Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Solomon Oliver, Jr
Case #: 1:20-cv-00950
Nature of Suit196 Contract - Franchise
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:May 01, 2020
Terminated:May 14, 2020
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 28, 2020 6:24 AM EDT
Defendant
Timothy J. Mulvaney
Defendant
Sales Consultants of Oswego, LLC
Plaintiff
Management Recruiters International, Inc.
Represented By
Jeffrey S. Moeller
Seeley, Savidge, Ebert & Gourash
contact info
Daniel F. Gourash
Seeley, Savidge, Ebert & Gourash
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 26, 2020
oth_evt Remark by Finance Tue 05/26 6:23 AM
Remark by Finance. Funds in the amount of $400.00 submitted for refund on 5/26/2020 for receipt AOHNDC-9954285. (S,NM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 14, 2020
7 7 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 05/14 8:02 AM
Order of Voluntary Case Dismissal, with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. Related document6 . Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 5/14/2020. (R,Sh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 13, 2020
6 6 notice Notice of Dismissal Wed 05/13 3:53 PM
Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by Management Recruiters International, Inc.. (Gourash, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 05, 2020
oth_doc Request to Clerk for Refund of Erroneous or Duplicate On-line Filing Fee Payment Tue 05/05 11:27 AM
Request to Clerk for refund of erroneous or duplicate on-line filing fee payment. Reason for refund request: duplicative. Receipt #: BOHNDC-9954285, filed by Management Recruiters International, Inc.. Related document(s)1 . (Gourash, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 01, 2020
5 5 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Fri 05/01 4:56 PM
Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey S. Moeller filed by on behalf of Management Recruiters International, Inc.. (Moeller, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
4 4 oth_evt Summons Issued Fri 05/01 4:12 PM
Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Timothy J. Mulvaney, Sales Consultants of Oswego, LLC. (L,MI)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form
3 3 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement (atty event) Fri 05/01 3:17 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Management Recruiters International, Inc.. (Gourash, Daniel)
Related: [-]
2 2 oth_doc Request to Clerk for Service Fri 05/01 3:15 PM
Request to Clerk for service upon Timothy J. Mulvaney, Sales Consultants of Oswego, LLC filed by Management Recruiters International, Inc.. Related document(s)1 .(Gourash, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Sales Consultants of Oswego,
Att: 2 Summons Mulvaney
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 05/01 2:49 PM
Complaint against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number BOHNDC-9954285. Filed by Management Recruiters International, Inc. (Gourash, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Franchise Agreement,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Promissory Note
utility Add and Terminate Judge Fri 05/01 4:02 PM
Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case. (L,MI)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Fri 05/01 4:03 PM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (L,MI)
Related: [-]