New York Southern District Court
Judge:Analisa Torres
Case #: 1:20-cv-03389
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1981ra Race Discrimination
Case Filed:May 01, 2020
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 28, 2020 4:40 AM EDT
Defendant
City of New York
Represented By
Amanda Christine Croushore
New York City Law Department
contact info
Plaintiff
AFSCME District Council 37 Local 2507
Represented By
Cyrus Mehri
Mehri & Skalet, PLLC
contact info
Michael Lieder
Mehri & Skalet, PLLC
contact info
Matthew L. Berman
Valli Kane & Vagnini, LLP
contact info
Robert John Valli, Jr
Valli Kane & Vagnini, LLP
contact info
Sara Wyn Kane
Valli Kane & Vagnini, LLP
contact info
Aisha Rich
Mehri & Skalet PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Darryl Chalmers
Represented By
Cyrus Mehri
Mehri & Skalet, PLLC
contact info
Michael Lieder
Mehri & Skalet, PLLC
contact info
Matthew L. Berman
Valli Kane & Vagnini, LLP
contact info
Robert John Valli, Jr
Valli Kane & Vagnini, LLP
contact info
Sara Wyn Kane
Valli Kane & Vagnini, LLP
contact info
Aisha Rich
Mehri & Skalet PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Darren Connors
Represented By
Cyrus Mehri
Mehri & Skalet, PLLC
contact info
Michael Lieder
Mehri & Skalet, PLLC
contact info
Matthew L. Berman
Valli Kane & Vagnini, LLP
contact info
Robert John Valli, Jr
Valli Kane & Vagnini, LLP
contact info
Sara Wyn Kane
Valli Kane & Vagnini, LLP
contact info
Aisha Rich
Mehri & Skalet PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Glenn Mendez
Represented By
Cyrus Mehri
Mehri & Skalet, PLLC
contact info
Michael Lieder
Mehri & Skalet, PLLC
contact info
Matthew L. Berman
Valli Kane & Vagnini, LLP
contact info
Robert John Valli, Jr
Valli Kane & Vagnini, LLP
contact info
Sara Wyn Kane
Valli Kane & Vagnini, LLP
contact info
Aisha Rich
Mehri & Skalet PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
James Nova
Represented By
Cyrus Mehri
Mehri & Skalet, PLLC
contact info
Michael Lieder
Mehri & Skalet, PLLC
contact info
Matthew L. Berman
Valli Kane & Vagnini, LLP
contact info
Robert John Valli, Jr
Valli Kane & Vagnini, LLP
contact info
Sara Wyn Kane
Valli Kane & Vagnini, LLP
contact info
Aisha Rich
Mehri & Skalet PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Fatima Q. Rosemond
Represented By
Cyrus Mehri
Mehri & Skalet, PLLC
contact info
Michael Lieder
Mehri & Skalet, PLLC
contact info
Matthew L. Berman
Valli Kane & Vagnini, LLP
contact info
Robert John Valli, Jr
Valli Kane & Vagnini, LLP
contact info
Sara Wyn Kane
Valli Kane & Vagnini, LLP
contact info
Aisha Rich
Mehri & Skalet PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 73 minutes ago
Monday, March 31, 2025
213 213 misc Notice of Filing Transcript Mon 03/31 7:40 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 3/17/2025 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
Related: [-]
212 212 misc Transcript Mon 03/31 7:39 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 3/17/2025 before Judge Analisa Torres. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Amy Walker, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/21/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/1/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/30/2025..(McGuirk, Kelly)
Related: [-]