Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:R Barclay Surrick
Case #: 2:20-cv-02096
Nature of Suit448 Civil Rights - Education
Cause20:1415(e)(2) Individuals with Disabilities Education Act
Case Filed:May 01, 2020
Terminated:Jul 31, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 28, 2020 5:25 AM EDT
Defendant
Methacton School District
Represented By
CHRISTINA M. STEPHANOS
Sweet Stevens Katz & Williams LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
DE
Represented By
ZACHARY A. MEINEN
Montgomery Law
contact info
ANDREW PAUL SCHWEIZER
Schweizer Law Offices
contact info
Plaintiff
LE
Represented By
ZACHARY A. MEINEN
Montgomery Law
contact info
ANDREW PAUL SCHWEIZER
Schweizer Law Offices
contact info
Plaintiff
LME
Represented By
ZACHARY A. MEINEN
Montgomery Law
contact info
ANDREW PAUL SCHWEIZER
Schweizer Law Offices
contact info
Unrepresented Party
METHACTON SCHOOL DISTRICT
1001 KRIEBEL MILL ROAD
NORRISTOWN, PA 19403
Represented By
CHRISTINA M. STEPHANOS
Sweet Stevens Katz & Williams LLP
contact info

GPO Apr 25 2024
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 4/25/24. 4/25/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
GPO Apr 25 2024
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 4/25/24. 4/25/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
36 36 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 07/31 12:13 PM
ORDER THAT THIS MATTER IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 7/31/24. 7/31/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
35 35 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 07/30 10:07 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by DE, LE, LME.(MEINEN, ZACHARY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, June 27, 2024
34 34 1 pgs order Order Fri 06/28 7:54 AM
ORDER THAT THE COURT GRANTS THE PARTIES' REQUEST FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME UNTIL 7/31/24 TO FINALIZE A WRITTEN SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 6/27/24. 6/28/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
Related: [-]
33 33 misc Status Report Thu 06/27 2:05 PM
STATUS REPORT by Methacton School District. (STEPHANOS, CHRISTINA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
32 32 1 pgs order Order Tue 05/28 3:23 PM
ORDER THAT THE COURT GRANTS THE PARTIES' REQUEST FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME UNTIL 6/30/24 TO FINALIZE A WRITTEN SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 5/28/24. 5/28/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (mbh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
31 31 misc Status Report Thu 05/23 5:51 PM
STATUS REPORT (Joint Proposal - Compensatory Education) by Methacton School District. (STEPHANOS, CHRISTINA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
30 30 1 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Order Thu 04/25 9:44 AM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 4/25/24. 4/25/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
Related: [-]
29 29 21 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Thu 04/25 9:42 AM
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 4/25/24. 4/25/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
28 28 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 02/28 9:08 AM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT THE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD IS DENIED. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 2/27/24. 2/28/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (mbh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 17, 2021
27 27 misc Transcript - Redacted Tue 08/17 3:00 PM
Redaction re22 Transcript - PDF. (mbh, )
Related: [-]
Friday, July 16, 2021
26 26 misc Redaction Request - Transcript Fri 07/16 5:27 PM
Transcript Redaction Request re22 Transcript - PDF, by attorney ZACHARY A. MEINEN. (MEINEN, ZACHARY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 06, 2021
25 25 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 07/06 11:43 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re21 First MOTION Supplement the Administrative Record filed by DE, LE, LME.(MEINEN, ZACHARY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, June 28, 2021
24 24 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 06/28 2:27 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re21 First MOTION Supplement the Administrative Record filed by Methacton School District.(STEPHANOS, CHRISTINA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, June 25, 2021
23 23 misc Notice of Filing of Official Transcript Fri 06/25 12:10 PM
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript with Certificate of Service re22 Transcript - PDF, 6/25/21 Entered & E-mailed. (fdc)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Transcript - PDF Fri 06/25 12:06 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Oral Argument held on 6/10/21, before Judge Surrick. Court Reporter/Transcriber Neal R. Gross. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 7/16/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/26/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/23/2021. (fdc)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 14, 2021
21 21 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 06/14 7:00 PM
First MOTION Supplement the Administrative Record filed by DE, LE, LME.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(MEINEN, ZACHARY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit
Thursday, June 10, 2021
20 20 minutes Motion Hearing 1 - Terminate Hearings Thu 06/10 3:26 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK Motion Hearing held on 6/10/2021 re13 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by DE, LE, LME (sg, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 11, 2021
19 19 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 05/11 2:28 PM
ORDER THAT ORAL ARGUMENT IS SCHEDULED FOR 6/10/21 AT 11:30 AM IN COURTROOM 8A. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 5/11/21. 5/11/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
Related: [-]
Monday, November 23, 2020
18 18 1 pgs order Order Mon 11/23 2:37 PM
ORDER THAT ORAL ARGUMENT, IN LIEU OF DEFENDANT FILING A SUR-REPLY, SCHEDULED FOR 11/24/20, IS CONTINUED TO A DATE TO BE DETERMINED BY THE COURT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 11/23/20. 11/23/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
Related: [-]
Monday, November 02, 2020
17 17 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 11/02 2:26 PM
ORDER THAT ORAL ARGUMENT SCHEDULED FOR 11/4/20 IS CONTINUED TO 11/24/2020 AT 1:15 PM IN COURTROOM 6A BEFORE HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 11/2/20. 11/2/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 21, 2020
16 16 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 10/21 9:57 AM
ORDER THAT ORAL ARGUMENT IS SCHEDULED FOR 11/4/2020 AT 1:30 PM IN COURTROOM 13B BEFORE HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 10/20/20. 10/21/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 06, 2020
15 15 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 10/06 11:48 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re13 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by DE, LE, LME.(MEINEN, ZACHARY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Response to Statement of Facts,
Att: 2 Brief
Monday, September 21, 2020
14 14 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 09/21 4:42 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re13 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record (District's Brief in Opposition) filed by Methacton School District.(STEPHANOS, CHRISTINA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 District's Response to Statement of Facts,
Att: 2 proposed Order
Saturday, August 22, 2020
13 13 motion Summary Judgment Sat 08/22 11:55 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by DE, LE, LME.Certificate of Service, Brief.(MEINEN, ZACHARY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit Statement of Undisputed Material Facts
Thursday, July 30, 2020
misc Remark Thu 07/30 10:04 AM
NEF for Order6 Regenerated. (fdc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 23, 2020
12 12 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge-Settlement 1 - Terminate Hearings Fri 07/24 9:42 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WITH MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI WILL BE SCHEDULED AT THE REQUEST OF COUNSEL. PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE A MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY 8/21/20. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 7/23/20. 7/24/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
Related: [-]
11 11 minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Thu 07/23 1:41 PM
Minute Entry for Initial Pretrial Conference held on 7/23/20 before HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK (mbh, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 16, 2020
10 10 misc Report Of Thu 07/16 1:05 PM
Report Of JOINT REPORT OF THE RULE 26f MEETING by DE, LE, LME. (SCHWEIZER, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 25, 2020
9 9 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Fri 06/26 8:21 AM
ORDER THAT AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 7/23/20 AT 11:00 A.M.; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 6/25/20. 6/26/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL )
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 06/25 11:07 AM
(Methacton School District's Answer with Affirmative Defenses) ANSWER to Complaint by METHACTON SCHOOL DISTRICT, Methacton School District.(STEPHANOS, CHRISTINA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 10, 2020
7 7 misc Administrative Record Wed 06/10 4:11 PM
Administrative Record. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (nd, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 14, 2020
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Seal Thu 05/14 4:50 PM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 5/14/20.5/14/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
Related: [-]
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 05/14 3:23 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by LME, DE, LE. All Defendants. (MEINEN, ZACHARY)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Seal Thu 05/14 1:17 PM
MOTION to Seal filed by DE, LE, LME.Certificate of Service.(SCHWEIZER, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, May 13, 2020
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 05/13 2:30 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by LME, DE, LE. All Defendants. (MEINEN, ZACHARY)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/13 2:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ZACHARY A. MEINEN on behalf of DE, LE, LME with Certificate of Service(MEINEN, ZACHARY)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 01, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney) Fri 05/01 12:36 AM
COMPLAINT against METHACTON SCHOOL DISTRICT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14267678.), filed by L. E..(SCHWEIZER, ANDREW) Modified on 5/1/2020 (fb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Attachment A (Exhibit to Complaint),
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Designation Form,
Att: 4 Case Management Track Form
service Summons Issued Fri 05/01 9:06 AM
Summons Issued as to Methacton School District. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 5/1/2020 (bw, )
Related: [-]