CapRock Communications (Australia) Pty Ltd Jointly Administered under 20-32243.
Member Case
Lead case is: 4:20-bk-32243
Lead case is: 4:20-bk-32243
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Marvin Isgur |
Case #: | 4:20-bk-32267 |
Case Filed: | Apr 23, 2020 |
Terminated: | Apr 21, 2022 |
Type | Other Entity Type |
# of Creditors | 1,000-5,000 |
Est. Assets | $500,000,001 to $1 billion |
Est. Liabilities | $500,000,001 to $1 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
CapRock Communications (Australia) Pty Ltd
, |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002 |
Docket last updated: 7 minutes ago |
Thursday, April 21, 2022 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Thu 04/21 10:03 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (TylerLaws) |
||
Wednesday, December 16, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/16/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, December 11, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: CCP III Credit Acquisition Holdings, LLC (Claim No. 1) To CB Hermes Holdings, L.P. Fee Amount $26 (Rochester, Stephen) |
|
crditcrd
none
Fri 12/11 3:59 PM
Receipt of Transfer of Claim 20-32267 [claims,trclm] ( 26.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 22672782. Fee amount $ 26.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Wednesday, November 04, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/04/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, October 30, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: ING Bank, N.V. (Claim No. 1) To CCP III Credit Acquisition Holdings, LLC Fee Amount $25 (Rochester, Stephen) |
|
crditcrd
none
Fri 10/30 8:56 PM
Receipt of Transfer of Claim 20-32267 [claims,trclm] ( 25.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 22556110. Fee amount $ 25.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Sunday, April 26, 2020 | ||
crditcrd
none
Sun 04/26 2:18 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 20-32267 [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 22072521. Fee amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Saturday, April 25, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/25/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, April 23, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Order for Joint Administration under 20-32243 Signed on 4/23/2020 (LinhthuDoadi) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Emergency Motion of Debtors for Order Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases Filed by Debtor CapRock Communications (Australia) Pty Ltd Hearing scheduled for 4/23/2020 at 03:00 PM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (Funk, Brenda) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1717 Filed by CapRock Communications (Australia) Pty Ltd. (Perez, Alfredo) |
|
utility
Remark (PUBLIC ENTRY)
Thu 04/23 11:04 AM
An order directing joint administration of this case has been entered by the Court in accordance with FED. R. BANKR. P. 1015(b). The docket in Case No. 20-32243 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. All future pleadings shall be filed in and all subsequent docket entries shall be made in the Lead Case. Interested parties are directed to the order directing joint administration for further information. (LinhthuDoadi) |