARTIES ARE WORKING ON SETTLEMENT; TDC TO BE RESET IF NEEDED PER D. HERRIN.) (Green, Shanette)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 20-03064 Complaint by West Houston Aesthetic and Plastic Surgery, PLLC, d/b/a Ver Halen Aesthetics and Plastic Surgery, Jon Ver Halen, Elaine Ver Halen against Maria Claire Faulkner. Fee Amount $350 (Attachments: # 1 Unsworn Declaration). Nature(s) of suit: 68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury). 72 (Injunctive relief - other).
Monday, August 03, 2020
20 20 answer Answer to complaint Mon 08/03 7:39 AM
Answer to complaint filed by Maria Claire Faulkner. (Herrin, C.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 08, 2020
19 19 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Wed 07/08 11:25 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 07/08/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 Order granting unopposed motion to extend time to file answer or respond to plaintiffs' amended complaint. Defendants' deadline to respond is extended until 8/5/202017 Motion to extend time. Maria Claire Faulkner answer deadline is reset for 8/5/2020 Entered on 7/6/2020.
Monday, July 06, 2020
18 18 order Extend/Shorten time Mon 07/06 9:23 AM
Order granting unopposed motion to extend time to file answer or respond to plaintiffs' amended complaint. Defendants' deadline to respond is extended until 8/5/202017 Motion to extend time. Maria Claire Faulkner answer deadline is reset for 8/5/2020 Entered on 7/6/2020. (Rielly, Bill)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 30, 2020
17 17 motion Extend/Shorten time Tue 06/30 1:23 PM
Motion to extend time to extend deadline to file response Related [+] filed by Defendant Maria Claire Faulkner (Herrin, C.)
Related: [-] 10 Amended complaint
Friday, June 26, 2020
court Hearing not held Mon 07/20 11:11 AM
Hearing NOT held on 6/26/2020. Related [+] (PARTIES ARE WORKING ON SETTLEMENT; TO BE RESET IF NECESSARY PER J. DORRELL.) (Green, Shanette)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 20-03064 Complaint by West Houston Aesthetic and Plastic Surgery, PLLC, d/b/a Ver Halen Aesthetics and Plastic Surgery, Jon Ver Halen, Elaine Ver Halen against Maria Claire Faulkner. Fee Amount $350 (Attachments: # 1 Unsworn Declaration). Nature(s) of suit: 68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury). 72 (Injunctive relief - other).
Thursday, June 25, 2020
court Hearing not held Thu 06/25 4:10 PM
Hearing NOT held on 6/25/2020. Related [+] (RESET BY THE COURT TO 6/26/20 AT 1:30 PM.) (Green, Shanette)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 20-03064 Complaint by West Houston Aesthetic and Plastic Surgery, PLLC, d/b/a Ver Halen Aesthetics and Plastic Surgery, Jon Ver Halen, Elaine Ver Halen against Maria Claire Faulkner. Fee Amount $350 (Attachments: # 1 Unsworn Declaration). Nature(s) of suit: 68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury). 72 (Injunctive relief - other).
Wednesday, June 24, 2020
16 16 notice Notice (generic) Wed 06/24 4:43 PM
Notice of PASSED Hearing filed by Plaintiff West Houston Aesthetic and Plastic Surgery, PLLC,. (Dorrell, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 19, 2020
15 15 misc Withdrawal Fri 06/19 2:00 PM
Withdrawal filed by Defendant Maria Claire Faulkner Related [+]. (Herrin, C.)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to dismiss adversary proceeding
Thursday, June 18, 2020
14 14 notice Notice of hearing Thu 06/18 8:32 PM
Amended Notice of hearing on Plaintiffs Request for Permanent Injunction filed by Plaintiff West Houston Aesthetic and Plastic Surgery, PLLC, Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 6/26/2020 at 01:30 PM VIDEO CONFERENCE for1 , (Dorrell, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff West Houston Aesthetic and Plastic Surgery, PLLC,, Plaintiff Jon Ver Halen, Plaintiff Elaine Ver Halen
Wednesday, June 10, 2020
13 13 answer Response Wed 06/10 1:14 PM
Response opposed to Related [+] filed by Plaintiffs Elaine Ver Halen, Jon Ver Halen, West Houston Aesthetic and Plastic Surgery, PLLC,. (Dorrell, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to dismiss adversary proceeding filed by Defendant Maria Claire Faulkner
Att: 1 Proposed Order
12 12 notice Notice of hearing Wed 06/10 5:38 AM
Amended Notice of hearing filed by Defendant Maria Claire Faulkner Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 6/29/2020 at 09:00 AM Dallas Judge Hale Ctrm for8 ,(Herrin, C.)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to dismiss adversary proceeding filed by Defendant Maria Claire Faulkner
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Tuesday, June 09, 2020
11 11 notice Notice of hearing Tue 06/09 6:01 PM
Notice of hearing on Plaintiffs Request for Permanent Injunction filed by Plaintiffs Elaine Ver Halen, Jon Ver Halen, West Houston Aesthetic and Plastic Surgery, PLLC, Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 6/25/2020 at 10:00 AM Dallas Judge Hale Ctrm for1 , (Dorrell, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff West Houston Aesthetic and Plastic Surgery, PLLC,, Plaintiff Jon Ver Halen, Plaintiff Elaine Ver Halen
Friday, June 05, 2020
10 10 cmp Amended complaint Fri 06/05 7:14 PM
Amended complaint by Jeffrey L. Dorrell on behalf of Elaine Ver Halen, Jon Ver Halen, West Houston Aesthetic and Plastic Surgery, PLLC, against Maria Claire Faulkner No change to nature of suit. Related [+]. (Dorrell, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 20-03064 Complaint by West Houston Aesthetic and Plastic Surgery, PLLC, d/b/a Ver Halen Aesthetics and Plastic Surgery, Jon Ver Halen, Elaine Ver Halen against Maria Claire Faulkner. Fee Amount $350 (Attachments: # 1 Unsworn Declaration). Nature(s) of suit: 68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury). 72 (Injunctive relief - other). filed by Plaintiff West Houston Aesthetic and Plastic Surgery, PLLC,, Plaintiff Jon Ver Halen, Plaintiff Elaine Ver Halen
Att: 1 Unsworn Declaration
Att: 2 Amd. Adversary Cover Sheet
Thursday, June 04, 2020
9 9 notice Notice of hearing Thu 06/04 7:12 AM
Notice of hearing filed by Defendant Maria Claire Faulkner Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 6/29/2020 at 09:00 AM Dallas Judge Hale Ctrm for8 , (Herrin, C.)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to dismiss adversary proceeding filed by Defendant Maria Claire Faulkner
Thursday, May 21, 2020
8 8 motion Dismiss adversary proceeding Thu 05/21 8:06 AM
Motion to dismiss adversary proceeding filed by Defendant Maria Claire Faulkner (Herrin, C.)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 15, 2020
7 7 misc Declaration Fri 05/15 7:09 PM
Declaration re: Service on Defendant's Counsel filed by Plaintiff Jon Ver Halen Related [+]. (Dorrell, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Exhibit
6 6 cmp Summons service executed Fri 05/15 7:02 PM
Summons service executed on Maria Claire Faulkner 4/23/2020 (Dorrell, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Wednesday, April 29, 2020
5 5 misc Adversary proceeding cover sheet Wed 04/29 11:57 AM
Adversary proceeding cover sheet filed by Plaintiff West Houston Aesthetic and Plastic Surgery, PLLC, Related [+]. (Dorrell, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Notice of deficiency
Thursday, April 23, 2020
4 4 2 pgs order Standing scheduling order in an adversary proceeding Thu 04/23 12:03 PM
Scheduling order setting deadlines. Discovery and all exhibits except impeachment documents: 45 days prior to Docket Call, pre-trial order: 7 calendar days prior to Docket Call, proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law: 7 days prior to first scheduled docket call Related [+]. Trial Docket Call date set for 8/24/2020 at 09:00 AM at Dallas Judge Hale Ctrm. Trial to be set the week of 9/8/2020. Entered on 4/23/2020 (Green, Shanette)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff West Houston Aesthetic and Plastic Surgery, PLLC,, Plaintiff Jon Ver Halen, Plaintiff Elaine Ver Halen
3 3 court Summons issued Thu 04/23 11:57 AM
Summons issued on Maria Claire Faulkner Answer Due 5/26/2020 (Green, Shanette)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 22, 2020
2 2 court Notice of deficiency Wed 04/22 2:16 PM
Notice of deficiency. Adversary Cover Sheet due 4/24/2020. (Ramirez, Shilo)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 04/22 10:16 AM
Adversary case 20-03064 Complaint by West Houston Aesthetic and Plastic Surgery, PLLC, d/b/a Ver Halen Aesthetics and Plastic Surgery, Jon Ver Halen, Elaine Ver Halen against Maria Claire Faulkner. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of suit: 68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury). 72 (Injunctive relief - other). (Dorrell, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unsworn Declaration