Indiana Southern District Court
Judge:Tanya Walton Pratt
Referred: Denise K Larue
Case #: 1:14-cv-00646
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause29:2601 FMLA:Family and Medical Leave Act
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2014
Terminated:Dec 24, 2014
Last checked: Monday Dec 15, 2014 1:19 AM EST
Defendant
DEAN BRUCE
Represented By
Douglas Alan Hoffman
Carson Boxberger
contact info
Jeremy Michael Dilts
Carson Boxberger
contact info
Defendant
CYNTHIA HYDE
Represented By
Douglas Alan Hoffman
Carson Boxberger
contact info
Jeremy Michael Dilts
Carson Boxberger
contact info
Defendant
SPENCER TOWN COUNCIL
Represented By
Douglas Alan Hoffman
Carson Boxberger
contact info
Jeremy Michael Dilts
Carson Boxberger
contact info
Defendant
JON STANTZ
Represented By
Douglas Alan Hoffman
Carson Boxberger
contact info
Jeremy Michael Dilts
Carson Boxberger
contact info
Defendant
TOWN OF SPENCER
Represented By
Douglas Alan Hoffman
Carson Boxberger
contact info
Jeremy Michael Dilts
Carson Boxberger
contact info
Plaintiff
JAMES GROH
Represented By
Amy Ficklin DeBrota
The Debrota Law Firm LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/31/2015 4:22 PM EST
Friday, April 25, 2014
1 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by JAMES GROH. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-3037079)(DeBrota, Amy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons
2 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Ficklin DeBrota on behalf of Plaintiff JAMES GROH. (DeBrota, Amy)
Related: [-]