Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02741

California Northern District Court
Judge:Vince Chhabria
Case #: 3:20-cv-02977
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2020
Case in other court:Michigan Western, 1:20-cv-00296
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 27, 2020 3:08 AM PDT
Defendant
Bayer-Monsanto Company
Plaintiff
Jeffrey DeKorte
Represented By
Brion Bannon Doyle
Varnum LLP
contact info
Seth B. Arthur
Varnum LLP
contact info
Adam John Brody
Varnum LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Sue DeKorte
Represented By
Brion Bannon Doyle
Varnum LLP
contact info
Seth B. Arthur
Varnum LLP
contact info
Adam John Brody
Varnum LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Sunday, May 03, 2020
utility MDL Member Case Sun 05/03 3:49 PM
MEMBER CASE OPENED: re 3:16-md-02741-VC; Western District of Michigan, 1:20-cv-00296-PLM-SJB DeKorte, et al v. Bayer-Monsanto Company, opened in California Northern District as 3:20-cv-2977 VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 204 cc: JPMDL (gbaS-adi, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 30, 2020
8 8 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Fri 05/01 4:37 PM
Case transferred in from District of Michigan Western; Case Number 1:20-cv-00296. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 28, 2020
7 7 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation; certified copy received from Northern District of California; case transferred to Northern District of California under MDL No. 2741, In Re: Roundup Products Liability Litigation (ems)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 24, 2020
6 6 COPY of CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directed to the Northern District of California regarding case to be transferred to the Multidistrict Litigation Panel under MDL No. 2741, In Re: Roundup Products Liability Litigation (ems)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 06, 2020
5 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Bayer-Monsanto Company (ems)
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (ems)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs Memorandum regarding potentially related case returned to Clerk from Magistrate Judge Berens indicating that this case is related to cases 1:20-cv-46; 1:20-cv-47; 1:20-cv-48; 1:20-cv-149; 1:20-cv-150 (tlbu)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 03, 2020
2 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re1 (Doyle, Brion)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Bayer-Monsanto Company filed by Jeffrey DeKorte, Sue DeKorte (Doyle, Brion)
Related: [-]
FILING FEE PAID re1 by plaintiffs Jeffrey DeKorte, Sue DeKorte in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-5095509 (Doyle, Brion)
Related: [-]