Texas Southern District Court
Judge:Alfred H Bennett
Case #: 4:20-cv-01513
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2020
Terminated:Jul 15, 2020
Last checked: Monday Oct 26, 2020 5:26 AM CDT
Defendant
Hkah Set Store Corporation
Represented By
David Fink
David Fink, Esq.
contact info
Defendant
Dani Jajaji
Represented By
David Fink
David Fink, Esq.
contact info
Defendant
Avi Jajati
Represented By
David Fink
David Fink, Esq.
contact info
Defendant
Khalil Jajati
Represented By
David Fink
David Fink, Esq.
contact info
Defendant
John Does 1-10
Represented By
David Fink
David Fink, Esq.
contact info
Defendant
LAM Wholesale LLC
Represented By
David Fink
David Fink, Esq.
contact info
Defendant
Prime Hookah, Inc.
Represented By
David Fink
David Fink, Esq.
contact info
Plaintiff
Hydro Brand Inc.
Represented By
Steven R Rech
Vorys Sater Et Al
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2020 5:58 PM CDT
Wednesday, April 29, 2020
1 1 43 pgs COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24606280) filed by Hydro Brand Inc.. Related [+]
Related: [-] ch, Steven
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
2 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hydro Brand Inc., filed Related [+]
Related: [-] ch, Steven
3 3 Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark by Hydro Brand Inc., filed Related [+]
Related: [-] ch, Steven