Pennsylvania Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Eric L Frank
Case #: 2:14-bk-13305
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2014
Creditor Meeting:Jun 10, 2014
Claims Deadline:Feb 23, 2015
Terminated:Oct 20, 2015
Plan Confirmed:Apr 08, 2015

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Health Care Business
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
The Baptist Home of Philadelphia d/b/a Deer Meadows Retirement Community
8301 Roosevelt Blvd
Philadelphia, PA 19152-2006
Represented By
JOHN T. CARROLL, III
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Last checked: Thursday Sep 04, 2014 4:10 PM EDT
City of Philadelphia Law Department
1401 John F. Kennedy Blvd. Municipal Services Bldg. 5th floor
Philadelphia, PA 19102
Represented By
PAMELA ELCHERT THURMOND
City Of Philadelphia
contact info
Attorney
District 1199C NUHHCE
Freedman & Lorry, P.C. 1601 Market Street, Suite 1500
Philadelphia, PA 19103
Represented By
SUSAN A. MURRAY
Freedman & Lorry PC
contact info
Creditor
Kennedy PC Law Offices
PO Box 5100
Harrisburg, PA 17110
Creditor
U.S. Bank National Association, as indenture trustee
Represented By
JENNIFER P. KNOX
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
LUKE A. SIZEMORE
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
ERIC A. SCHAFFER
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Creditor
The Wood Company
Creditor
Sodexo Operations, LLC
Creditor
Shelly's Medication Services, Inc.
2522 Pearl Buck Road Unit A
Bristol, PA 19007
Represented By
ROBERT M. GREENBAUM
Smith Kane
contact info
Creditor
Respiratory Health Services, LLC
Represented By
PHILLIP A. MARTIN
Fultz Maddox Hovious & Dickens PLC
contact info
RICHARD M. BECK
Klehr Harrison Harvey Branzburg LLP
contact info
CORINNE SAMLER BRENNAN
Klehr Harrison Harvey Branzburg LLP
contact info
Creditor
RehabCare Group East, Inc.
Represented By
PHILLIP A. MARTIN
Fultz Maddox Hovious & Dickens PLC
contact info
RICHARD M. BECK
Klehr Harrison Harvey Branzburg LLP
contact info
CORINNE SAMLER BRENNAN
Klehr Harrison Harvey Branzburg LLP
contact info
Creditor
RICOH USA, INC.
Recovery & Bankruptcy Group 3920 Arkwright Road Ste. 400
Macon, GA 31210
Creditor
Pension Fund for Nursing Home and Health Care Employees-Philadelphia and Vicinity
1601 Market Street Suite 1500
Philadelphia, PA 19103
Represented By
SUSAN A. MURRAY
Freedman & Lorry PC
contact info
Creditor
PECO Energy Company
2301 Market Street, S23-1
Philadelphia, PA 19103
Represented By
LYNN R. ZACK
Exelon Business Services Company
contact info
Creditor
Lima Company
Stark & Stark, P.C. 777 Township Line Road Suite 120
Yardley, PA 19067
Represented By
JENNIFER D. GOULD
Stark & Stark
contact info
Creditor
Iron Mountain Information Management, LLC
One Federal Street 7th Floor
Boston, MA 02110
Creditor
GE Information Technology Inc. fdba IKON Financial Srvs.
Bky. Administration 1738 Bass Rd. PO Box 13708
Macon, GA 31208
Creditor
District 1199C Training and Upgrading Fund
1601 Market Street Suite 1500
Philadelphia, PA 19103
Represented By
SUSAN A. MURRAY
Freedman & Lorry PC
contact info
Creditor
Commonwealth of PA
Dept. of Labor and Industry - UCTS c/o Rhonda Hunsicker 625 Cherry Street Room 203
Reading, PA 19602
Creditor
Capozzi Adler, PC
1200 Camp Hill Bypass Suite 205
Camp Hill, PA 17011
Represented By
ANDREW RUSSELL EISEMANN
Capozzi Adler, PC
contact info
Creditor
Beneficial Mutual Savings Bank
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP 2600 One Commerce Square
Philadelphia, PA 19103
Represented By
MICHAEL J. CORDONE
Stradley Ronon Stavens And Young , LLP
contact info
Creditor
Atlantic Refrigeration Equipment Co., Inc.
200 South Broad Street Suite 600
Philadelphia, PA 19102
Represented By
DAVID I. GRUNFELD
Astor Weiss Kaplan & Mandel, LLP
contact info
Creditor Committee
Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By
ARIS J. KARALIS
Maschmeyer Karalis P.C.
contact info
ROBERT W. SEITZER
Maschmeyer Karalis P.C.
contact info
JOHN HENRY SCHANNE, II
Pepper Hamilton LLP
contact info
DONALD J. DETWEILER
Peper Hamilton LLP
contact info
FRANCIS J. LAWALL
Pepper Hamilton LLP
contact info
Financial Advisor
KPMG Corporate Finance LLC
345 Park Ave.
New York, NY 10154
Financial Advisor
Shea Advisory Services LLC
8 Adeline Rd.
Beverly, MA 01915
Health Care Ombudsman
Wilmarie Gonzalez
Pennsylvania Department of Aging 555 Walnut Street, 5th Floor P.O. Box 1089
Harrisburg, PA 17101
Represented By
CYNTHIA A HAINES
Commonwealth Of PA
contact info
Other Prof.
Laura Solomon and Associates
121 Sibley Ave.
Ardmore, PA 19003
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee 833 Chestnut Street Suite 500
Philadelphia, PA 19107
Represented By
DAVE P. ADAMS
United States Trustee
contact info

GPO Dec 31 2015
Memorandum Re: Motion for Relief From Stay filed by Debtor The Baptist Home of Philadelphia d/b/a Deer Meadows Retirement Community (related document(s)399). By order dated 12/18/14, I granted the Motion in part and entered an interim order authorizing the Debtor to pay the Bond Trustee's claim, less the roughly $460,000.00 at issue in the Carve-Out Dispute ("the Holdback"). (Doc. #188). An appropriate order follows. (J., Randi) Modified on 12/31/2014 (J., Randi). Related document(s) 188 Order on Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019.

1. Bankruptcy judge impatient in Deer Meadows case (philly.com)
Submitted Thu 06/05/2014
Docket last updated: 44 minutes ago
Tuesday, October 20, 2015
court Close Bankruptcy Case Tue 10/20 10:11 AM
Bankruptcy Case Terminated for Statistical Purposes. (J., Randi)
Related: [-]
Saturday, October 17, 2015
624 624 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 10/18 1:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 10/17/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #622 )
Thursday, October 15, 2015
622 622 order Final Decree Thu 10/15 11:50 AM
Final Decree. This bankruptcy case is closed and this Order constitutes a final decree. (W., Christine)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 14, 2015
623 623 court Hearing Held Fri 10/16 10:49 AM
Hearing Held on612 Motion for Final Decree Motion for Entry of Final Decree and Order Closing Case and Request for Consideration of Cumulative Plan Implementation Report Filed by The Baptist Home of Philadelphia d/b/a Deer Meadows Retirement Community Represented by JOHN T. CARROLL III(Counsel). E-order entered. (J., Christina)
Related: [-]
621 621 court Hearing Held Thu 10/15 11:00 AM
Status Hearing Not Necessary on612 Motion for Final Decree Motion for Entry of Final Decree and Order Closing Case and Request for Consideration of Cumulative Plan Implementation Report Filed by The Baptist Home of Philadelphia d/b/a Deer Meadows Retirement Community Represented by JOHN T. CARROLL III(Counsel). Final Decree Entered. (J., Christina)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 13, 2015
620 620 misc Proposed Consent Order Tue 10/13 3:08 PM
Proposed Consent Order RE: (REDLINE VERSION) Final Decree and Order Closing Case Filed by JOHN T. CARROLL III on behalf of The Baptist Home of Philadelphia d/b/a Deer Meadows Retirement Community Related [+]. (CARROLL, JOHN)
Related: [-] 612 ,619
619 619 misc Proposed Consent Order Tue 10/13 3:04 PM
Proposed Consent Order RE: Final Decree and Order Closing Case Filed by JOHN T. CARROLL III on behalf of The Baptist Home of Philadelphia d/b/a Deer Meadows Retirement Community Related [+]. (CARROLL, JOHN)
Related: [-] 613 ,612