Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20472

West Virginia Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Frank W Volk Usdj
Case #: 2:20-ap-02006
Nature of Suit21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:May 01, 2020
Terminated:May 22, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Gateway One Lending & Finance, LLC, Defendant
Represented By
Gateway One Lending & Finance, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Eric Deal, Plaintiff
940 Heavenly Drive
South Charleston, WV 25309
Represented By
Joe M. Supple
contact info
Plaintiff
Kimberly Kay Deal, Plaintiff
327 Ellwood Drive
South Charleston, WV 25309
Represented By
Joe M. Supple
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:12 PM EDT
Friday, May 22, 2020
court Close Adversary Case Fri 05/22 12:05 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-2006 Closed. (llb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 05, 2020
3 3 notice Withdrawing Document Tue 05/05 10:03 AM
Notice of Withdrawal of1 Complaint filed by Kimberly Kay Deal, Richard Eric Deal with Certificate of Service (Supple, Joe)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 04, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued Mon 05/04 1:14 PM
Summons Issued on Gateway One Lending & Finance, LLC Answer Due by 6/3/2020. Transmitted Electronically to counsel for service. (llb)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 01, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 05/01 9:50 AM
Adversary case 2:20-ap-02006. Complaint by Richard Eric Deal, Kimberly Kay Deal (Debtor) against Gateway One Lending & Finance, LLC. (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Supple, Joe)
Related: [-]