Messieh et al v. HDR Global Trading Limited et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Andrew L Carter, Jr |
Referred: | Stewart D Aaron |
Case #: | 1:20-cv-03232 |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Cause | 7:6(b) Federal Commodity Exchange Regulation |
Case Filed: | Apr 23, 2020 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 04, 2024 7:46 AM EDT |
Defendant
ABS Global Trading Limited
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
HDR Global Trading Limited
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ben Delo
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Arthur Hayes
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Samuel Reed
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
100x Holdings Limited
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Greg Dwyer
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
HDR Global Services (Bermuda)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Shine Effort Inc Limited
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Drew Lee
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brett Messieh
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
153 | 153
3
pgs
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Thu 04/11 2:40 PM
ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONIC INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: An Initial Pretrial Conference in accordance with Rule 16(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure will be held on Friday, May 3, 2024, at 11:30 a.m. At the scheduled time, the parties shall each separately call (888) 278-0296 (or (214) 765-0479) and enter access code 6489745. Initial Conference set for 5/3/2024 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 4/11/2024) (va) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
152 | 152
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 04/10 4:40 PM
ORDER: The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to strike Docket Entry 144. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 4/10/2024) (ate) |
|
151 | 151
misc
Notice of Filing Transcript
Wed 04/10 2:36 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a STATUS CONFERENCE proceeding held on 4/8/2024 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(js) Modified on 4/11/2024 (js). (Main Document 151 replaced on 4/11/2024) (js). |
|
150 | 150
misc
Transcript
Wed 04/10 2:35 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 4/8/2024 before Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr.. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Adrienne Mignano, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/1/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/13/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/9/2024. (js) (Main Document 150 replaced on 4/11/2024) (js). Modified on 4/11/2024 (js). |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
149 | 149
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 04/09 1:57 PM
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL granting136 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. SO ORDERED. Attorney Rebecca Rose Delfiner terminated. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 4/9/2024) (kl) |
|
148 | 148
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Tue 04/09 1:31 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron. SO ORDERED. Motions referred to Stewart D. Aaron. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 4/9/2024) (vfr) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
147 | 147
8
pgs
order
Order
Mon 04/08 12:18 PM
ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION (Carter, Andrew) |
|
minutes
Telephone Conference
Wed 04/10 10:56 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr: Telephone Conference held on 4/8/2024. See Docket No. 148 for complete details. (tdh) |