John Marchisotto v. Margaret Goodzeit, et al
Original Case: 3:19-cv-12540
Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:20-cv-01870 |
Type | civil / private / civil rights |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 23, 2020 |
Terminated: | Aug 04, 2021 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 05, 2021 4:27 AM EDT |
Defendant
FRANK BRUNO, individually, and in his official capacity, as the Somerset County Surrogate
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DEBRA E. CANOVA, individually, and in his official capacity, as the Somerset County Surrogate
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
MARGARET GOODZEIT, individually, and in her official capacity, as Presiding Judge, Somerset County Chancery
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
FRANK BRUNO, individually, and in his official capacity, as the Somerset County Surrogate
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
LOUIS P. LEPORE, Individually and , the Law Offices of Louis Lepore P.C. and Louis Lepore, Esq., LLC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
DEBRA E. CANOVA
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
STATE OF NEW JERSEY, New Jersey Courts, Middlesex County Surrogate and County
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
ALBERTO RIVAS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
STAURT J. RABNER
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
STUART RABNER
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
LAW OFFICE OF JOHN W THATCHER LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
JOHN F. MARCHISOTTO, individually and as Guardian, of A.M., J.M., and M.M., minors
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 08/05/2021 4:27 AM EDT |
Thursday, April 23, 2020 | ||
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (TMM) | ||
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant John F. Marchisotto in District Court No. 3-19-cv-12540. (TMM) | ||
Att: 1 1 pgs Civil Case Docketed | ||
Att: 2 3 pgs DC Order 4/22/20 | ||
Att: 3 1 pgs caption | ||
Att: 4 1 pgs Standing Order | ||
Att: 5 2 pgs Case Opening Letter | ||
1 pgs ORDER (Clerk) Pursuant to 3d Cir. L.A.R. 113.12 and the Judicial Conference Policy on Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Cases, personal identifier information must be redacted from filings. These identifiers include Social Security numbers, names of minor children, financial account numbers, dates of birth, and home addresses in criminal cases. Litigants are responsible for redacting documents. This Courts's Local Appellate Rules and a link to the Judicial Conference policy are available at www.ca3.uscourts,gov. Accordingly, this action has been docketed using the initials of the minor children instead of the minor children's full names. It is noted that the parties appropriately ensured the privacy of the minor children in the District Court proceeding, and it is anticipated that they will continue to do so in this appeal. Counsel should comply with L.A.R. 113.12 and the Judicial Conference Policy on Privacy. All filings should be in compliance with local rule and that policy. The Clerk will not review each filing for compliance with L.A.R. 113.12. (TMM) |