Original Case: 1:18-cv-08038

Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:20-cv-01668
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2020
Terminated:Dec 09, 2020
Last checked: Friday Apr 24, 2020 3:28 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
CHICAGO TEACHERS UNION, as representative of the class of all chapters and affiliates of the American Federation of Teachers
Represented By
Joshua B. Shiffrin
BREDHOFF & KAISER, PLLC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TEACHERS
Represented By
Joshua B. Shiffrin
BREDHOFF & KAISER, PLLC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
ANDREA R. WAINTROOB
Represented By
Nadine J. Wichern
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
JUDY BIGGERT
Represented By
Nadine J. Wichern
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
GILBERT F. O'BRIEN, JR.
Represented By
Nadine J. Wichern
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
KWAME RAOUL, in his official capacity as Attorney General of Illinois
Represented By
Nadine J. Wichern
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
LYNNE SERED
Represented By
Nadine J. Wichern
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
LARA SHAYNE, in their oficial capacities as chair and members of the Illinois Educational Labor Relations Board
Represented By
Nadine J. Wichern
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
JOSEPH OCOL, on behalf of himself and all others similary situated
Represented By
Jonathan F. Mitchell
MITCHELL LAW PLLC
contact info

GPO Dec 09 2020
Filed opinion of the court by Judge Rovner. AFFIRMED. Ilana Diamond Rovner, Circuit Judge; Michael Y. Scudder, Circuit Judge and Amy J. St. Eve, Circuit Judge. [7127327-1] [7127327] [20-1668]

Docket last updated: 11/01/2021 7:00 AM CDT
Thursday, April 23, 2020
1 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Transcript information sheet due by 05/07/2020. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Joseph Ocol by 04/29/2020. Appellant's brief due on or before 06/02/2020 for Joseph Ocol. [1] [7076749] 20-1668 (AD) [Entered: 04/23/2020 03:42 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 19 pgs Civil Case
Att: 2 2 pgs Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice to District Court