Rice v. 3M Company, The et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:20-cv-01607 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 24, 2020 |
Re-opened: | May 21, 2021 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 21, 2020 6:09 AM EDT |
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Co.
2300 Banks Street
Fort Mill, SC 29715 |
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Chemicals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
103 Fairview Park Drive
Elmsford, NY 10523 |
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
3M Company, The
|
|
Plaintiff
Polly Anne Rice
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, September 09, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Plaintiffs.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Feliciani, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, May 21, 2021 | ||
21 | 21
![]() RESPONSE to Motion re (1614 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG) MOTION to Reopen Case Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Reopen/Reinstate Dismissed Claims for Failure to Serve Executed and Completed Plaintiff Fact Sheets Response filed by Defendants.Reply to Response to Motion due by 5/28/2021 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Dukes, David) |
|
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion to Reopen Case
Fri 05/21 11:48 AM
TEXT ORDER re 1614 . Plaintiffs listed in Exhibits C, D and G move to reinstate their claims in light of supplying the Defense Coordination Committee with executed and completed Plaintiff Fact Sheets, pursuant to CMO No. 5. The Defense does not oppose the motion. The motion is GRANTED and these plaintiffs' claims are hereby reinstated pursuant to CMO No. 5. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 5/21/2021.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) |
|
Monday, February 08, 2021 | ||
15 | 15
![]() ORDER This Order Relates to the Cases Listed in Exhibit A. The Defense Leadership's motion to dismiss (Dkt. No. 1124 in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al) is GRANTED. The claims of the Plaintiffs listed in Exhibit A are dismissed without prejudice, subject to reinstatement upon the service of executed and completed PFSs pursuant to the procedure set forth in CMO No. 5, paragraphs 22 through 26. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 2/8/2021.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) |
|
Wednesday, January 27, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice Other
Wed 01/27 8:19 PM
CLERKS NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. In light of the most recent CMO No. 6.D filed 1/26/2021 at 1128 , please be reminded that the new shell case number for direct-filed cases related to the AFFF MDL is now 2:21-av-55555. Please file the Complaint (Civil cover sheet need not be filed), and counsel need only submit one summons document AO 440 form to be issued by the Clerk's office. Please provide the first listed defendant party's name and address on the document and attach pages which include the additional defendants' names (and addresses per CMO NO. 6, 6.A, 6.B, 6.C, 6.D re Alternative For Service of Process on a Defendant ). Counsel should e-file, as an attachment to the complaint (or forward in one complete PDF via email to the Clerk's office: filingdocs_ecf_chas@scd.uscourts.gov). Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) |
|
Thursday, January 21, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
![]() MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to Serve Executed and Completed Plaintiff Fact Sheet by Tyco Fire Products LP. Response to Motion due by 2/4/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Dukes, David) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Tuesday, January 05, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
![]() STATUS REPORT - Defendant BASF Corporations General Denial and Preliminary Statement of Affirmative Defenses by BASF Corporation. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Holian, Matthew) |
|
Friday, December 11, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline Liat Rome on behalf of Chemguard Inc, Tyco Fire Products LP Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Rome, Jacqueline) |
|
Tuesday, October 06, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
Friday, September 25, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice Other
Fri 09/25 10:08 PM
CLERKS NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. The clerk will be issuing the summons(es) in a timely manner for all amended complaints filed. Due to the volume of amended complaints filed most recently, the clerk will be issuing the summons(es) as follows. Upon receipt of the NEF for the Summons Issued event, please print or download the filed one-page document with the PDF header included, showing the date of issue and civil case (member) number. Insert this dated, signed and sealed document in front of the first page of your prepared summons document, including your supplemental pages, to use for service on defendants. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) |
|
8 | 8
![]() AMENDED COMPLAINT Polly Anne Rice against 3M Company, The, Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, Chemguard Inc, Chemours Company FC LLC, The, Chemours Company, The, Corteva Inc, Dupont De Nemours Inc, Dynax Corporation, EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Kidde-Fenwal Inc, National Foam Inc, Tyco Fire Products LP, Carrier Global Corporation, ChemDesign Products Inc., Chemicals, Inc., Clariant Corporation, Deepwater Chemicals, Inc., Nation Ford Chemical Co., BASF Corporation, filed by Polly Anne Rice. Service due by 12/29/2020 (Creedon, Michael) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, September 02, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice Other
Wed 09/02 4:31 PM
CLERKS NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. Please be advised to disregard entry filed at Dkt. No. 797 (in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG) et al Notice of Appearance. This filing was spread incorrectly to ALL cases . Please note filing instructions per CMO No. 1 regarding correctly spreading if the document relates to all actions or relates only to particular action(s) . Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) |
|
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Allen Leland DuPre on behalf of Finley Fire Equipment Co Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(DuPre, Allen) |
|
Wednesday, July 22, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Raymond-Flood on behalf of Chemours Company FC LLC, The, Chemours Company, The, The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC, L.L.C., Chemours Company FC LLC, The, Chemours Company, The, The Chemours Company FC, LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Raymond-Flood, Margaret) |
|
Tuesday, July 21, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Martha N Donovan on behalf of Chemours Company FC LLC, The, Chemours Company, The, The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC, L.L.C., Chemours Company FC LLC, The, Chemours Company, The, The Chemours Company FC, LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Donovan, Martha) |
|
Monday, April 27, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Mon 04/27 4:30 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed), Rice v. 3M, as DSC case 2:20-cv-1607-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Eastern Pennsylvania (sshe, ) |
|
Friday, April 24, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9069037.), filed by Polly Anne Rice. Service due by 7/23/2020(sshe, ) |