Member Case
Lead case is: 1:20-bk-14695

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Laurel M Isicoff
Case #: 1:20-bk-14696
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2020
Claims Deadline:Jul 06, 2020
Terminated:Apr 22, 2021

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Cinemex Holdings USA, Inc.
175 SW 7th St Ste 1108
Miami, FL 33130-2951
Represented By
Jeffrey P. Bast, Esq.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130

GPO Oct 04 2021
MEMORANDUM OPINION on (Re: 153 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Cinemex Holdings USA, Inc.). (Cohen, Diana) **Modified on 4/12/2022 to UNSEAL as per ECF # 307** (Cohen, Diana).
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
508 508 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report (UST Form 11-PCR) Thu 05/08 1:04 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Quarter Ending 4/30/2025 Filed by Debtor Cinemex Holdings USA, Inc.. (Bast, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
507 507 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report (UST Form 11-PCR) Thu 05/08 12:57 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Quarter Ending 3/31/2025 Filed by Debtor Cinemex Holdings USA, Inc.. (Bast, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
506 506 misc Certificate of Service Tue 05/06 10:11 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Cinemex Holdings USA, Inc. Related [+]. (Bast, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 505 Order (Generic)
Friday, May 02, 2025
505 505 4 pgs order Order (Generic) Fri 05/02 9:55 AM
Order Granting Reorganized Debtor's Final Report and Expedited Motion for Entry of Final Decree of Cinemex Holdings USA, Inc. Related [+]. (Olivier, Mike)
Related: [-] 492 Final Report of Estate filed by Debtor Cinemex Holdings USA, Inc.