Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Keith L Phillips
Case #: 3:20-bk-32181
Case Filed:May 04, 2020
Terminated:Dec 20, 2021

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors25,001-50,000
Est. Assets$1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Est. Liabilities $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Chinos Holdings, Inc., Debtor
225 Liberty St
New York, NY 10281-1048
Represented By
Tyler P. Brown
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
contact info
Nathan Kramer
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
John P. Fitzgerald, III
Office of the US Trustee - Region 4 -R 701 E. Broad Street, Ste. 4304
Richmond, VA 23219

Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, December 20, 2021
1360 1360 7 pgs order Final Decree Mon 12/20 4:24 PM
Final Decree, the Final Report of the Debtor is approved, the Motion for Final Decree is granted, and the case is hereby closed. Related [+] (Cummings, James)
Related: [-] related document(s)1348 Final Report and Motion for Final Decree filed by Chinos Holdings, Inc.
Thursday, December 16, 2021
1359 1359 misc Certificate of Service Thu 12/16 9:40 AM
Amended Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Robert S. Westermann of Hirschler Fleischer, P.C. on behalf of GUC Trust. (Westermann, Robert)
Related: [-] related document(s)1355 Statement filed by GUC Trust
1358 1358 misc Affidavit of Service Thu 12/16 9:20 AM
Affidavit of Service (Affidavit of Service of Omni Agent Solutions) Related [+] filed by Henry Pollard Long III of Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP on behalf of Chinos Holdings, Inc.. (Long, Henry)
Related: [-] related document(s)1356 Statement filed by Chinos Holdings, Inc.
Tuesday, December 14, 2021
1357 1357 court Hearing Cancelled Tue 12/14 8:05 PM
Hearing Cancelled; AK Sourcing response resolved; Order submitted Related [+] (rintyep)
Related: [-] 1348 Final Report and Motion for Final Decree filed by Chinos Holdings, Inc.
1356 1356 misc Statement Tue 12/14 1:41 PM
Statement (Proposed Agenda for Hearing on December 16, 2021, at 11:00 A.M. (Prevailing Eastern Time)) filed by Henry Pollard Long III of Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP on behalf of Chinos Holdings, Inc.. (Long, Henry)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 13, 2021
1355 1355 misc Statement Mon 12/13 8:43 PM
Amended Statement Notice of Filing of Further Revised Exhibits to Joint Motion of the Reorganized Debtor and Class 6-B GUC Trust for Entry of a Final Degree and Order (I) Closing the Chinos Holdings, Inc. Case, (II) Discharging and Releasing the Class 6-B GUC Trust and the GUC Trustee, and (III) Terminating Omni Agent Solutions, Inc., as Claims, Noticing, and Administrative Agent Related [+] filed by Robert S. Westermann of Hirschler Fleischer, P.C. on behalf of GUC Trust. (Westermann, Robert)
Related: [-] related document(s)1354 Statement filed by GUC Trust
1354 1354 misc Statement Mon 12/13 3:52 PM
Statement Notice of Filing Revised Exhibits to Joint Motion of the Reorganized Debtor and Class 6-B GUC Trust for Entry of a Final Decree and Order (I) Closing the Chinos Holdings, Inc. Case, (II) Discharging and Releasing the Class 6-B GUC Trust and the GUC Trustee, and (III) Terminating Omni Agent, Solutions, Inc. as Claims, Noticing, and Administrative Agent Related [+] filed by Robert S. Westermann of Hirschler Fleischer, P.C. on behalf of GUC Trust. (Westermann, Robert)
Related: [-] related document(s)1348 Final Report and Motion for Final Decree filed by Chinos Holdings, Inc.