Original Case: 5:17-cv-00095

Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:20-prswo-10412
Typeprisoner w/ out counsel / state / other
Nature of Suit560 Prisoner Petitions - Civil Detainee - Conditions of Confinement
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2020
Terminated:Nov 15, 2021
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 16, 2021 2:30 AM CST
Defendant - Appellee
MARSHA MCLANE, TCCO Executive Director
Represented By
Adam Fellows
Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
MICHAEL SEARCY
Represented By
Adam Fellows
Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Marsha McLane, TCCO Executive Director
Represented By
Adam Fellows
Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Michael Searcy
Represented By
Adam Fellows
Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
LONNIE KADE WELSH
Represented By
Lonnie Kade Welsh
Texas Civil Commitment Center
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Lonnie Kade Welsh
Represented By
Lonnie Kade Welsh
Texas Civil Commitment Center
contact info

GPO Nov 15 2021
UNPUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [20-10412 Affirmed] Judge: LHS, Judge: ASO, Judge: CTW. Mandate issue date is 12/07/2021. [20-10412]

Docket last updated: 11/16/2021 2:30 AM CST
Thursday, April 23, 2020
3 pgs PRISONER CASE WITHOUT COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Lonnie Kade Welsh 20-10412 (LEF)
Related: [-]